BUSENBARK et al v. PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE CO.

Plaintiff: JIM BUSENBARK CORP., BUSENBARK FAMILY FARMS I, LLC, VICKIE L. BUSENBARK and H. JAMES BUSENBARK
Defendant: PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE CO.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01663
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 81 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/8/2014. (CBU)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER - The Court hereby DENIES Indiana Agricultural Law Foundation's Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. [Dkt. 60.] Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is ordered to STRIKE from the record Docket Entry 68 (Brief of the Amicus Curiae, which was properly filed in response to Court's Order dated October 3, 2014 but has now been vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/31/2014. (CKM)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Seal Document 41 SEALED Document. The Clerk is directed to unseal Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and the accompanying exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/14/2014. (CBU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUSENBARK et al v. PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANHANDLE EASTERN PIPE LINE CO.
Represented By: A. Richard Blaiklock
Represented By: Dina M. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM BUSENBARK CORP.
Represented By: Brad A. Catlin
Represented By: Nels John Ackerson
Represented By: Ronald J. Waicukauski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUSENBARK FAMILY FARMS I, LLC
Represented By: Ronald J. Waicukauski
Represented By: Brad A. Catlin
Represented By: Nels John Ackerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKIE L. BUSENBARK
Represented By: Ronald J. Waicukauski
Represented By: Brad A. Catlin
Represented By: Nels John Ackerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. JAMES BUSENBARK
Represented By: Ronald J. Waicukauski
Represented By: Brad A. Catlin
Represented By: Nels John Ackerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?