GAST et al v. DRAGON ESP, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: GREG GAST and MARY BETH GAST
Defendant: DRAGON ESP, LTD., CRENSHAW REAL PROPERTIES, IV, LTD., THE FULTON COUNTY PLAN COMMISSION, THE MODERN GROUP GP-SUB, INC. and W. CRENSHAW MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00465
Filed: April 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENTRY granting Fulton County Plan Commission's 50 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/12/2010. (PG)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENTRY denying MODERN GROUP GP-SUB, INC.S AND W. CRENSHAWMANAGEMENT, LLCS 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (see Entry). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/30/2010. (PG)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENTRY Sustaining Moderns and Crenshaw Managements Objection re 40 to Plaintiff's Second Supplement. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/10/2010.(PG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAST et al v. DRAGON ESP, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREG GAST
Represented By: Philip Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY BETH GAST
Represented By: Philip Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAGON ESP, LTD.
Represented By: Rafael A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRENSHAW REAL PROPERTIES, IV, LTD.
Represented By: Rafael A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FULTON COUNTY PLAN COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MODERN GROUP GP-SUB, INC.
Represented By: Rafael A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. CRENSHAW MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Rafael A. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?