MAYS et al v. DAVOL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: |
NANCY MAYS and ROGER MAYS |
Defendant: |
C.R. BARD, INC. and DAVOL, INC. |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01181 |
Filed: |
July 15, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise K. LaRue |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Magnus-Stinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury: Health Care |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 15, 2014 |
Filing
17
ORDER TO FILE JOINT JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT: Accordingly, consistent with their obligations under Rule 11, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a statement setting forth the factual basis for their allegation that the amount in controversy is not met by September 22, 2014. The Court STAYS Defendants' responsive deadline to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint until Plaintiffs have filed the jurisdictional statement required by this Order ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/15/2014.(DW) Modified on 9/15/2014 (DW).
|
August 6, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER - The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer, and conduct whatever investigation necessary, to determine whether this Court has diversity jurisdiction. If the parties agree that diversity jurisdiction is proper, they shall file a joint ju risdictional statement by August 15, 2014 setting forth the basis for each of their citizenships and whether they agree that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000 exclusive of interest and costs. If the parties cannot agree on their respecti ve citizenships or the amount in controversy, any party who disagrees shall file a separate jurisdictional statement by August 15, 2014 setting forth its views on those issues. The joint jurisdictional statement, or the competing jurisdictional statement, shall satisfy Plaintiffs' obligations under Local Rule 81-1. ***SEE ORDER***. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/6/2014.(JKS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?