JORLING v. ANTHEM, INC. et al
Plaintiff: |
JEFFREY D. JORLING |
Defendant: |
ANTHEM, INC. and ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES, INC. |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00798 |
Filed: |
June 26, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Tim A. Baker |
Presiding Judge: |
William T. Lawrence |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 23, 2011 |
Filing
231
ENTRY on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment - Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment (Dkt. 138 ) is GRANTED; Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 220 ) is GRANTE D; and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. All other pending motions (which relate to class certification, discovery issues, and oral arguments) Dkt. 132 , Dkt. 134 , Dkt. 167 , and Dkt. 217 are DENIED AS MOOT. A final judgment will accompany this entry. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/23/2011. (TRG)
|
August 25, 2011 |
Filing
210
ORDER denying Defts' 168 Motion for Reconsideration. Defts shall produce the documents on pages three and four of pltf's opening brief [Docket No. 117] within fourteen days (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/25/2011. (SWM)
|
July 20, 2011 |
Filing
200
ENTRY ON PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER - Plaintiffs' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order (Dkt. 93 ) are DENIED. If, however, the GFGs issues are still in play following the Court's summary judgment ruling, the Plaintiffs will be permitted to renew this motion within 30 days of the date of the ruling. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/20/2011. (JD)
|
June 22, 2011 |
Filing
185
MARGINAL ENTRY re 178 MOTION to Seal Document (see Entry). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/22/2011.(SWM)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
154
ORDER granting IN PART Pltfs' 116 Motion to Compel (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/24/2011. (SWM)
|
December 23, 2010 |
Filing
88
ENTRY DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION - For the reasons set forth, the Court DENIES 33 Motion for Class Certification. (**SEE ENTRY**) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/23/2010. (JD)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 63 Motion to enforce discovery orders. In addition, both sides have submitted proposed modifications to the Case Management Plan, and the CMP is modified as set out below. All dispositive mot ions shall be filed by April 18, 2011. Oppositions to dispositive motions shall be filed by May 16, 2011. Replies in support of dispositive motions shall be filed by May 31, 2011 (see Order for other estalished deadlines and other details). In Jor ling, the Magistrate Judge recommends that the final pretrial conference set forJanuary 13, 2011, and the trial set to begin on February 7, 2011, be vacated and reset. Jorling will be ready for trial in December 2011, and trial is anticipated to last approximately three weeks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/12/2010. (SWM)
|
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
57
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Parties appeared by counsel on May 20, 2010, for a telephonic conference to address pending discovery-related motions. Parties were given an opportunity to be heard on all issues . After considering the parties' briefing and arguments, the Court rules as follows: Defendants' motion to stay expert and damages discovery and for a protective order pending a summary judgment decision in Ormond v. Anthem, No. 1:05-cv- 1 908-SEB-TAB, 52 is denied. Plaintiff's motion to take excess depositions 55 is granted in part. Because the Court is allowing some discovery to proceed, Plaintiff's motion to extend case management deadlines 47 is granted in part (see Order for other details and established deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker.(SWM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?