July 29, 2013 |
Filing
427
ENTRY DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION: For the reasons set forth above, this case must be, and hereby is, DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/29/2013.(DW)
|
February 20, 2013 |
Filing
402
ENTRY ON MOTION IN LIMINE: To the extent set forth above, Mirowski's motion 294 is GRANTED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/20/2013. (DW)
|
February 15, 2013 |
Filing
393
ENTRY ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE: Boston Scientific's motion 201 is GRANTED as to Dr. Rao's opinion on baseline royalties, reasonable settlement value, and unjust enrichment. It is DENIED as to Dr. Rao's opinion on expected litigation damages ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/15/2013. (DW)
|
February 13, 2013 |
Filing
377
ENTRY ON MOTIONS REGARDING EXPERT TESTIMONY: Boston Scientific's motion 195 is DENIED. Mirowski's motion 205 is also DENIED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/13/2013. (DW)
|
February 8, 2013 |
Filing
364
ENTRY REGARDING DR. MOWER: A hearing regarding Dr. Mower is necessary to determine whether a conflict exists. Critical issues regarding the nature of Dr. Mower's relationship with Finnegan, the scope of the prior representation, and Dr. Mower& #039;s interest in the current litigation must be resolved. Accordingly, a hearing is set for Tuesday, February 12, 2013 at 10:00am in Courtroom 202 of the United States Courthouse for the Southern District of Indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/8/2013.(DW)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
359
ENTRY ON MOTION REGARDING EVIDENCE IN CASE-WITHIN-A-CASE re 358 REDACTED Motion in Limine: The Court has already issued a partial ruling on the motion. The Court now addresses the remaining issues. Boston Scientific's motion DENIED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/6/2013. (DW)
|
February 5, 2013 |
Filing
355
ENTRY ON MOTION REGARDING EVIDENCE IN CASE-WITHIN-A-CASE re 268 Motion in Limine: Boston Scientific's motion to exclude evidence of the Delaware Settlement and testimony by the underlying litigation experts is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Boston S cientific's motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Mower is DENIED. Boston Scientific's motion to preclude the introduction of contention interrogatories is GRANTED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/5/2013. (DW)
|
February 4, 2013 |
Filing
350
ENTRY ON MOTION REGARDING TESTIMONY OF BOSTON SCIENTIFIC'S IN-HOUSE COUNSEL: For the foregoing reasons, Mirowski's motion is GRANTED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/4/2013. (DW)
|
February 1, 2013 |
Filing
349
ENTRY ON MOTION REGARDING MIROWSKI'S CLAIMS AGAINST ST. JUDE: Mirowski's Motion to Limit Expert Testimony or Argument that Mirowski had Separate Claims of Its Own Against St. Jude 221 is GRANTED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/1/2013. (DW)
|
November 30, 2012 |
Filing
235
ENTRY ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Boston Scientific's and Mirowski's motions for summary judgment are DENIED. Mirowski's motion for oral argument regarding its motion for summary judgment (dkt. no. 130) is DENIED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 11/30/2012. (DW)
|
August 17, 2012 |
Filing
157
ENTRY ON COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS: Boston Scientific's motion for judgment on the pleadings as to the Amended Fourth and Fifth Counterclaims is GRANTED. Boston Scientific's motion for judgment on the pleadings as to the Amended Sixth Counterclaim is DENIED. With its recent amendment, Mirowski withdrew its original counterclaim for negligence. Boston Scientific's motion for judgment on the pleadings as to Mirowski's Counterclaim for n egligence (original Counterclaim Seven) is therefore DENIED AS MOOT. Boston Scientific's motion for judgment on the pleadings as to Mirowski's Amended Eighth Counterclaim is DENIED ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 8/17/2012. (DW)
|
August 9, 2012 |
Filing
153
ENTRY ON COUNTERCLAIMANT'S MOTION TO AMEND: GRANTED 73 Motion to Amend. However, rather than present the Court with the entire pleading as amended as required by Local Rule 15-1(b), Mirowski instead has only provided its proposed amended Counterclaims. Mirowski is hereby ORDERED to file its entire pleading as amended within SEVEN DAYS from the date of this Entry ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDTIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 8/9/2012. (DW)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing
120
ENTRY - ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL; The Defendants motion is now ripe and the Court, being duly advised, DENIES the motion. The Plaintiff's have filed a motion for leave to file a surreply in opposition to the Defendants motio n (docket #71). The motion is well-taken and is hereby GRANTED. The Plaintiffs' surreply is deemed filed as of the date of this entry. The Defendant has filed a motion for oral argument on the instant motion (docket #48)the motion is DENIED. *** SEE ORDER FOR FURTHUR INFORMATION ***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/1/2012. (CKM)
|