DUKES v. COX et al
Case Number: |
1:2009cv01440 |
Filed: |
November 19, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
David Frank Hamilton |
Presiding Judge: |
Debra McVicker Lynch |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 18, 2015 |
Filing
371
ORDER. Ms. Dukes' Motion to Set Aside or Stay Judgment or Order Pending Outcome of Appeal, [Filing No. 356], and Defendants' Motion to Strike Sealed Document, [Filing No. 366], are DENIED. The Court notes that Ms. Dukes filed a Notice of Appeal on August 19, 2015, [Filing No. 358], and that her appeal is proceeding before the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/18/2015. Copy sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (BGT)
|
July 22, 2015 |
Filing
354
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 351 Motion to Correct Error and Alternatively Relief from Judgment. Presently pending before the Court is Plaintiff Theresa L. Dukes' Motion to Correct Error And Alternatively For Relief from Judgment. [Filin g No. 351.] Ms. Dukes asks for relief from the Final Judgment this Court entered in favor of Defendants on May 15, 2015, [Filing No. 349], after dismissing Ms. Dukes' case with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(b) and 16(f), [Filing No. 348]. Defendants oppose Ms. Dukes' motion. [Filing No. 352; Filing No. 353.] For the reasons that follow, the Court denies Ms. Dukes' motion. [Filing No. 351]. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/22/2015. Copy sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (BGT)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
348
ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, the Court GRANTS IN PART Defendants' motion, [Filing No. 325], such that Ms. Dukes' case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(b) and 16(f). Given that there wil l be not be a trial, Defendants' request to exclude Ms. Dukes' presentation of exhibits at trial is DENIED AS MOOT, as are all other motions and deadlines currently pending in this litigation. [Filing No. 329; Filing No. 335; Filing No. 337; Filing No. 338.] Final judgment shall issue accordingly. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/15/2015. Copy sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (BGT)
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
310
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 307 Motion to Reconsider. The deadlines set forth in the Amended Final Pretrial Order, [Filing No. 304], remain in effect, subject to the two-week extension the Court already granted, [Filing No. 306]. The first d eadlines fall on April 17, 2015. The final pretrial conference remains scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on May 15, 2015, and the jury trial remains scheduled to begin on June 8, 2015. A copy of this entry is being emailed to Ms. Dukes to ensure its timely receipt, given the impending deadlines. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/16/2015. Copy sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail and Electronic Mail. (BGT)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing
206
ORDER granting 149 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - For the reasons stated herein, the Court GRANTS summary judgment in favor of the Defendants on Ms. Dukes' claim for civil conspiracy pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §1983. [Dkt. 149.] Acco rdingly, Ms. Dukes' civil conspiracy claim against the Defendants is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This matter will proceed to trial on the remainder of Ms. Dukes' claims. No final judgment will issue at this time. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/27/2012. (copy to Theresa Dukes via US Mail) (JKS)
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
109
Order Following In Camera Review. Ms. Dukes is granted a protective order against providing any of the redacted information and records to the defendants, except for the information stated in the Order. For the revised redacted page 2, Ms. Dukes sha ll produce the revised document to the defendants within fourteen (14) days of this entry. The plaintiff's Request for Copy of Transcript and Request for Continuance of Response (Dkt. 108 ) is denied without prejudice in part and denied in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/17/2011. (LH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?