WEST v. COLVIN

Plaintiff: JOSEPH M. WEST
Defendant: CAROLYN W. COLVIN
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2013cv00850
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2017 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; Plaintiff's objections 66 are OVERRULED. We adopt the recommendations set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and award to counsel for Mr. West the amount of $8,113.50 pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), and direct Mr. West's counsel to refund the EAJA award of $7,500 to Mr. West. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/20/2017.(CKM)
August 5, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Attorney Fees. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/5/2016. (SWM)
August 15, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 39 . Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/15/2014.(CBU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WEST v. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROLYN W. COLVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH M. WEST
Represented By: C. David Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?