Smith v. Meyers et al
Plaintiff: Jared M. Smith
Defendant: Percy Meyers, Sabrina Stevens, Tammy Stevens, Penny George, Reynal Caldwell, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Rob Jeffreys, Terry A. Grisson, DeAnna Kink, Debbie Knaver, Ann Lahr, Travis Bayler, Adewale Kuforiji, L. Long and Daniel Monti
Case Number: 3:2021cv01468
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 4.40 received, receipt number 34625111211 (adh)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Daniel Monti, Tammy Stevens. Defendants Stevens and Monti shall file their response to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by 2/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 1/14/2022. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Daniel Monti, Tammy Stevens. (Shultz, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 VIDEO WRIT ISSUED pursuant to 30 . (jlm)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jared M. Smith. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a writ to obtain Plaintiff's presence at the hearing via video. Counsel will receive instructions to attend via video by separate email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 1/13/2022. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sabrina Stevens, Reynal Caldwell, Percy Meyers. Defendants' response to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by 2/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 1/12/2022. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 21-1468-RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Dugan on behalf of Reynal Caldwell, Percy Meyers, Sabrina Stevens (Dugan, Timothy)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Reynal Caldwell, Percy Meyers, Sabrina Stevens. (Scott, Brent)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Reynal Caldwell, Percy Meyers, Sabrina Stevens. (Scott, Brent)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Scott, Brent) Modified on 1/12/2022 (kdw).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sabrina Stevens.(Scott, Brent)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Percy Meyers.(Scott, Brent)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Reynal Caldwell.(Scott, Brent)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Steven Scott on behalf of Reynal Caldwell, Percy Meyers, Sabrina Stevens (Scott, Brent)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINAL CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Shultz, Robert) Modified on 1/12/2022 (kdw).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Tammy Stevens and Daniel Monti. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Tammy Stevens and Daniel Monti. on 1/7/2022. Consent due by 1/28/2022 (kdw)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brandon Shultz on behalf of Daniel Monti, Tammy Stevens (Shultz, Robert)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Percy Meyers waiver sent on 1/4/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (tjk)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Meyers on 1/4/2022. Waiver of Service due by 2/3/2022. (tjk)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Caldwell on 1/4/2022. Waiver of Service due by 2/3/2022. (tjk)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Daniel Monti waiver sent on 12/17/2021, answer due 2/15/2022. (tjk)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Sabrina Stevens waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022; Tammy Stevens waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. (tjk)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER PAYMENT: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.80. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Shawnee Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/20/2021. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Percy Meyers, Sabrina Stevens, Tammy Stevens, and Reynal Caldwell on 12/20/2021. Waiver of Service due by 1/19/2022. (tjk)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HIPAA Qualified Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/20/2021. (kare)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Monti on 12/17/2021. Waiver of Service due by 1/18/2022. (tjk)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Service of Process upon Percy Meyers, Sabrina Stevens, Tammy Stevens, Reynal Caldwell, and Daniel Monti (official capacity only), GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jared M. Smith, DENYING in part #3 Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief. All potential claims against Penny George, L. Long, Rob Jeffreys, Terry A. Grissom, DeAnna Kink, Ann Lahr, Debbie Knauer, Travis Baylor, Adewale Kuforiji, Wexford Health Sources, Inc., Taylor Douglas and Misty Fowre are DISMISSED without prejudice. Daniel Monti (official capacity only) is ADDED to the case for the purpose of implementing any injunctive relief. Defendants, as well as Daniel Monti, are DIRECTED to file a response to #3 Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief within 14 days of service of the pleadings. Because this suit addresses medical claims, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/17/2021. (anp)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jared M. Smith (kare)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 21-1468-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case.. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 11/23/2021. (kare)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kare)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Emergency MOTION Requesting Injunctive Relief by Jared M. Smith. (kare)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jared M. Smith. (kare)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jared M. Smith.(kare)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Meyers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Percy Meyers
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Brent Steven Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Stevens
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Brent Steven Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Stevens
Represented By: Robert Brandon Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynal Caldwell
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Brent Steven Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry A. Grisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeAnna Kink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Knaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Lahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Bayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adewale Kuforiji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Monti
Represented By: Robert Brandon Shultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?