NOBLE ROMAN'S INC. v. B & MP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
NOBLE ROMAN'S INC. |
Defendant: |
B & MP, LLC and LESLIE PERDRIAU |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00206 |
Filed: |
February 12, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
William T. Lawrence |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 22, 2015 |
Filing
148
CLOSED TRANSFER - ENTRY ON MOTION TO TRANSFER: For the reasons set forth above, the Defendants' motion to transfer (Dkt. No. 127) is GRANTED, as is the Motion for Leave to File Bradley Perdriau's Declaration (Dkt. No. 137). The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. The Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 100) and Defendant Bradley Perdriau's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 123) remain pending ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/22/2015.(DW)
|
April 3, 2015 |
Filing
99
ORDER denying Defendants' 71 Amended Motion to Dismiss. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 4/3/2015. (BGT)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
51
ENTRY ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS: For the reasons set forth above, the Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED, and Count III (mistakenly titled Count Two) of Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Barry Avi ation, Inc. v. Land O'Lakes Mun. Airport Comm'n, 377 F.3d 682, 687 (7th Cir. 2004) ("The better practice is to allow at least one amendment regardless of how unpromising the initial pleading appears because except in unusual circumstan ces it is unlikely that the court will be able to determine conclusively on the face of a defective pleading whether plaintiff actually can state a claim.") (citations and quotation marks omitted). Plaintiff shall have fourteen days within which to file an amended complaint that complies with the pleading requirements of Rule 9(b) ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 10/8/2014. Copy sent via US Mail.(DW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?