BULL v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF BALL STATE UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN A. BULL
Defendant: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF BALL STATE UNIVERSITY, THOMAS COLLINS, JO ANN M. GORA and PATRICK A. QUINN
Case Number: 1:2010cv00878
Filed: July 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER - The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, dkt. 60 . Defendants are entitled to judgment as a matter of law on Ms. Bull's § 1983 Fourteenth Amendment and state-law defamation claim s. However, because Ms. Bull has offered admissible evidence of a sufficiently similar comparator who received a lesser sanction for dishonest conduct to rebut BSU's proffered, legitimate explanation for her termination, her Title IX and § 1983 First Amendment claims survive Defendants' motion. Counts I, IV, and V will be tried to a jury. (***SEE ORDER***). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/2/2012. (JKS)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - Presently pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony for Purposes of Summary Judgment, dkt. 85 , which the Court DENIES. Defendants have until February 24, 2012, to depose Plaintiff's expert witn esses and until March 9, 2012, to file a supplemental brief raising paragraph-specific, evidentiary objections. Plaintiff is ordered to make her experts available for deposition before February 24, 2012 at mutually convenient dates; the testimony of any expert unavailable for deposition before that time will be stricken. Thus it is the Court's intention that if mutual convenience is not achievable, Defendants' convenience shall take precedent. Any response by Ms. Bull to Defendan ts' objections must be filed by March 16, 2012. Defendants need not file a reply brief. Should Defendants choose not to pursue the depositions of Plaintiffs experts, they shall file a notice with the Court by January 24, 2012. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/10/2012. (JKS)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 67 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss - The Court GRANTS Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, [dkt. 67]. The remaining claims of Ms. Bull's Complaint are the Title IX retaliation claim (Counts I and IV) against th e Board of Trustees of Ball State University, and the defamation and § 1983 claims (Counts II, V, and VI) against Dr. Jo Ann Gora, Mr. Thomas Collins, and Mr. Patrick Quinn in their individual capacities. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/22/2011. (JKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BULL v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF BALL STATE UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF BALL STATE UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JO ANN M. GORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK A. QUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN A. BULL
Represented By: Amy Ficklin DeBrota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?