OMEGA US INSURANCE, INC. v. D&S INDY, INC. et al
Plaintiff: |
OMEGA US INSURANCE, INC. |
Defendant: |
DEBORA S. BAKER, STEVE BAKER, SHANNON BOWMAN, D&S INDY, INC., CHESTER HALL and DANIEL REED |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00355 |
Filed: |
March 11, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Tim A. Baker |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Magnus-Stinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
73
ORDER - Omega has no duty to defend or indemnify Colonial with respect to claims made by Mr. Reed, Mr. Hall, or Ms. Bowman. The Court GRANTS Omega's Motion For Summary Judgment, [dkt. 42 ], and DENIES Colonial's Motion For Summary Judgm ent, [dkt. 44 ]. Additionally, because Colonial's Motion To Strike, [dkt. 54 ], relates exclusively to evidence regarding the applicability of the Total Liquor Exclusion, and since the Court has not based its ruling on any of the evidence that Colonial claims is hearsay, the Court DENIES AS MOOT Colonial's Motion To Strike. Judgment will enter accordingly. (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/21/2012. (JKS)
|
August 9, 2012 |
Filing
70
ORDER - The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer, and conduct whatever investigation necessary, to determine whether this Court has diversity jurisdiction. If the parties agree that diversity jurisdiction is proper, they shall file a joint jurisdictional statement by August 22, 2012 setting forth the basis for each of their citizenships and whether they agree that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000, exclusive of interest and costs. Because Ms. Bowman has not appeared or answered the Amended Complaint, the joint jurisdictional statement shall also include a statement by Omega setting forth Omega's factual basis for the allegation that Ms. Bowman is a citizen of Indiana, and a statement by each party regardin g whether they have any information to dispute Omega's allegation regarding Ms. Bowman's citizenship. If the parties cannot agree on their respective citizenships or the amount in controversy, any party who disagrees shall file a separate jurisdictional statement by August 22, 2012 setting forth its view regarding the citizenship of each of the parties and the amount in controversy. (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/9/2012. (JKS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?