MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE

Defendant: JOHN DOE
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00205
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2015 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DAMAGES: Finally, the Court notes that the Plaintiff asks for injunctive relief in its complaint. Within 14 days of the date of this Entry, the Defendants shall file a notice stating whether they object to the entry of t he injunctive relief sought and, if they do, explaining why. If such a notice is filed, the Plaintiff shall file a response within 14 days of the date of the notice. The Court will then resolve any dispute and enter final judgment ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/29/2015. Copy sent via US Mail.(DW)
July 10, 2015 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge submitted his Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Entitlement to Fees and Sanctions [Dkt. No. 211.] The parties were afforded due opportunity pursuant to statu te and the rules of this Court to file objections; none were filed. The Plaintiff did file a motion asking the Magistrate Judge to reconsider his order; that motion was denied by the Magistrate Judge, and no objection has been filed with regard to that order. The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as set forth in Dkt. No. 228 and DENIES the Plaintiff's Motion for Entitlement to Fees and Sanctions [Dkt. No. 211]. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/10/2015.(DW)
June 11, 2015 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The Magistrate Judge submitted his Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. [Dkt. No. 242.] The parties were afforded due opportunity pursuant to statute and the rul es of this Court to file objections; none were filed. The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. The Court will enter default judgment against Defendants Kelley Tashiro and N. Charles Tashiro once the issue of damages is resolved. To that end, within 14 days of the date of this Order, the Plaintiff shall file a notice informing the Court how it wishes to proceed with regard to proving damages. The Defendants may file a response within 7 days of the date of the Plaintiff's notice. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 6/11/2015.(DW)
June 9, 2015 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 238 Motion for Reconsideration of Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/9/2015. (CBU)
May 18, 2015 242 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 130 MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendants for Spoliation of Evidence and Perjury filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/18/2015.(MGG)
April 14, 2015 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE; The Court DENIES Defendants' first through seventh motions in limine. [Dkts. 170, 172, 173, 175, 176, 177 & 179.] This order, however, shall be without prejudice to Defendants' right to challenge the testimony or Plaintiff's witnesses through specific objections at the April 30, 2015 evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 04/14/2015. (CKM)
November 19, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 142 Motion in Limine to exclude testimony and evidence proffered by Delvan Neville. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/19/2014. (CBU)
October 29, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES: In conclusion, the Plaintiff's motion to strike (dkt. no. 132) is GRANTED as to affirmative defense 8 (unclean hands) and DENIED in all other respects ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/29/2014. (DW)
May 9, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; The Court does not find a basis to issue an order to show cause. Defendant's Motion for an Order to Show Cause [Dkt. 61] is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 5/9/2014. (CKM)
September 25, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to require pltf to post bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/25/2013. (CBU)
September 4, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE: For the reasons set forth above, Tashiro's motion to dismiss is DENIED. Tashiro's motion to strike is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to strike from the record Exhibit C(Attachment #3) at docket number 1 and Exhibit C (Attachment #3) at docket number 13 ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 9/4/2013. (DW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Nicoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?