HOLLEMAN v. GILLEY et al
Plaintiff: |
ROBERT L. HOLLEMAN |
Defendant: |
JERRY GILLEY and DUSHAN ZATECKY |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00671 |
Filed: |
April 30, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Debra McVicker Lynch |
Presiding Judge: |
Tanya Walton Pratt |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
124
ENTRY ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 115 ) is DISCHARGED, conditioned upon Defendants' payment of the fees and expenses identified above. See Entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/28/2017. (MAT)
|
September 19, 2016 |
Filing
86
ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Accordingly, the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendants Cole and Alsip (Filing No. 44) must be GRANTED. The Clerk may terminate Defendants Cole and Alsip from this action. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the dismissal of claims against Defendants Cole and Alsip. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/19/2016. (JLS)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
26
Screening Entry Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b) - The clerk shall terminate Captain Jerry Gilley as a defendant. With one exception, the claims in the supplemental complaint are dismissed as legally insufficient. The exception to the dismi ssed claims is the claim of retaliation. The claim of retaliation is understood as against the remaining defendants in their individual capacities insofar as the plaintiff seeks damages and against the defendants in their official capacities insof ar as the plaintiff seeks equitable relief. The dismissal of the "claim" for punitive damages in the supplemental complaint does not prevent the plaintiff from seeking punitive damages against the defendants based on the claim of retali ation. No final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claims dismissed in this Entry. A separate order will be issued dealing with the issuance and service of proces. **SEE ENTRY** Copy Mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/14/2015.(MGG)
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim against the Moving Defendants. The Moving Defendants were the only defendants in the original complaint. That Complaint is therefore DISMISSED and these two defendants may be termi nated on the docket. However, because of the supplemental complaint, this ruling does not resolve all claims against all parties and no partial final judgment shall issue as to the dismissal of the original Complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/26/2015. (CBU)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?