BENTON v. FISHERS LIBRARY Featured Case

Plaintiff: PENNY BENTON
Defendant: FISHERS LIBRARY
Case Number: 1:2010cv00918
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Larry J. McKinney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time. The discovery deadline is December 26, 2011- to permit the taking of depositions of witnesses for the trial of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/31/2011. (LH)
October 28, 2011 43 First MOTION for Extension of Time to December 26, 2011 Joint Motion To Extend Deadline for Discovery, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting motion)(Mulvany, Patrick)
October 20, 2011 42 Exhibit List , final, filed by Defendants FISHERS LIBRARY, HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY, Witness List , final, filed by Defendants FISHERS LIBRARY, HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Pinegar, Alexander)
September 13, 2011 41 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch: Status Conference held on 9/12/2011. The plaintiff is directed to serve a settlement demand on the defendant by September 27, 2011; the defendant is directed to respond within 21 days of receipt of the demand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (LH)
August 22, 2011 39 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/12/2011 02:30 PM bfore Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/22/2011. (TMA)
August 18, 2011 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Harold Mulvany on behalf of Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (Mulvany, Patrick)
February 18, 2011 37 NOTICE of Intent to Hold Attorney's Lien, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON (Paul, Joel)
February 18, 2011 36 NOTICE of Service Upon Plaintiff, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON, re 35 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Return Receipt) (Paul, Joel)
February 10, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joel Samuel Paul withdrawn. Mr. Paul is to serve a copy of this order on the plaintiff with proof of service to be filed with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/10/2011. (TMA)
February 9, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Lee Williams withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/9/2011. (TMA)
February 7, 2011 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch: This case was set for a telephone status conference on February 1, 2011, with the magistrate judge. The conference was not held as scheduled because counsel for both parties failed to call in for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (TMA)
February 7, 2011 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paul, Joel)
February 4, 2011 31 MOTION to Withdraw as attorney by Jennifer L. Williams on behalf of HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Jennifer) Modified on 2/7/2011 (TMA).
February 4, 2011 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Phillip Pinegar on behalf of Defendant HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Pinegar, Alexander)
January 28, 2011 29 Hamilton East Public Library's Answer to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint, filed by HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY.(Williams, Jennifer)
January 25, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Motion to withdraw Pleading; however, the court has now granted the plaintiff leave to amend and the second amended complaint has been filed. So that the docket will be clear, the defendant must now file (re-file) its answer to the second amended complaint within the applicable time period for doing so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/25/2011. (TMA)
January 25, 2011 27 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY, filed by PENNY BENTON. (TMA)
January 25, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to file second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/25/2011. (TMA)
January 24, 2011 25 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw Pleading, filed by Defendant HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Jennifer)
January 20, 2011 24 Exhibit List Preliminary Exhibit List, filed by Defendant HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY, Witness List Preliminary Witness List, filed by Defendant HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Williams, Jennifer)
January 20, 2011 23 *** WITHDRAWN PER 28 ORDER OF 1/25/11 *** Defendant's ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint, filed by HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY.(Williams, Jennifer) Modified on 1/25/2011 (TMA).
January 17, 2011 22 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON, Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (Paul, Joel)
January 3, 2011 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Paul, Joel)
November 11, 2010 20 Hamilton East Public Library's ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint, filed by HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY.(Williams, Jennifer)
November 9, 2010 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against HAMILTON EAST PUBLIC LIBRARY, filed by PENNY BENTON. (TMA)
November 9, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/9/2010. (TMA)
October 20, 2010 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Paul, Joel)
October 5, 2010 16 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/21/2012 09:30 AM in room #272, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2012 10:00 AM in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/5/2010. (TMA)
October 5, 2010 Featured Case Corrective action on ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 10/4/2010.(REO)
October 4, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch for all further proceedings. Judge Larry J. McKinney no longer assigned to case, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 10/4/2010.(REO)
September 29, 2010 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/28/2010. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/1/2011 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (TMA)
September 28, 2010 13 Featured Case ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 4/20/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/28/2010. (TMA)
September 28, 2010 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant FISHERS LIBRARY. (Williams, Jennifer)
September 27, 2010 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Samuel Paul on behalf of Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (Paul, Joel)
August 20, 2010 10 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2010 03:30 PM (Eastern) in room #272, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The parties shall tender a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no less than seven days prior to the pretrial conference (see Order for other details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/20/2010.(SWM)
August 19, 2010 9 ANSWER to Complaint, filed by FISHERS LIBRARY.(Williams, Jennifer)
August 12, 2010 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lee Williams on behalf of Defendant FISHERS LIBRARY. (Williams, Jennifer)
August 6, 2010 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by FISHERS LIBRARY. (Williams, Jennifer)
August 6, 2010 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lee Williams on behalf of Defendant FISHERS LIBRARY. (Williams, Jennifer)
July 27, 2010 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk TO: Fishers Library (SWM)
July 27, 2010 4 Entry Discussing Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Issuance of Process: Plaintiff Penny Benton's request to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. The clerk is designated, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), to issue and serve process on the defendant Fishers Library. Process in this case shall consist of the complaint filed on July 20, 2010, and applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 7/27/2010. (SWM)
July 20, 2010 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JD)
July 20, 2010 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff PENNY BENTON. (JD)
July 20, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against FISHERS LIBRARY, filed by PENNY BENTON.(JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENTON v. FISHERS LIBRARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNY BENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHERS LIBRARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?