LAMBERT v. HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY Featured Case

Plaintiff: LAURA J. LAMBERT
Defendant: HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY
Case Number: 1:2010cv00919
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2011 32 Featured Case CLOSED DISMISSED - Approves parties Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/3/2011.(JKS)
July 29, 2011 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal, filed by Defendant HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY, Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Himsel, Jane)
March 18, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER RESETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/29/2012 at 10:00 AM in room #307, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2012 at 09:00 AM in room #307, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Counsel are reminded of the required pretrial preparation deadlines set forth in paragraph VIII of the case management plan. Counsel are further reminded to review the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, available on the internet at http://www.insd.uscourts.gov/Publications/CourtroomProceduresJMS.pdf. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/18/2011.(LBK)
March 2, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER granting parties' 26 Joint Motion to extend case management deadlines by ninety (90) days. The Magistrate Judge recommends that the trial date be continued accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 3/2/2011. (SWM)
March 2, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER approving dismissal of Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint - Title VII Gender Discrimination, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/2/2011.(LBK)
March 1, 2011 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Count II Only, with Prejudice, filed by Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McMinn, Richard)
March 1, 2011 26 Joint MOTION for Continuance /Extend Case Management Plan Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McMinn, Richard)
January 20, 2011 25 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Himsel, Jane)
January 20, 2011 24 Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Defendant HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Himsel, Jane)
January 19, 2011 23 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/18/2011. Discussion held regarding settlement and related matters. Counsel shall update the Magistrate Judge regarding settlement by February 19, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker.(SWM)
December 17, 2010 22 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/16/2010. Discussion held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. Status Conference set for 1/18/2011 02:30 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel, who shall call the Court at 317-229-3660. The purpose of this conference is to address settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker.(SWM)
December 16, 2010 21 Witness List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (McMinn, Richard)
December 16, 2010 20 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (McMinn, Richard)
November 24, 2010 19 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (LBK)
November 24, 2010 17 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures, filed by Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (McMinn, Richard)
November 23, 2010 18 CORRECTED DOCKET TEXT- Please disregard docket text re: document 16 Scheduling Order. Corrected docket text (correcting the signature) reads: TRIAL SETTING AND NOTICE OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2011 at 10:00 AM in room #307, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Jury Trial set for 1/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in room #307, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Counsel are reminded of the required pretrial preparation deadlines set forth in paragraph VIII of the case management plan [dkt. 13]. Counsel are further reminded to review the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, available on the internet at http://www.insd.uscourts.gov/Publications/CourtroomProceduresJMS.pdf. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/23/2010. (LBK)
November 23, 2010 16 TRIAL SETTING AND NOTICE OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2011 at 10:00 AM in room #307, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Jury Trial set for 1/2/2012 at 09:00 AM in room #307, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Counsel are reminded of the required pretrial preparation deadlines set forth in paragraph VIII of the case management plan [dkt. 13]. Counsel are further reminded to review the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, available on the internet at http://www.insd.uscourts.gov/Publications/CourtroomProceduresJMS.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/23/2010.(LBK)
November 16, 2010 15 Featured Case ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2011. Parties appeared by counsel on 11/15/2010, for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Status Conference set for 12/16/2010 10:00 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The purpose of the 12/16/2010, status conference is to address settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/16/2010.(SWM)
October 14, 2010 14 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2010 02:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than seven days prior to the pretrial conference (see Order for other details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 10/14/2010.(SWM)
October 12, 2010 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY, Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (Himsel, Jane)
August 27, 2010 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBK)
August 26, 2010 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY.(Himsel, Jane)
July 28, 2010 10 RETURN of Service, filed by LAURA J. LAMBERT. HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY served on 7/27/2010. (Haskin, John)
July 27, 2010 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Himsel, Jane)
July 27, 2010 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Lee Mosby on behalf of Defendant HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Mosby, Brian)
July 27, 2010 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Ann Himsel on behalf of Defendant HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY. (Himsel, Jane)
July 22, 2010 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (LBK)
July 20, 2010 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JD)
July 20, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY. (JD)
July 20, 2010 3 RECEIPT #IP019104 in the amount of $ 350.00 (JD)
July 20, 2010 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Plaintiff LAURA J. LAMBERT. (JD)
July 20, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY with Jury Demand, filed by LAURA J. LAMBERT.(JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAMBERT v. HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUSSEY-MAYFIELD MEMORIAL PUBLIC LIBRARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA J. LAMBERT
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?