Pemberton v. USP Marion et al
Plaintiff: Devin A. Pemberton
Defendant: USP Marion, FBOP and Warden Sprout
Case Number: 3:2021cv01458
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: David W Dugan
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide the Court with $402.00 filing fee for this case on or before January 26, 2022. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Action due by 1/26/2022). Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 1/11/2022. (tjk)
December 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Filing Fee due on or before 1/3/2022 (kare)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #7 ). A federal court may permit an indigent party to proceed without pre-payment of fees. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). The Court is not satisfied from Pemberton's affidavit that he is indigent. Plaintiff's trust fund account balance as of November 6, 2021 was $4,539.02 (Doc. #7 ). Accordingly, the Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #7 ). Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee no later than January 3, 2022. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 12/1/2021. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Devin A. Pemberton. Supplement to #8 Amended Complaint. (kare)
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Devin A. Pemberton.(kare)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devin A. Pemberton. (kare)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, this case will remain with the assigned District Judge David W. Dugan. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (kare)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kare)
November 24, 2021 Amended Complaint due by 12/22/2021. (jaj)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING #1 Complaint without prejudice. Pemberton is GRANTED leave to file a First Amended Complaint on or before December 22, 2021. Failure to do so shall result in dismissal of this action with prejudice and a strike. See FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The CLERK is DIRECTED to mail Pemberton a blank civil rights complaint form for use in preparing a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 11/22/2021. (jsy)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Devin A. Pemberton to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Devin A. Pemberton on 11/19/2021. Consent due by 12/10/2021 (kare)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 21-1458-DWD. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case.. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 11/19/2021. (kare)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Devin A. Pemberton.(kare)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pemberton v. USP Marion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin A. Pemberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Sprout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?