ROWE v. FINNAN et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROWE
Defendant: JANE/JOHN DOE, ALAN FINNAN, LARRY FOWLER, STEPHEN HALL, BRUCE HEMLING, HOWARD MORTON, MICHELLE PAVESE, WALTER PERTERSON, ALBERTA POTTER, KRISTY RICHARDSON, CHAPLIN ROGERS, WAYNE SCAIFE, L.A. VANNATTA, WILLIAM WILSON, EDWIN BUSS, DENNIS DAVIS, CHAPLIN DODD, LISA ASH and DANIEL BODLOVICH
Case Number: 1:2011cv00524
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - For the reasons explained herein, Rowe has failed to establish that the challenged policies place a substantial burden on his exercise of religion. Judgment is entered in favor of the DOC and against Rowe as to all claims brought pursuant to the Religious Land Use and Institutionalized Persons Act. As noted, the Court previously granted summary judgment on Rowe's First Amendment claims and all other claims have been abandoned. See dkt. 131. This Entry resolves all remaining claims against all remaining parties. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. ***SEE ORDER***. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/5/2014.(JKS)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ENTRY granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 135 Motion to Reconsider (see Entry). Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/13/2014. (SWM)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting Defts' 73 Motion to Compel (see Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/21/2013. (SWM)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL (Dkt. 42 , 47 ). See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/4/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/4/2013. (copy to Plaintiff via US Mail) (JKS)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENTRY Dismissing Insufficient Claims and Directing further proceedings. No partial judgment shall issue at this time as to the claim(s) resolved in this Entry. The defendants who have appeared in the action shall have 30 calendar days from the date this Entry is docketed in which to file their answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint (See Entry). Copy to plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/29/2012.(MAC)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 8 Defendant's Motion to Relinquish Jurisdiction to the Madison Circuit Court. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/23/2011. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail. (LBK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROWE v. FINNAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE/JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN FINNAN
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY FOWLER
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN HALL
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE HEMLING
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD MORTON
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE PAVESE
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER PERTERSON
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTA POTTER
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTY RICHARDSON
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPLIN ROGERS
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE SCAIFE
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A. VANNATTA
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM WILSON
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWIN BUSS
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS DAVIS
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAPLIN DODD
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA ASH
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BODLOVICH
Represented By: Wade J. Hornbacher
Represented By: David A. Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?