EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. et al v. FIFTH THIRD BANK
Plaintiff: |
AIR GULF II, LLC, D&B VENTURES, LLC, EMS FLORIDA, INC. and EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. |
Defendant: |
FIFTH THIRD BANK |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00582 |
Filed: |
April 8, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
William T. Lawrence |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 12, 2016 |
Filing
343
ENTRY ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: This cause is before the Court on the Defendant's Motion for Summary (Dkt. No. 268). The motion is fully briefed, and the Court, being duly advised, GRANTS the motion for the reasons s et forth below.1 In addition, the Court GRANTS the Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file oversized brief (Dkt. No. 288) and the Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a surreply (Dkt. No. 320). The Clerk is directed to file the Plaintiff s' surreply (found at Dkt. No. 320-1), and the Court has considered the surreply in its entirety in ruling on the motion for summary judgment. The Plaintiffs' motion for a hearing on the motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 321) i s DENIED. The parties have had more than ample opportunity to explain their positions in their (oversized) briefs. The parties' motions to exclude expert testimony at trial (Dkt. Nos. 329, 330, and 332) are each DENIED AS MOOT. For th e reasons set forth above, Fifth Third's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to each of the Plaintiffs' claims. Judgment will be entered accordingly ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/12/2016.(DW)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing
210
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Fifth Third Bank's 178 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part Fifth Third Bank's 183 Motion to Compel (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/12/2015. (SWM)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing
138
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion to Compel discovery. The parties are directed to comply with the Court's order as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/3/2014. (CBU)
|
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
125
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 91 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs and David Bego are granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to make full and complete discovery responses in compliance with the Court's ruling. **SEE ORDER** Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/22/2014. (AH)
|
February 24, 2014 |
Filing
69
ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Strike Jury Demand. *** SEE ORDER ***. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/24/2014. (CKM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?