ELI LILLY AND COMPANY et al v. ACE EUROPEAN GROUP LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY and ELI LILLY DO BRASIL LTDA
Defendant: ACE EUROPEAN GROUP LIMITED, AIG EUROPE (UK) LIMITED, AIG EXCESS LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY LTD, ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE CO HOLDINGS, LTD., ALTERRA AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, COMMERCIAL UNION INSURANCE COMPANY N/K/A ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, F/K/A MAX RE LTD., LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC., LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, RSUI INDEMNITY COMPANY, SCOR RE, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO., XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC. and ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED
Case Number: 1:2013cv01770
Filed: November 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Larry J. McKinney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 ORDER denying Upper Excess Carriers' 1309 Motion to Strike. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/2/2020. (SWM)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF - For the reasons stated above, the Court OVERRULES the Plaintiffs' Objections (Filing No. 1248 ), ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge& #039;s Report and Recommendation (Filing No. 1243 ), and DENIES the Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 56(d) (Filing No. 1230 ). The Plaintiffs are ordered to file their response, if any, to the pending summary judgment motions (Fi ling No. 1228 and Filing No. 1229 ) within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Defendants may file a reply within fourteen (14) days after the Plaintiffs' response is served. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/28/2020.(NAD)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 OPINION and ORDER denying 1136 Motion for final judgment. The court DENIES Lamorak's motion for final judgment pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 54(b), 1136 , with leave to refile following the court's ruling on the other defendants' summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr on 12/19/2018. (CBU)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER ON JANUARY 19, 2018, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel on January 19, 2018, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion was held regarding the numerous motions to seal that have been filed in this action. Pursuant to discussions during the telephonic status conference, the Court grants the following motions that documents be maintained under seal: Filing Nos. 849 , 853 , 859 , 863 , 868 , 874 , 878 , 903 , 906 , 915 , 919 , 922 , 925 , and 928 . **SEE ORDER** Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 710 Motion to Compel - Plaintiffs Eli Lilly and Company and Lilly do Brasil, Ltda., shall identify all documents it provided to Saltsgaver in order to refresh Saltsgaver's recollect ion and otherwise prepare him for the depositions in his individual capacity and in his capacity as a Rule 30(b)(6) representative. To the extent they have not already been provided, Plaintiffs Eli Lilly and Company and Lilly do Brasil, Ltda., mus t also produce all of the electronic notes that Saltsgaver reviewed to refresh his recollection for his depositions. Furthermore, the Court DENIES the parties' cross requests for attorney's fees in relation to this Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 9/1/2017. (JKS)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER ON ATTORNEY'S FEES AWARD - The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Arch's request for attorney's fees and costs. Arch is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $81,611.39 to be paid by Lilly within 30 days of the date of this Order. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 8/17/2017. (GSO)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER ON MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF ORDER - The Court DENIES Lilly's 694 Motion to Seal Portions of the Court's July 10, 2017, Order. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 7/21/2017. (GSO)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER - The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Motion. The Court STRIKES the affidavits of Ian S. Pettman and Mike Brown, and all references thereto, as they appear in conjunction with Lilly's Second Amended Complaint and Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, or any responses to such documents. Arch shall be permitted to take Rule 30(b)(6) depositions of JLT regarding JLT's involvement in procuring and managing the insurance policies at issue in this action, in accord ance with the relevant Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Furthermore, Lilly shall be required to pay Arch's costs in connection with this Motion. Arch shall file proof of its reasonable attorney's fees associated with the Motion within fourteen days from the date of this Order, and Lilly shall have ten days thereafter to file its objections to Arch's claimed fees. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 7/10/2017. (GSO)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 608 CORRECTED ORDER denying 498 Defendants', Arch Insurance Company and Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Motion for Request for International Assistance. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 2/16/2017. (LDH)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER denying 554 Arch Defendants' Motion to Strike the Affidavits of Ian S. Pettman and Mike Brown. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 2/8/2017. (LDH) Modified on 2/8/2017 (LDH).
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER ON CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL - Defendants', Arch Insurance Company and Arch Specialty Insurance Company, 468 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 9/27/2016. (GSO)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS - The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' 375 Motion for Sanctions to the extent that Plaintiffs shall recover the costs, including attorneys' fees, for cancelling the arrangements for the originally-scheduled deposition and the costs, including attorneys' fees for preparing the Motion for Sanctions; but the Motion for Sanctions is DENIED in all other respects. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 9/19/2016. (GSO)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER on Plaintiffs' 380 Motion to Amend Purportedly Deemed Admission: Lilly's motion is well taken and the Court grants withdrawal of Lamorak's requests for admissions. The matters set forth in Lamorak's requests for admissions are not deemed admitted (see Order for additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 4/20/2016. (SWM)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER. Under the circumstances presented to the Court at this time, the discovery between Lilly and Arch shall be limited to the foreign law defense and arguments raised by Arch in its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Therefore, Arch's [ 318] Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Lilly's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply is GRANTED because it provides information regarding the breadth of discovery being requested by Arch after briefs on Arch's Motion to Stay had been completed. Arch's Motion for Oral Argument is DENIED because the parties have fully briefed the issues and the Court needs no further argument to clarify their positions. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 1/28/2016. (BGT)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS. The Court GRANTS the moving Defendants', Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Commercial Union Insurance Company, Inc. l/k/a OneBeacon America Insurance Company, n/k/a Lamorak Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, RSUI Indemnity Company and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co., Motions to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiffs', Eli Lilly and Company and Eli Lilly do Brasil Ltds., First Amended Complaint. Dkt. Nos. 229, 234, 2 35, 241 & 242. Count III is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiffs Eli Lilly and Company and Eli Lilly do Brasil Ltds. shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to file a Second Amended Complaint if they wish to do so. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 9/9/2015. (BGT)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 135 Westchester's MOTION to Dismiss - The Court concluded that there is no evidence that Defendant Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company has a duty to defend; and the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over Pl aintiffs', Eli Lilly and Company and Eli Lilly Do Brasil LTDA, claim that this Defendant has a duty to indemnity them; therefore, Plaintiffs' claims against this Defendant are dismissed. Because the latter ruling does not constitute a decision on the merits, the dismissal is WITHOUT prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry J. McKinney on 3/18/2014. (JKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY et al v. ACE EUROPEAN GROUP LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE EUROPEAN GROUP LIMITED
Represented By: Katherine Werner O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG EUROPE (UK) LIMITED
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG EXCESS LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY LTD
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE CO HOLDINGS, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTERRA AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas A. Brusstar
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Fecht
Represented By: Peter J. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Theodore J. Blanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Theodore J. Blanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMERCIAL UNION INSURANCE COMPANY N/K/A ONEBEACON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Scott A. Harkness
Represented By: Cynthia Elaine Lasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Kelly A. Kraft
Represented By: Monica T. Sullivan
Represented By: Melisa G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/K/A MAX RE LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC.
Represented By: Houston Hum
Represented By: Bruce L. Kamplain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Dennis F. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Dennis F. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: FROST BROWN TODD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher J Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOR RE
Represented By: Richard Patrick Darke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Katherine Werner O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL INSURANCE AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Erik S. Mroz
Represented By: David A. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Represented By: Colin Edington Connor
Represented By: Gregory M. Gotwald
Represented By: George M. Plews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELI LILLY DO BRASIL LTDA
Represented By: Colin Edington Connor
Represented By: Gregory M. Gotwald
Represented By: George M. Plews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?