WOODWARD v. ALGIE et al
Plaintiff: |
LOYD WOODWARD |
Defendant: |
DAVID ALGIE and LINDA ALGIE |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv01435 |
Filed: |
September 10, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise K. LaRue |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard L. Young |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Recovery/Enforcement |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 28, 2016 |
Filing
253
CLOSED JUDGMENT (1)judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on Plaintiff's claims for breach of contract and deception and conversion, and (2)judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant on Defendant's counterclaim for promissory estoppel. Plaintiff shall take nothing by way of his complaint and Defendant shall take nothing by way of his counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 9/28/2016 (dist made)(CBU)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
209
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 149 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDER denying Plaintiff's 197 Motion for Leave to Supplement Exhibit NN. The Algies' request for summary judgment in their favor on Mr. Woodward's claims is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 3/29/2016. (CBU)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
165
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 155 Motion to Strike 148 Amended Counterclaim. The fraud and "computer trespass" counterclaims are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. As a result, Defendants' operative counter-complaint is the Counter Complaint 122 , and their sole counterclaim is for promissory estoppel against Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 10/19/2015 (dist made) (CBU)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing
147
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 133 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (see Order). Copy to Defendants via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 7/27/2015. (SWM)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
116
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Granted as to Defendants' counterclaim for unjust enrichment and DENIED as to Defendants' counterclaim for intentional infliction of emotional distress. Defendants' claim for unjust enrichment is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Defendant's motion seeking leave to file first Amended Counter Complaint is granted in part 85 . Defendants shall file a clean version of their proposed counterclaims with that claim omitted (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 3/30/2015 (dist made) (CBU)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing
84
ORDER - Mr. Woodward's Petition for Pre-judgment Writ of Attachment [doc. 26 ] is DENIED. Mr. Woodward is ORDERED to file a notice with the Court, within seven days of the date of this Entry and Order, whether he intends to file a new petition for writ of attachment and when he can have it on file. If he does not so notify the Court or he intends not to file a renewed motion, then the ex parte restrictions on the Petition, this Entry and Order, and related filings will be lifted (Reissued for publication purposes). Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 4/14/2014.(CKM)
|
March 5, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER denying Defendants' 32 Motion to Dismiss. (cm). Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/5/2014. (TMD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?