JAMES v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS M. JAMES
Defendant: GEO GROUP, INC., JEFFREY WRIGLES, CMS, JOHN DOE, WISHARD HOSPITAL IN, JOHN AND JANE DOE, DORA B. SCHRINO, AOW WAGNER, C.O. IV STEVWING, III MACATHER, TAMMY SHROEDOR, TERRY ALLNED, SHEETS, PAULIE, RONALD G. QUINTIA, DOCTOR WHITE, DENNIS G. CHENAIL, ANY/AND/ALL: JOHN AND JANE DOE'S, ANY/AND/ALL- BLACK AND WHITE ENTITIES- A-Z and ELI LORENZO
Case Number: 1:2009cv01204
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Entry Discussing Motion to Reconsider: DENIED 41 Motion to Reconsider ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 9/29/2010. (DWH)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENTRY AND ORDER: Claims against GEO Group, Inc. ("GEO"), Correctional Medical Services ("CMS"), and Wishard Hospital are dismissed. Claims against Superintendent Jeffrey Wrigles are dismissed. Claims against "all others act ing in concert," "ABC-XYZ Corp." and "ll black and white entities A-Z" are dismissed. The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), to issue and serve process on defendants Dr. Eli Lorenzo, Officer Leflore, and Dr. Nicolas Villanustre1 in the manner specified by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(1) **SEE ENTRY AND ORDER**. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/30/2010.(DWH)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTRY Discussing Amended Complaint and Again Directing Further Proceedings: James shall have through March 26, 2010, in which to file a second amended complaint **SEE ENTRY**. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/24/2010.(DWH)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY - The plaintiff's motion to amend/correct (dkt 9 ) and the plaintiff's motion for leave to amend (dkt 8 ) are each granted in part and denied in part, consistent with the following: The plaintiff shall have through January 13, 2010, in which to file an amended complaint as previously directed. The plaintiff's request for relief from the strictures of Rule 18 is denied. The plaintiff's request to reconsider any feature of the Entry of November 23, 2009, is denied. All other relief which can be understood as sought in such motions is denied. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/28/2009. (TRG)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings: For the reasons explained in this Entry, the complaint of Thomas M. James ("James") is rejected and he will be given an opportunity to file an amended complaint. James shall have through december 10, 2009, in which to file an amended complaint which does not violate Rule 18. Proceedings other than as specified above are STAYED until further order **SEE ENTRY**. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/23/2009.(DWH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS M. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY WRIGLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WISHARD HOSPITAL IN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORA B. SCHRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOW WAGNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. IV STEVWING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: III MACATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAMMY SHROEDOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY ALLNED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD G. QUINTIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS G. CHENAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANY/AND/ALL: JOHN AND JANE DOE'S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANY/AND/ALL- BLACK AND WHITE ENTITIES- A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELI LORENZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?