STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC. v. OOGLES N GOOGLES et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Stelor Productions Inc. alleged that defendant Oogles N Googles infringed on plaintiff's registered trademarks to OOGLES, OOGLE, IGGLE and OOGGLE.

Plaintiff: STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.
Defendant: OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL and XYZ CORPORATIONS
Case Number: 1:2005cv00354
Filed: March 11, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: Delaware
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: David Frank Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2009 Filing 317 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (LBK)
January 13, 2009 Filing 316 CLOSED DISMISSED, with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 1/13/2009.(LBK)
January 12, 2009 Filing 315 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims, Counterclaims and Third Party Claims, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, MICHELLE COTE, ROB LENDERMAN, STACEY LENDERMAN, BRENDA MURTY, MARGIE THOMAS, ROB SLYTER, ELIZABETH SLYTER, CORINNA SPARKS, CHRISTINE WATERBURY, LEIGH SUNDLING, TINA CARTAYA, LARRY BERNIER, KAREN BERNIER, DAVIS DENSON, BILLIE JOE DENSON, AARON JACOBITZ, TORIE JACOBITZ, CYNTHIA BROWN, MELISSA KELSEY, KRISTA ALLENSTEIN, MARIA WEICHERT, BRENDA GROTHAUS, JASON BLACKHURST, SHELLEY BLACKHURST, VLC ENTERPRISES, LLC, MELISSA CULP, WATERBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC, ELIZABETH LIN, WINSTON LIN, ISLAND GIRLS COMPANY, LLC, DAVID KIRK, GENEVIEVE KIRK, WRAYLYNNE-PATRICK ENTERPRISES, LLC, DEGLIN, J.E. INVESTMENTS, INC., KATHERINE KAHLIG, AMANDA WILLIAMS, DONNIE WILLIAMS, CHARLES MURTY, DARRIN DUNNE, HEATHER GRIPKA, LINDA OUGHTON, CARI OUGHTON, MICHELLE DABEK, STEVE CURL, TARA CURL, CARRIE DIMARIA, KECHIA LAKE, CARYLEEN GUNDERMAN, TOM MEIER, KERI MEIER, MARY CLAIRE BALKO, BRITTANY PFEIFER, KERRY MURRAY, NICOLE PAULINO-LYTEL, CHRISTA OWENS, KRISTA HARPER, HAMID TAVASSOLI, SAHAR TAVASSOLI, RENE BOOP, BRYAN PULLARA, GISELLE PULLARA, ELIZABETH PORCELLI, JENNIFER WEBB, TY WEBB, KID SAVVEY, INC., OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, ANDRIA BROWN, KEVIN BELIEU, SANDRA GONZALEZ, CLAUDIA NAVARRO, CAROL CERVANTES, RENE KENNEY, MARIO CARTAYA, PAUL MACNEILL, OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC, MENDELL ENTERPRISES, LLC, BERNIER, INC., DANYA MENDELL, Plaintiffs STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC., Counter Claimants OOGLES N GOOGLES, OOGLES N GOOGLES, OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC, OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC, OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC, OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC, Counter Defendants STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Third Party Defendants STEVEN A. ESRIG, STEVEN A. ESRIG, Third Party Plaintiffs OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC, OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
January 9, 2009 Filing 314 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Third Party Complaints served on Steven A. Esrig on December 22, 2008, filed by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 31, 2008 Filing 313 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 30, 2008 Filing 312 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 30, 2008 Filing 311 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 30, 2008 Filing 310 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 30, 2008 Filing 309 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 30, 2008 Filing 308 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 30, 2008 Filing 307 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting 304 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert F. Merz, Jr and David John Zack withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/16/08. (SWM)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER on 12/12/08, Telephonic Status Conference: Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. The liability discovery deadline is enlarged to 1/16/09. The motion for pro hac vice admission of Jay Cohen 301 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/15/08. (SWM)
December 15, 2008 Filing 304 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorelli, Michael)
December 12, 2008 Filing 303 RECEIPT #IP010395 in the amount of $ 30.00 for pro hac vice fee for Jay Cohen. (LBK)
December 12, 2008 Filing 302 NOTICE of Cancellation of Depositions, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC, re 295 NOTICE of Taking Deposition, 294 NOTICE of Taking Deposition, 297 NOTICE of Taking Deposition, 296 NOTICE of Taking Deposition, 298 NOTICE of Taking Deposition, 299 NOTICE of Taking Deposition. (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 12, 2008 Filing 301 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jay L. Cohen to Appear pro hac vice., filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorelli, Michael)
December 12, 2008 Filing 300 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Dorelli, Michael)
December 5, 2008 Filing 299 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 5, 2008 Filing 298 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 5, 2008 Filing 297 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 5, 2008 Filing 296 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 5, 2008 Filing 295 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 5, 2008 Filing 294 NOTICE of Taking Deposition by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
December 5, 2008 Filing 293 NOTICE of Service of Expert Report of James T. Berger, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC (Vaughan, Stephen)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER on Discovery and Case Management Following 11/17/08, Hearing: Pltf's Motion to Amend the CMP 274 is denied. Defts' Motion to Amend the CMP 262 is granted in part and denied in part. Pltf's Motion for Protective Order 276 is denied to the extent it seeks to limit its responses to Defts' first set of discovery (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/21/08. (SWM)
November 19, 2008 Filing 291 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Dorelli, Michael)
November 18, 2008 Filing 290 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to XYZ CORPORATIONS, STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., VLC ENTERPRISES, LLC, WATERBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC, ISLAND GIRLS COMPANY, LLC, WRAYLYNNE-PATRICK ENTERPRISES, LLC, DEGLIN, J.E. INVESTMENTS, INC., OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC, MENDELL ENTERPRISES, LLC, BERNIER, INC. and any other corporate party who has not yet filed a corporate disclosure statement. (LAB) (LBK)
November 18, 2008 Filing 289 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to XYZ CORPORATIONS, STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., VLC ENTERPRISES, LLC, WATERBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC, WRAYLYNNE-PATRICK ENTERPRISES, LLC. (LAB) (LBK)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting defts' 285 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 274 MOTION to Amend/Correct 117 Case Management. Response due by 11/13/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/17/08. (SWM)
November 13, 2008 Filing 287 RESPONSE in Opposition re 276 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- First Int. to Stelor, # 2 Exhibit 2- First RFP to Stelor, # 3 Exhibit 3- Second Int. to Stelor, # 4 Exhibit Second RFP to Stelor, # 5 Exhibit 5- Googles logo trademark registration, # 6 Exhibit 6- Aorora agreement (partial), # 7 Exhibit 7- Silvers agreement with Stelor, # 8 Exhibit 8- Silvers creative consultant agreement with Stelor, # 9 9- Silvers letter, # 10 Exhibit 10- Silvers Googles project, # 11 Exhibit 11- Business entity status report, # 12 Exhibit 12- Book printing order form, # 13 Exhibit 13- Stelor directors and investors 2004, # 14 Exhibit 14- Di Muccio (investor) letter, # 15 Exhibit 15- police run report, # 16 Exhibit 17- Stelor profit and loss statement, # 17 Exhibit 17- Stelor royalty statement, # 18 Exhibit 18- Stelor motion for injunction against Silvers, # 19 Exhibit 19- Silvers attorney letter to Stelor attorney, # 20 Exhibit 20- Silvers e-mail to Esrig, # 21 Cover Sheet for Sealed Document 21- Silvers e-mail to Esrig, # 22 Exhibit Silvers letter to Esrig, # 23 Exhibit 23- Silvers letter to Stelor attorney, # 24 Exhibit 25- Stelor v. Silvers 2004 lawsuit, # 25 Exhibit 25- Silvers answer to Stelor 2004 lawsuit, # 26 Exhibit 26- Silver-Stelor settlement agreement, # 27 Exhibit 26- Stelor v. Silvers 2005 lawsuit, # 28 Exhibit 28- Silvers v. Stelor 2005 lawsuit, # 29 Exhibit 29- Silvers (now Stelor) v. Google, Inc. lawsuit, # 30 Exhibit 30- Stelor reply brief in 2005 lawsuit against Silvers, # 31 Exhibit 31- Stelor privilege log in Google case, # 32 Exhibit 32- Vaughan May 23 e-mail to Merz, # 33 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
November 13, 2008 Filing 286 RESPONSE in Opposition re 274 MOTION to Amend/Correct 117 Case Management Plan Tendered by, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Vaughan, Stephen)
November 10, 2008 Filing 285 MOTION for Extension of Time to November 13, 2008 to file response to 274 MOTION to Amend/Correct 117 Case Management Plan Tendered by, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting defts' 283 Motion for Continuance of Discovery Hearing currently set for 11/4/2008. SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Hearing RESET for 11/17/2008 10:30 AM in room #238 before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/31/08. (SWM)
October 29, 2008 Filing 283 MOTION for Continuance of Discovery Dispute Hearing Scheduled for November 4, 2008, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 28, 2008 Filing 282 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Bernier, Inc., Claudia Navarro on 09/23/2008, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
October 28, 2008 Filing 281 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Paul MacNeill on 10/20/2008, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
October 28, 2008 Filing 280 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Renee Kenny on 09/29/2008, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
October 28, 2008 Filing 279 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Sandra Gonzales on 09/25/2008, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
October 28, 2008 Filing 278 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Carol Cervantes on 10/01/2008, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
October 28, 2008 Filing 277 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Mario Cartaya on 09/24/2008, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
October 27, 2008 Filing 276 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorelli, Michael)
October 27, 2008 Filing 275 Statement of Compliance with Local Rule 37.1 by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Dorelli, Michael)
October 21, 2008 Filing 274 MOTION to Amend/Correct 117 Case Management Plan Tendered by, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendants STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dorelli, Michael)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting pltf/counter-deft's 271 Motion to Vacate Discovery Hearing currently set for 10/23/2008. SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing RESET for 11/4/2008 10:00 AM in room #238 before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/20/08. (SWM)
October 20, 2008 Filing 272 MOTION to Vacate the Discovery Hearing Set for October 23, 2008 and Reset the Hearing for the First Week of November, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorelli, Michael)
October 17, 2008 Filing 271 MOTION to Vacate Discovery Hearing Set for October 23, 2008 and Reset the Hearing for the First Week of November, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 10/23/2008 02:00 PM in room #238 before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this hearing is to address a discovery dispute between the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/16/08.(SWM)
October 10, 2008 Filing 269 Oogles n Googles Branding, LLC's ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against STEVEN A. ESRIG, COUNTERCLAIM against STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., filed by OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Googles logo registration, # 2 Exhibit 2- N.J. Business Entity Status Report, # 3 Exhibit 3- Edell Sec. 8/15 Declaration)(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 10, 2008 Filing 268 Mendell Enterprises, LLC's ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by MENDELL ENTERPRISES, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 10, 2008 Filing 267 Rene Kenney's ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by RENE KENNEY.(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 10, 2008 Filing 266 Sandra Gonzalez' ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by SANDRA GONZALEZ.(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 10, 2008 Filing 265 Bernier, Inc.'s ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by BERNIER, INC..(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 10, 2008 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiff SANDRA GONZALEZ, Defendants RENE KENNEY, OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC, MENDELL ENTERPRISES, LLC, BERNIER, INC.. (Vaughan, Stephen)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting plaintiff's 261 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to defendant's Written Discovery to 11/5/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/3/08. (MAC)
October 1, 2008 Filing 262 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Case Management Plan Deadlines, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 1, 2008 Filing 261 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 5, 2008 to Respond to Written Discovery, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorelli, Michael)
September 25, 2008 Filing 260 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Parties appeared by counsel September 24, 2008, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. Conference concluded without further order. (TMA)
September 23, 2008 Filing 259 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. MENDELL ENTERPRISES, LLC served on 9/22/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
September 23, 2008 Filing 258 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC served on 9/22/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hoover, John)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting 245 Motion to Vacate the settlement conference currently scheduled for September 24, 2008, to the extent the settlement conference is vacated and reset as a telephonic status conference at the same date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 09/22/08. (TMA)
September 19, 2008 Filing 256 Summons Issued as to BERNIER, INC. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 255 Summons Issued as to MENDELL ENTERPRISES, LLC. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 254 Summons Issued as to OOGLES N GOOGLES BRANDING, LLC. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 253 Summons Issued as to SANDRA GONZALEZ. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 252 Summons Issued as to PAUL MACNEILL. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 251 Summons Issued as to CLAUDIA NAVARRO. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 250 Summons Issued as to ANDRIA BROWN. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 249 Summons Issued as to KEVIN BELIEU. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 248 Summons Issued as to CAROL CERVANTES. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 247 Summons Issued as to MARIO CARTAYA. (LBK)
September 19, 2008 Filing 246 Summons Issued as to RENE KENNEY. (LBK)
September 18, 2008 Filing 245 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate 179 OrderScheduling Order Scheduling Settlement Conference for September 24, 2008, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorelli, Michael)
September 16, 2008 Filing 244 ANSWER to 239 Answer to Amended ComplaintThird Party ComplaintCounterclaim, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC..(Dorelli, Michael)
September 15, 2008 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Dorelli on behalf of Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Dorelli, Michael)
September 9, 2008 Filing 242 NOTICE of Extension of Time to September 16, 2008 in which to 239 Answer to Amended ComplaintThird Party ComplaintCounterclaim, filed by Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC. (Hoover, John) Modified on 9/10/2008 (LBK).
September 9, 2008 Filing 241 Summons Issued as to STEVEN A. ESRIG, 19110 Montgomery Village Road, Montgomery Village, MD 20886. (LBK)
September 9, 2008 Filing 240 Summons Issued as to STEVEN A. ESRIG, 14701 Mockingbird Lane, Darnestown, MD 20874-3341. (LBK)
August 29, 2008 Filing 239 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against STEVEN A. ESRIG, COUNTERCLAIM against STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., filed by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Amended Counterclaim-Reg. No. 2,087,590, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Amended Counterclaim-N.J. Business Entity Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Amended Counterclaim-Edell Sec. 8/15 Declaration)(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 29, 2008 Filing 238 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by NICOLE PAULINO-LYTEL.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 29, 2008 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant PAUL MACNEILL. (Vaughan, Stephen)
August 29, 2008 Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant KECHIA LAKE. (Vaughan, Stephen)
August 29, 2008 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant LARRY BERNIER. (Vaughan, Stephen)
August 29, 2008 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant MARIO CARTAYA. (Vaughan, Stephen)
August 29, 2008 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant LARRY BERNIER. (Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 232 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., filed by OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Amended Counterclaim-Reg. No. 2,087,590, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Amended Counterclaim-N.J. Business Entity Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Amended Counterclaim-Edell Sec. 8/15 Declaration)(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 231 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by HEATHER GRIPKA.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 230 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by PAUL MACNEILL.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 229 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by WRAYLYNNE-PATRICK ENTERPRISES, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 228 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by AMANDA WILLIAMS, DONNIE WILLIAMS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 227 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by MARIA WEICHERT.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 226 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by JENNIFER WEBB, TY WEBB.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 225 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by CHRISTINE WATERBURY.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 224 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by WATERBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 223 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by VLC ENTERPRISES, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 222 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by MARGIE THOMAS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 221 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by HAMID TAVASSOLI, SAHAR TAVASSOLI.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 220 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by LEIGH SUNDLING.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 219 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by CORINNA SPARKS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 218 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by ROB SLYTER, ELIZABETH SLYTER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 217 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by BRYAN PULLARA, GISELLE PULLARA.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 216 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by BRITTANY PFEIFER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 215 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by CHRISTA OWENS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 214 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by BRENDA MURTY, CHARLES MURTY.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 213 Kerry Murray and Nicole Paulino's ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by KERRY MURRAY.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 212 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 211 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by TOM MEIER, KERI MEIER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 210 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by ELIZABETH LIN, WINSTON LIN.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 209 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by ROB LENDERMAN, STACEY LENDERMAN.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 208 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by KECHIA LAKE.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 207 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by DAVID KIRK, GENEVIEVE KIRK.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 206 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by KID SAVVEY, INC..(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 205 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by KATHERINE KAHLIG.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 204 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by AARON JACOBITZ, TORIE JACOBITZ.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 203 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by DEGLIN, J.E. INVESTMENTS, INC..(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 202 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by ISLAND GIRLS COMPANY, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 201 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by KRISTA HARPER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 200 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by BRENDA GROTHAUS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 199 Heather Gripka, Linda Oughton and Cari Oughton's ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by LINDA OUGHTON, CARI OUGHTON.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 198 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by CARRIE DIMARIA.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 197 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by DAVIS DENSON, BILLIE JOE DENSON.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 196 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by MICHELLE DABEK.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 195 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by STEVE CURL, TARA CURL.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 194 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by MELISSA CULP.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 193 Michelle Cote and Paul MacNeill's ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by MICHELLE COTE.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 192 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by TINA CARTAYA, MARIO CARTAYA.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 191 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by CYNTHIA BROWN.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 190 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by RENE BOOP.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 189 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by JASON BLACKHURST, SHELLEY BLACKHURST.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 188 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by LARRY BERNIER, KAREN BERNIER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 187 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by MARY CLAIRE BALKO.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 186 ANSWER to 183 Amended Complaint, filed by KRISTA ALLENSTEIN.(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 28, 2008 Filing 185 REPORT - Patent & Trademark Form AO 120 sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (LBK) Modified on 9/4/2008 (LBK).
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting Oogles n Googles Franschising LLC's 181 Motion for Leave to File amended counterclaim w/i ten (10) business days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/22/08. (SWM)
August 22, 2008 Filing 183 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC. (Third amended complaint)(SWM)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting pltf's 180 Motion for Leave to File amended complaint to add additional defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/22/08. (SWM)
August 15, 2008 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaim, filed by Counter Claimant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC, Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Amended Counterclaim, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Amended Counterclaim- Reg. No. 2,087,590, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Amended Counterclaim- N.J. Business Entity Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Amended Counterclaim- Edell Sec. 8/15 Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
August 15, 2008 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER on 7/24/08 Telephonic Status Conference and ORDER setting Settlement Conference and Related Deadlines. Parties appeared by counsel 7/24/08 for a telephonic status conference. Discussion held regrading discovery, settlement, and related matters. SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/24/2008 09:00 AM in room #234 before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Confidential settlement statements due three business days prior to the conference (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/25/08.(SWM)
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER on 6/11/08 Telephonic Status Conference. Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. Pltf shall respond to deft Oogles N Googles' interrogatories and request for production by 7/11/08. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/24/2008 11:00 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to address settlement in light of pltf's discovery responses and other developments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/12/08.(SWM)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 176 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/10/08. (CBU)
June 6, 2008 Filing 176 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES FRANCHISING LLC. (Vaughan, Stephen)
June 6, 2008 Filing 175 Bryan and Giselle Pullara's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by BRYAN PULLARA, GISELLE PULLARA.(Vaughan, Stephen)
June 6, 2008 Filing 174 Maria Weichert's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by MARIA WEICHERT.(Vaughan, Stephen)
June 6, 2008 Filing 173 Brenda Grothaus' ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by BRENDA GROTHAUS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
June 6, 2008 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants MARIA WEICHERT, BRENDA GROTHAUS, BRYAN PULLARA, GISELLE PULLARA. (Vaughan, Stephen)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Conference set for 6/11/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to address discovery issues and scheduling matters. Parties shall appear by counsel, who shall call the number provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/5/08.(SWM) Modified on 6/6/2008 (SWM).
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SCHEDULING ORDER: The jury trial in this case currently set for8/11/2008 and the final pretrial conference set for 8/1/2008 are VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/20/2009 at 11:00 AM in room #330. Jury Trial RESET for 3/2/2009 at 09:00 AM in room #344; both before Judge David Frank Hamilton. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 6/3/2008.(LSC)
June 3, 2008 Filing 169 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES for Chief Judge David F. Hamilton. (LSC)
June 2, 2008 Filing 168 ENTRY re 116 Case Management Plan. CMP denied (Marginal Entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/2/08.(SWM)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER on Amended Case Management Plan: The amended CMP filed by the Deft on 4/16/08, [Docket No. 117, Ex. 1] is approved as follows (See Order). Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/2/08.(SWM)
May 19, 2008 Filing 166 Aaron and Torie Jacobitz ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by AARON JACOBITZ, TORIE JACOBITZ.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 19, 2008 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants AARON JACOBITZ, TORIE JACOBITZ. (Vaughan, Stephen)
May 14, 2008 Filing 164 Summons Issued as to MARIA WEICHERT, BRENDA GROTHAUS, KECHIA LAKE, NICOLE PAULINO-LYTEL, BRYAN PULLARA, GISELLE PULLARA, ELIZABETH PORCELLI. (LSC)
May 8, 2008 Filing 163 Katherine Kahlig's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by KATHERINE KAHLIG.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 8, 2008 Filing 162 David and Genevieve Kirk's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by DAVID KIRK, GENEVIEVE KIRK.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 8, 2008 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants DAVID KIRK, GENEVIEVE KIRK, KATHERINE KAHLIG. (Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 160 J.E. Deglin Investments, Inc.'s ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by DEGLIN, J.E. INVESTMENTS, INC..(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 159 Carrie DiMaria's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by CARRIE DIMARIA.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 158 Wraylynn-Patrick Enterprises, LLC's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by WRAYLYNNE-PATRICK ENTERPRISES, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 157 Amanda and Donnie Williams' ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by AMANDA WILLIAMS, DONNIE WILLIAMS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 156 Jennifer and Ty Webb's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by JENNIFER WEBB, TY WEBB.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 155 Waterbury Enterprises, LLC's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by WATERBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 154 VLC Enterprises, LLC's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by VLC ENTERPRISES, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 153 Hamid and Sahar Tavasolli's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by HAMID TAVASSOLI, SAHAR TAVASSOLI.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 152 Brittany Pfeifer's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by BRITTANY PFEIFER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 151 Christa Owens' ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by CHRISTA OWENS.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 150 Charles Murty's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by CHARLES MURTY.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 149 Kerry Murray and Nicole Paulino-Lytel's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by KERRY MURRAY, NICOLE PAULINO-LYTEL.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant KERRY MURRAY. (Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 147 Tom and Keri Meier's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by TOM MEIER, KERI MEIER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 146 Elizabeth and Winston Lin's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by ELIZABETH LIN, WINSTON LIN.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 145 Kid Savvey, Inc.'s ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by KID SAVVEY, INC..(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 144 Island Girls Company, LLC's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by ISLAND GIRLS COMPANY, LLC.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 143 Krista Harper's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by KRISTA HARPER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 142 Heather Gripka, Linda Oughton, and Cari Oughton's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by HEATHER GRIPKA, LINDA OUGHTON, CARI OUGHTON.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 141 David and Billie Jo Denson's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by DAVIS DENSON, BILLIE JOE DENSON.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 140 Michelle Dabek's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by MICHELLE DABEK.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 139 Steve and Tara Curl's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by STEVE CURL, TARA CURL.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 138 Melissa Culp's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by MELISSA CULP.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 137 Cynthia Brown's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by CYNTHIA BROWN.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 136 Rene Boop's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by RENE BOOP.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 135 Jason and Shelley Blackhurst's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by JASON BLACKHURST, SHELLEY BLACKHURST.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 134 Larry and Karen Bernier's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by LARRY BERNIER, KAREN BERNIER.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 133 Maryclaire Balko's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by MARY CLAIRE BALKO.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 132 Krista Allenstein's ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by KRISTA ALLENSTEIN.(Vaughan, Stephen)
May 5, 2008 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants LARRY BERNIER, KAREN BERNIER, DAVIS DENSON, BILLIE JOE DENSON, CYNTHIA BROWN, KRISTA ALLENSTEIN, JASON BLACKHURST, SHELLEY BLACKHURST, VLC ENTERPRISES, LLC, MELISSA CULP, WATERBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC, ELIZABETH LIN, WINSTON LIN, ISLAND GIRLS COMPANY, LLC, WRAYLYNNE-PATRICK ENTERPRISES, LLC, DEGLIN, J.E. INVESTMENTS, INC., AMANDA WILLIAMS, DONNIE WILLIAMS, CHARLES MURTY, HEATHER GRIPKA, LINDA OUGHTON, CARI OUGHTON, MICHELLE DABEK, STEVE CURL, TARA CURL, CARRIE DIMARIA, TOM MEIER, KERI MEIER, MARY CLAIRE BALKO, BRITTANY PFEIFER, NICOLE PAULINO-LYTEL, CHRISTA OWENS, KRISTA HARPER, HAMID TAVASSOLI, SAHAR TAVASSOLI, RENE BOOP, JENNIFER WEBB, TY WEBB, KID SAVVEY, INC., KEVIN MENDELL. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting deft Oogles N Googles 115 Motion to correct name of deft. The clerk is directed to reflect its correct legal name "Oogles n Googles Franchising LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/18/08. (SWM)
April 18, 2008 Filing 129 MOTION for Extension of Time to May 16, 2008 to Respond to Discovery, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Hoover, John)
April 17, 2008 Filing 128 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by CHRISTINE WATERBURY.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 127 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by MARGIE THOMAS.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 126 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by LEIGH SUNDLING.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 125 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by ROB SLYTER, ELIZABETH SLYTER.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 124 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by CORINNA SPARKS.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 123 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by BRENDA MURTY.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 122 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by ROB LENDERMAN, STACEY LENDERMAN.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 121 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by MICHELLE COTE.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 120 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by TINA CARTAYA.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 119 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, filed by KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL.(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 17, 2008 Filing 118 ANSWER to 94 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., filed by OOGLES N GOOGLES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Googles logo trademark registration, # 2 Exhibit 2- New Jersey Business Entity Status Report on Googles Childrens Workshop dissolution, # 3 Exhibit 3- Googles Childrens Workshop Section 8/15 affidavit)(Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 4/18/2008 (LSC).
April 16, 2008 Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Counter Claimant OOGLES N GOOGLES, Defendants MICHELLE COTE, ROB LENDERMAN, STACEY LENDERMAN, BRENDA MURTY, MARGIE THOMAS, ROB SLYTER, ELIZABETH SLYTER, CORINNA SPARKS, CHRISTINE WATERBURY, LEIGH SUNDLING, TINA CARTAYA, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Defendants' Proposed Case Management Plan, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2- Magistrate Judge's Summary of Case Management Plan)(Vaughan, Stephen)
April 16, 2008 Filing 116 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., Counter Defendant STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Hoover, John)
April 16, 2008 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION to Correct Name of "OoglesnGoogles, an Indiana Corporation", filed by Counter Claimant OOGLES N GOOGLES, Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting deft's 113 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Management Plan to 4/16/2008. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 4/10/2008. (LSC)
April 9, 2008 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to April 16, 2008 in which to 93 Order on Motion for Leave to File Revised Case Management Plan, filed by Counter Claimant OOGLES N GOOGLES, Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
April 8, 2008 Filing 112 Summons Issued as to Mario Cartaya, Paul MacNeill, TINA CARTAYA, LARRY BERNIER, KAREN BERNIER, DAVIS DENSON, BILLIE JOE DENSON, AARON JACOBITZ, TORIE JACOBITZ, CYNTHIA BROWN, MELISSA KELSEY, KRISTA ALLENSTEIN, JASON BLACKHURST, SHELLEY BLACKHURST, VLC ENTERPRISES, LLC, MELISSA CULP, WATERBURY ENTERPRISES, LLC, ELIZABETH LIN, WINSTON LIN, ISLAND GIRLS COMPANY, LLC, DAVID KIRK, GENEVIEVE KIRK, WRAYLYNNE-PATRICK ENTERPRISES, LLC, DEGLIN, J.E. INVESTMENTS, INC., KATHERINE KAHLIG, AMANDA WILLIAMS, DONNIE WILLIAMS, CHARLES MURTY, DARRIN DUNNE, HEATHER GRIPKA, LINDA OUGHTON, CARI OUGHTON, MICHELLE DABEK, STEVE CURL, TARA CURL, CARRIE DIMARIA, KECHIA LAKE, CARYLEEN GUNDERMAN, TOM MEIER, KERI MEIER, MARY CLAIRE BALKO, BRITTANY PFEIFER, KERRY MURRAY, NICOLE PAULINO-LYTEL, CHRISTA OWENS, KRISTA HARPER, HAMID TAVASSOLI, SAHAR TAVASSOLI, RENE BOOP, BRYAN PULLARA, GISELLE PULLARA, ELIZABETH PORCELLI, JENNIFER WEBB, TY WEBB, KID SAVVEY, INC. (LSC) Modified on 4/9/2008 (LSC).
April 7, 2008 Filing 111 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CHRISTINE WATERBURY. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 110 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MARGIE THOMAS. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 109 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LEIGH SUNDLING. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 108 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ROB SLYTER, ELIZABETH SLYTER, CORINNA SPARKS. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 107 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Counter Claimant OOGLES N GOOGLES, Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 106 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant BRENDA MURTY. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 105 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 104 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ROB LENDERMAN, STACEY LENDERMAN. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 103 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants MICHELLE COTE, TINA CARTAYA. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant CHRISTINE WATERBURY. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant MARGIE THOMAS. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant LEIGH SUNDLING. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendant BRENDA MURTY. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants ROB SLYTER, ELIZABETH SLYTER, CORINNA SPARKS. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants ROB LENDERMAN, STACEY LENDERMAN. (Vaughan, Stephen)
April 7, 2008 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants MICHELLE COTE, TINA CARTAYA. (Vaughan, Stephen)
March 27, 2008 Filing 95 ANSWER to 88 Counterclaim, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC..(Hoover, John)
March 20, 2008 Filing 94 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC. (Second Amended Complaint)(SWM)
March 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER on 3/17/08 Telephonic Status Conference: Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. Pltf's motion for leave to file second amended complaint to add additonal parties 83 is granted. Counsel shall file any motion to revise the CMP w/i 20 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/20/08. (SWM)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 89 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Robert Merz for STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/11/08. (SWM)
March 7, 2008 Filing 91 RECEIPT #IP006006 in the amount of $ 30.00 - atty Merz pro hac vice filing fee. (LSC)
March 7, 2008 Filing 90 NOTICE of Substitution of Appearance by Robert Merz replacing Kevin Kaplan on behalf of STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hoover, John) Modified on 3/10/2008 (LSC).
March 7, 2008 Filing 89 MOTION to Appear pro hac vice of Attorney Robert Merz, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
March 7, 2008 Filing 88 COUNTERCLAIM against STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., filed by OOGLES N GOOGLES.(Vaughan, Stephen)
March 7, 2008 Filing 87 Amended ANSWER to 31 Amended Complaint, filed by all defendants.(Vaughan, Stephen)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting pltf's 82 Motion for Extension of Time to File expert disclosures to 3/31/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/5/08. (SWM)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting deft Oogles n Googles' 81 Motion for Leave to File Counterclaim w/i five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/5/08. (SWM)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting defts' 80 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to pltf's amended complaint w/i five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/5/08. (SWM)
February 29, 2008 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Add Additional Parties, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
February 29, 2008 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2008 To File Expert Disclosure, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
February 29, 2008 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim, filed by Defendant OOGLES N GOOGLES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Counterclaim, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
February 29, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER on 1/17/08 Telephonic Status Conference: Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. The Court issued the following orders: Defts' motion to reinstate stay of proceedings 77 is denied. The joint motion to extend certain CMP deadlines 75 is granted (See Order for established deadlines). Defts shall respond to pltf's interrogatories and request for production served on the Mendell and Oogles N Googles defts by 1/25/08. Deft shall respond to pltf's interrogatories and request for production directed to the franchisees by 2/11/08. Counsel shall separately contact the Mag Judge after the foregoing discovery is produced to provide an update on the parties' settlement positions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/17/08. (SWM)
January 15, 2008 Filing 78 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 77 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Book Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 2- Googles logo trademark, # 3 Exhibit 3- Googles logo trademark registration, # 4 Exhibit 3- Oogle, Oggle, Iggle characters, # 5 Exhibit 4- GCW Business Entity report, # 6 Exhibit 6- Bureau of Prisons Report, # 7 Exhibit 7- Assignment, # 8 Exhibit 8- Aroura License, # 9 Exhibit 9- 2004 Stelor v. Silvers complaint, # 10 Cover Sheet for Sealed Document 10- 2005 Silvers v. Stelor complaint, # 11 Exhibit 11- 2005 Stelor v. Silvers complaint, # 12 Exhibit 12- 2005 Silvers v. Google,Inc. complaint, # 13 Exhibit 13- Google, Inc.'s answer and counterclaim, # 14 Exhibit 14- Silvers v. Google, Inc. docket sheet, # 15 Exhibit 15- Oogles n Googles trademark, # 16 Exhibit 16- USPTO Office Action on Oogles n Googles trademark)(Vaughan, Stephen)
January 15, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vaughan, Stephen)
January 8, 2008 Filing 76 Submission Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines in Case Management Plan Order, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL, Plaintiffs STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Kaplan, Kevin)
January 7, 2008 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 29, 2008 Certain Deadlines in Case Management Plan Order, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL, Plaintiffs STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC., STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Kaplan, Kevin)
November 15, 2007 Filing 74 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Vaughan, Stephen)
November 15, 2007 Filing 73 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Vaughan, Stephen)
October 17, 2007 Filing 72 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by all defendants.(Vaughan, Stephen)
October 2, 2007 Filing 71 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures (Amended), filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Kaplan, Kevin)
September 28, 2007 Filing 70 Submission Defendants' Initial Disclosures, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Vaughan, Stephen)
September 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2008 at 09:00 AM in room #330. Jury Trial set for 8/11/2008 at 09:00 AM in room #344; both before Judge David Frank Hamilton. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 9/21/2007. (LSC)
September 17, 2007 Filing 68 NOTICE of Withdrawal of 34 Motion to Dismiss (see 56 Order also), filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL (Vaughan, Stephen) Modified on 9/18/2007 (LSC).
September 7, 2007 Opinion or Order **Continuation of Docket Entry 67 **SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 1/17/2008 10:00 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/7/07. (MAC)
September 7, 2007 Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tim A. Baker : Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/6/2007. The Proposed CMP 66 is approved, provided, however, that the CMP is amended to reflect that Stelor Productions is not the licensee for the terms and/or designs at issue, but rather is the owner of those terms and/or designs by assignment. The Stay is this action is lifted. Defendant shall move to withdraw the pending motion to dismiss 34 or file a notice of its desire to obtain a filing within 10 days. (MAC) Modified on 9/10/2007 (MAC).
September 4, 2007 Filing 66 Amended CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Case Management Summary)(Kaplan, Kevin) Modified on 9/5/2007 (LSC).
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER on 6/14/07 Telephonic Status Conference. Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/6/2007 01:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to address settlement and case management. Counsel shall file a proposed, revised CMP at least three days prior to the 9/6/07 conference in the event that counsel anticipates asking the Court to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/19/07. (SWM)
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bryan S. Redding withdrawn. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/18/07. (SWM)
June 14, 2007 Filing 63 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting withdraw)(Redding, Bryan)
June 6, 2007 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Lewis Vaughan on behalf of Defendants XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Vaughan, Stephen)
March 1, 2007 Opinion or Order **Continuation of 61 **SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/14/2007 04:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to address the status of the stay and the Florida Litigation. If parties anticipate requesting the Court to lift the stay, the parties shall file a proposed, revised Case Management Plan at least three days prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/1/07. (MAC)
March 1, 2007 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tim A. Baker : Telephone Status Conference held on 3/1/2007. Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding the pending stay and related matters. (MAC)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER on 12/18/06 Telephonic Status Conference. Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding the pending stay and related matters. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/1/2007 04:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to address the status of the stay and the Florida litigation. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/19/06. (SWM)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER: In view of Magistrate Judge Baker's Order of 2/10/2006 staying this action, the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled in this action for 10/27/2006, and the jury trial scheduled in this action for 11/6/2006 are VACATED.(LSC)
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER on 8/10/06 Telephonic Status Conference: Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding the stay of this action and related matters. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/18/2006 01:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to address the status of the stay and the Florida litigation. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/11/06. (SWM, )
February 10, 2006 Opinion or Order *** CONTINUATION OF DOCKET NUMBER 57 *** SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/10/2006 10:00 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker (See Order). Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/10/06. (SWM, )
February 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER on 2/9/06 Telephonic Status Conference. Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding pending motions and related matters. Based upon the stipulation of the parties, the Court now orders as follows: (1) the pending motion to dismiss and motion to compel [Docket Nos. 34, 54] are withdrawn w/o prejudice to refile these motions; and (2) this action is stayed pending further order. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/10/06. (SWM, )
February 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting pltf's 55 Motion for Telephonic Pretrial Conference. SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2006 01:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall appear by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660 for this conference. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 2/1/06. (SWM, )
January 27, 2006 Filing 55 MOTION for Pretrial Conference , Telephonic by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
January 10, 2006 Filing 54 MOTION to Compel by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zack, David)
December 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting IN PART parties' 52 Joint Motion to modify order on pretrial schedule and CMP Order. Dispositive Motions (if any) due by 7/1/2006 (See Order for other established deadlines). SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/27/2006 10:00 AM in room #330 before Judge David Frank Hamilton. Jury Trial RESET for 11/6/2006 09:00 AM in room #344 before Judge David Frank Hamilton. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 12/2/05. (SWM, )
December 1, 2005 Filing 52 Joint MOTION to Modify Order on Final Pretrial Schedule and Trial Setting and CMP Order, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.(Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Zack, David) Modified on 12/2/2005 (LSC, ).
October 31, 2005 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Part 1 of 2# 2 Exhibit 1-Part 2 of 2# 3 Exhibit 2-Part 1 of 2# 4 Exhibit 2-Part 2 of 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4)(Zack, David)
October 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting pltf's 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 10/31/2005 re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/25/05. (SWM, )
October 24, 2005 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/31/05 to file response to 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting pltf's 45 Agreed Motion to substitute parties. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/24/05. (SWM, )
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER withdrawing pltfs' 41 and 42 Motion(s) to Substitute Party. ORDER granting pltf's 44 Motion to Withdraw motion(s) to substitute parties. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/24/05. (SWM, )
October 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting pltf's 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 10/24/2005 re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/21/05. (SWM, )
October 19, 2005 Filing 45 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Parties, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zack, David) Modified on 10/20/2005 (LSC, ).
October 19, 2005 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zack, David)
October 17, 2005 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 24, 2005 to file response to 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Kevin)
October 17, 2005 Filing 42 *** WITHDRAWN PER ORDER DATED 10/24/05 *** MOTION to Substitute Party by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Parties)(Zack, David) Modified on 3/21/2008 (SWM).
October 17, 2005 Filing 41 *** WITHDRAWN PER ORDER DATED 10/24/05 *** MOTION to Substitute Party by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Zack, David) Modified on 3/21/2008 (SWM).
September 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; defendants shall serve and file within 5 days, either any additional affidavits in support of motion for a notice that no affidavits will be filed. Plaintiff shall have 15 days thereafter to serve and file its Answer Brief . Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/26/05. (MAC, )
September 26, 2005 Filing 39 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 3)# 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3 of 3))(Redding, Bryan)
September 23, 2005 Filing 38 Submission Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer Brief to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Kaplan, Kevin)
September 23, 2005 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to 15 days after service of Defendants' affidavit to file response to 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Kaplan, Kevin)
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER on 9/16/05 telephonic status conference. Parties appeared by counsel. Discussion held regarding settlement and related matters. Given the issues raised in the pending motion to dismiss [Docket No. 34], settlement is not possible at this time. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/21/05. (SWM, )
September 16, 2005 Filing 35 Witness List & Exhibit List (Preliminary) by all defendants. (Redding, Bryan)
September 8, 2005 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Redding, Bryan)
September 8, 2005 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan S. Redding on behalf of all defendants (Redding, Bryan)
August 30, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/16/2005 03:30 PM Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of this conference is to address settlement. Counsel shall confer in person or by telephone prior to this conference and shall submit to the Mag Judge a joint statement regarding status of settlement at least three days prior to the Sept 16 conference. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/30/05. (SWM, )
August 16, 2005 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC..(Zack, David)
July 27, 2005 Filing 30 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time by all defendants (Redding, Bryan)
July 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David J. Zack for STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC. added . Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/19/05. (SWM, )
July 18, 2005 Filing 28 RECEIPT #108-1678 in the amount of $ 30.00, representing atty Zack's pro hac vice filing fee. (LSC, )
July 18, 2005 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear pro hac vice of David Zack by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, John)
July 13, 2005 Filing 26 Witness List and Exhibit List by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Hoover, John)
July 10, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on 7/7/2005 Telephonic Status Conference - Plaintiff is granted until 7/29/05 to file an amened complaint to name the franchisees as defendants and withdrawing 23 Motion to Compel . Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/10/05 -cm. (EAH, )
July 7, 2005 Filing 24 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 23 MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures from Defendants filed by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Hoover, John)
July 7, 2005 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Initial Disclosures from Defendants by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Hoover, John)
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2006 at 09:00 AM in room #330. Jury Trial set for 4/10/2006 at 09:00 AM in room #344; both before Judge David Frank Hamilton. Signed by Judge David Frank Hamilton on 6/15/2005. (LSC, )
June 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER APPROVED as amended. Parties appeared by counsel on 6/1/05 for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive motions due by 10/17/2005. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/7/2005 02:30 PM Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of the July 7 status conference is to address settlement. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/9/05. (SWM, )
May 26, 2005 Filing 20 Submission Magistrate Judge's Summary of Case Management Plan by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Hoover, John)
May 26, 2005 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED by all parties. (Hoover, John) Modified on 5/27/2005 (LSC, ).
May 4, 2005 Filing 18 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL, DANYA MENDELL.(Redding, Bryan)
April 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2005 02:30 PM in room #234 before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The CMP is due no less than seven days prior to the iptc. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/19/05. (SWM, )
April 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice - Attorney Kevin C Kaplan on behalf of PLTF. Signed by Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/11/05. (SWM, )
April 8, 2005 Filing 15 RECEIPT #102-6063 in the amount of $ 30.00 for atty Kaplan pro hac vice filing fee. (LSC, )
April 7, 2005 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear pro hac vice of Kevin C. Kaplan by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Hoover, John)
April 1, 2005 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties First Extension of Time to 5/2/2005 to respond to pltf's complaint, filed by XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL and DANYA MENDELL. (Redding, Bryan) Modified on 4/1/2005 (LSC, ).
April 1, 2005 Filing 12 **Please Disregard - see 13 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time*** - Submission of Motion for Automatic Extension of Time, filed by XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL and DANYA MENDELL. c/s (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LSC, ) Modified on 4/1/2005 (LSC, ).
April 1, 2005 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by atty Bryan S. Redding on behalf of XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL and DANYA MENDELL. (LSC, )
March 29, 2005 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Amended) by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Hoover, John)
March 23, 2005 Filing 9 RETURN of Service by CMRRR by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. OOGLES N GOOGLES served on 3/12/2005; KEVIN MENDELL served on 3/17/2005; DANYA MENDELL served on 3/17/2005. (Hoover, John)
March 23, 2005 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Hoover, John)
March 14, 2005 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement issued by Clerk to counsel for Plaintiff, STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC. c/m (KLS, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by John David Hoover on behalf of Plaintiff, STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC. (KLS, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 5 RECEIPT #108 1102 in the amount of $ 250.00 for filing fee. (KLS, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL and DANYA MENDELL. (KLS, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction (KLS, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff, STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC. (KLS, )
March 11, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XYZ CORPORATIONS, OOGLES N GOOGLES, KEVIN MENDELL AND DANYA MENDELL with JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff, STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC.(KLS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STELOR PRODUCTIONS, INC. v. OOGLES N GOOGLES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OOGLES N GOOGLES
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MENDELL
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANYA MENDELL
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS
Represented By: Stephen Lewis Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELOR PRODUCTIONS, LLC.
Represented By: David John Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?