THOMPSON et al. v. K.R. DRENTH TRUCKING, INC. et al.
Plaintiff: JASON THOMPSON, DALE C. DAVIS, WILLIAM E. BARNES and MARK A. HAYDEN
Defendant: KENNETH ANDRESEN, STEVEN RUCKERT, JOHN MCGEE, KENNETH S. DRENTH, THOMAS J. MANZKE and K.R. DRENTH TRUCKING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00135
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Presiding Judge: Larry J. McKinney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ENTRY - Defendants' Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Order Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) (Dkt. 86 ) is DENIED. As for Defendant's companion Motion for Stay of Proceedings (Dkt. 88 ), this motion will be GRANTED. Defendants have 14 days from the day of this entry to comply with the Court's directive to produce the following: the names, addresses, telephone numbers, dates of employment, location of employment, and dates of birth of all potential plaintiffs, which at thi s time are limited to employees who work/have worked in KRDs Indianapolis operations (on or after January 18, 2007). This directive must be adhered to without exception. The Court is not inclined to entertain another motion to stay. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/7/2011. (JD)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ENTRY ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER - Defendants' Motion to Reconsider (Dkt. 78 ) is DENIED. In conjunction with their Motion to Reconsider, Defendants moved the Court to stay enforcement of the Court's order instructing Defenda nts to electronically produce certain information on potential class members within 30 days. Defendants' Motion to Stay (Dkt. 80 ) is GRANTED, and Defendants have 14 days from the day of this entry to comply with the Court's directive to produce the requisite information. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/3/2011. (JD)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENTRY ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER - Largely driven by the procedural posture of this case, the Court has resolved to GRANT Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. 69 ) and their underlying Motion for Conditional Certification (Dkt. 19 ). **SEE ENTRY**. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/15/2011. (JD)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ENTRY on Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification and Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit - Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification and Notice of Collective Action [Dkt. 19 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/11/2011. (TRG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPSON et al. v. K.R. DRENTH TRUCKING, INC. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH ANDRESEN
Represented By: Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN RUCKERT
Represented By: Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN MCGEE
Represented By: Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH S. DRENTH
Represented By: Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. MANZKE
Represented By: Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.R. DRENTH TRUCKING, INC.
Represented By: Emmanuel V.R. Boulukos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON THOMPSON
Represented By: Ronald E. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALE C. DAVIS
Represented By: Ronald E. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM E. BARNES
Represented By: Ronald E. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK A. HAYDEN
Represented By: Ronald E. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?