THOMPSON v. CIESIELSKI et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA THOMPSON
Defendant: PAUL CIESIELSKI, DETECTIVE MICHAEL CONDON, DETECTIVE JEAN DEDDISH and DETECTIVE MATTHEW STEVENSON
Case Number: 1:2012cv00375
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 CLOSED JUDGMENT: The Court having granted the Defendants' motion for partial judgment on the pleadings and motion for summary judgment, judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiff on all of the Plaintiff's claims. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/14/2014.(SWM)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENTRY ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: The Defendants' 82 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and summary judgment is entered in favor of all of the Defendants on all of Thompson's claims except her c laim that Defendant Schwomeyer stole money from her. Thompson's 87 motion for summary judgment is DENIED on all claims except her claim that Defendant Schwomeyer stole money from h er; her motion for summary judgment is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT with regard to that claim pending further briefing as ordered above. No final judgment will be entered at this time; the Court will enter final judgment after the remaining issue is resolved. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 12/4/2013. (SWM)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENTRY ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS: The Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings as to IMPD is GRANTED. TheCity of Indianapolis is HEREBY ADDED as a defendant. Judgment on the pleadings is also GRANTE D as to Ms. Thompson's claims against Chief Ciesielski in his individual capacity. Judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED as to Ms. Thompson's Fifth Amendment claim. The Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings as to all claims against officers in their official capacities, as well as the City of Indianapolis, is also GRANTED. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 3/4/2013. Copy sent to Patricia Thompson via US Mail.(DW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPSON v. CIESIELSKI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL CIESIELSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE MICHAEL CONDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE JEAN DEDDISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE MATTHEW STEVENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?