PAIN CENTER OF SE INDIANA, LLC et al v. ORIGIN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS LLC et al

Plaintiff: ANTHONY ALEXANDER, INDIANA PAIN MEDICINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, P.C. and PAIN CENTER OF SE INDIANA, LLC
Defendant: ORIGIN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS LLC and SSIMED, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00133
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2016 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 266 Appeal of Magistrate Judge's August 5, 2015 Interim Order and denying 287 Appeal of Magistrate Judge's August 25, 2015 Order. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/11/2016. (TMD)
December 8, 2015 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING 260 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court regarding 7/17/15 Entry and Order. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/8/2015. (TMD)
November 13, 2015 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's 316 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Entry of 11/10/15 to District Court. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/13/2015. (TMD)
November 9, 2015 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 307 Motion to Quash the Subpoenas Issued to Jeff Leis. Defendants may depose and obtain documents from Mr. Leis. Plaintiffs' request to impose their costs, expenses, and fees of participation in Mr. Leis' deposition on Defendants is DENIED. Defendants' request for an award of their costs, including fees, in opposing the present motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 11/9/2015. (CBU)
September 30, 2015 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 130 Motion for Sanctions for Defendants' September 15, 2014 Deposition Conduct. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/30/2015. (TMD)
September 17, 2015 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 161 Motion for Sanctions. The court ORDERS Defendants to file a bill of costs, as contemplated by Rule 37, for those expenses no later than September 30, 2015. Plaintiffs may file any objections to the bill of costs by October 14, 2015. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/17/2015. (TMD)
September 16, 2015 290 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 170 Motion for Sanctions and denying Plaintiffs' 172 Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/16/2015. (TMD)
July 28, 2015 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING IN PART Plaintiff's 225 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Magistrate Judge's Entry and Order 222 is AFFIRMED IN PART - SEE ENTRY. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/28/2015. (TMD)
June 11, 2015 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 224 Motion for Leave To Depose Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 6/11/2015. (See Entry for specific details.) (REO)
June 10, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 228 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 6/10/2015. (REO)
May 8, 2015 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULES 200 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court and affirms [196 Magistrate Judge's Entry and Order. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/8/2015. (TMD)
April 14, 2015 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 203 Defendant's Motion to Compel. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 4/14/2015. (MGG)
April 10, 2015 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OVERRULING 147 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court and AFFIRMING the Magistrate Judge's 145 Entry and Order. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 4/10/2015. (NRN)
March 12, 2015 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiffs' 146 Appeal of/Objection to Magistrate Judge Decision 134 to District Court. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/12/2015. (TMD)
December 1, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Origin's 72 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 12/1/2014. (TMD)
November 25, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING defendants' 125 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court and AFFIRMING the Magistrate Judge's September 15, 2014 ruling 120 . Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/25/2014. (TMD)
October 17, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion for Sanctions. Depending on the nature of the Court's ruling on Defendants' pending Objections to Magistrate Judge's Orders on Plaintiffs' Alter Ego Discovery [doc. 112 ], Plaintiffs later may move to recover their reasonable expenses under Rule 37(a)(5)(A) and/or (b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 10/17/2014. (REO)
March 12, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUSTAINING Plaintiff's 68 Objection/ Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Motion is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for proceedings consistent with this Entry. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/12/2014. (TMD)
January 28, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Compel ; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel [doc. 52] is DENIED. Because the Complaint discloses uncertainty regarding the current legal status of SSIMED, or the formally responsible defendant by assignment or otherwise, discovery directed to that issue would not be inconsistent with this Entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 1/28/2014. (CKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAIN CENTER OF SE INDIANA, LLC et al v. ORIGIN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ALEXANDER
Represented By: Volney Brand
Represented By: Adam Lenkowsky
Represented By: Kenneth T. Roberts
Represented By: Tasha Rebecca Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INDIANA PAIN MEDICINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER, P.C.
Represented By: Volney Brand
Represented By: Adam Lenkowsky
Represented By: Kenneth T. Roberts
Represented By: Tasha Rebecca Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAIN CENTER OF SE INDIANA, LLC
Represented By: Volney Brand
Represented By: Adam Lenkowsky
Represented By: Kenneth T. Roberts
Represented By: Tasha Rebecca Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORIGIN HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSIMED, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?