SITUS, INC. v. SITUS REALTY CORP.
Plaintiff: SITUS, INC.
Defendant: SITUS REALTY CORP.
Case Number: 1:2009cv01570
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2011 Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and the stipulation of dismissal filed by the parties, re #47 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case has been CLOSED. TEXT-ONLY: There is no pdf document associated with this entry. (PG)
June 14, 2011 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed an additional 30 days through and including Wednesday, June 15, 2011 to complete the execution of the settlement documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/11/2011. (LH)
May 10, 2011 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for an Additional 30 Days to Formalize a Settlement, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Stay proceedings an additional 30 days through and including 5/16/2011 to complete the execution of the settlement documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 4/13/2011. (MAC)
April 12, 2011 Filing 43 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for an Additional 30 Days to Formalize a Settlement, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/11/2011. (PG)
March 10, 2011 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 30 Days to Formalize a Settlement, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal - The court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this entry, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/10/2011. (TMA)
February 10, 2011 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 30 Days to Formalize a Settlement, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 7/1/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/13/2011. (TMA)
January 13, 2011 Filing 36 ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
January 12, 2011 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/11/2011. (See Entry re: Deadlines.) Telephone Status Conference set for 3/15/2011 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (TMA)
January 5, 2011 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant SITUS REALTY CORP.. (Jones, Kurt)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting deft's #32 Motion for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Confernce currently set for 1/7/2011. Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/11/2011 11:00 AM in room #524, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. All other requirements of the court's November 24, 2010 order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/16/2010.(SWM)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney John F. Bennett for SITUS, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/16/2010. (SWM)
December 15, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference, filed by Defendant SITUS REALTY CORP.. (Jones, Kurt)
December 14, 2010 Filing 31 RECEIPT #IP 21646 in the amount of $ 30.00 for phv fee, Bennett. (PG)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 plaintiff's motion for leave to appear at the initial pretrial conference by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/14/2010. (TMA)
December 13, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) John F. Bennett to Appear pro hac vice, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PG)
December 10, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION (Unopposed) to Attend Initial Pretrial Conference by Telephone, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kirsch, Kevin)
December 8, 2010 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Enlargement of Time for Plaintiff Situs, Inc. to Answer Counterclaim, re #23 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2011 09:30 AM in room #524, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/24/2010.(MAC)
November 22, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Brown on behalf of Defendant SITUS REALTY CORP.. (Brown, Christopher)
November 22, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt N. Jones on behalf of Defendant SITUS REALTY CORP.. (Jones, Kurt)
November 22, 2010 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against SITUS, INC., filed by SITUS REALTY CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Jones, Kurt)
November 4, 2010 Filing 22 ENTRY Discussing Pending Motions and giving Situs Realty Corp. through November 22, 2010, to appear by counsel and file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/4/2010. (PG)
May 25, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Situs Realty Corp.'s Failure to File and Serve Opposition, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC., re #20 MOTION to Strike #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. (Kirsch, Kevin)
May 7, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirsch, Kevin)
May 7, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by Defendant SITUS REALTY CORP. by Keith W. Stark, pro se (MAC)
May 7, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Entry of Default, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin W. Kirsch, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirsch, Kevin)
April 9, 2010 Filing 17 ENTRY granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to May 6, 2010; denying as moot #15 Motion for Entry of Default; denying as moot #16 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/9/2010. (PG)
April 7, 2010 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Kirsch, Kevin)
April 7, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kevin W. Kirsch, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Entry of Default)(Kirsch, Kevin)
April 7, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Kirsch on behalf of Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (Kirsch, Kevin)
April 2, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Defendant (Keith Stark) SITUS REALTY CORP. (PG)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading to 4/6/2010. If the defendant is in fact a corporation, any such answer or pleading on behalf of the defendant must be made by counsel because corporations may only litigate in this court if represented by counsel. United States v. Hagerman, 549 F.3d 536 (7th Cir. 2008) cm. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 2/16/2010. (MAC)
February 12, 2010 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by Plaintiff SITUS, INC.. (McIntyre, Michael)
February 3, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Deadline, filed by Defendant SITUS REALTY CORP. (PG)
February 2, 2010 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons CORRECTED served on Paul Reis, Registered Agent of Situs Realty Corp. on 1-12-10, filed by SITUS, INC.. (McIntyre, Michael)
January 21, 2010 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Paul Reis, Registered Agent of Situs Realty Corp. on 1/12/10, filed by SITUS, INC.. (McIntyre, Michael)
December 29, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (PG)
December 21, 2009 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DH)
December 21, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Scott McIntyre on behalf of Plaintiff, SITUS, INC. (DH)
December 21, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SITUS REALTY CORP. (DH)
December 21, 2009 Filing 3 RECEIPT #IP016022 in the amount of $350.00 for filing fee. (DH)
December 21, 2009 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff, SITUS, INC. (DH)
December 21, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SITUS REALTY CORP. filed by SITUS, INC.(DH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SITUS, INC. v. SITUS REALTY CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SITUS REALTY CORP.
Represented By: Christopher A. Brown
Represented By: Kurt N. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SITUS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Scott McIntyre
Represented By: Kevin W. Kirsch
Represented By: John F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?