SMITH-BEY v. BUSS et al
Plaintiff: |
SHEIK FRANCIS SMITH-BEY |
Defendant: |
EDWIN G. BUSS, MARK DODD and STEPHEN T. HALL |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv01204 |
Filed: |
September 6, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Tanya Walton Pratt |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
68
CLOSED JUDGMENT that the defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted, that judgment is entered for the defendant and against the plaintiff, and that the plaintiff take nothing by his complaint and that the claims dismissed as legally insufficient pursuant to 28:1915 A(b) are dismissed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/25/2013 (copy sent to the plaintiff)(CBU)
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
39
ENTRY Discussing Selected Matters - Defendant Dodd shall report by September 18, 2012, whether the plaintiff has taken the steps available to him at the Pendleton Correctional Facility to regain possession of the religious items previously noted by following the procedures in the supplemental report filed on July 17, 2012. The plaintiff shall report by September 21, 2012, whether he has secured possession of the religious items previously noted by following the procedures in the supplementa l report filed by the defendants on July 17, 2012. Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. The parties shall have through October 17, 2012, in which to file any further dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/10/2012. Copy Mailed.(JD)
|
July 27, 2012 |
Filing
33
Entry Granting Motion to Dismiss - The motion to dismiss filed by defendants Buss and Hall [Dkt. 18 ] is GRANTED. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claim(s) resolved in this Entry. The claims which remain are those seek ing injunctive relief from defendant Dodd in his official capacity and seeking damages from defendant Dodd in his individual capacity. Directions heretofore issued to defendant Hall relating to the plaintiff's effort to secure release of religious items shall apply to defendant Dodd. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/27/2012. Copy Mailed. (JD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?