UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and STATE OF INDIANA
Defendant: COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- SOUTH, COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- KOKOMO, COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- EAST, COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- NORTH, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC., COMMUNITY DIGESTIVE CENTER, COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- NORTHWEST, COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- HAMILTON, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP doing business as COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER - SOUTH, NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER NORTH, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER KOKOMO, COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY DIGESTIVE CENTER - ANDERSON, EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER - EAST, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER - NORTHWEST, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P. and HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTE RHAMILTON
Not Classified By Court: THOMAS P. FISCHER
Interested Party: SULLIVANCOTTER, INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01215
Filed: July 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Filing 399 RESPONSE To Community Health Network, Inc.'s Motion To Redact And Maintain Under Seal [Dkt. 380], filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
June 14, 2022 Filing 398 Submission of Joint Agenda for June 17, 2022 Status Conference, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER, Plaintiffs STATE OF INDIANA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER granting Relator's #350 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to his Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Under Seal - Dkt. 349, and all attached exhibits, shall remain UNDER SEAL. The Court accepts Dkt. 348 as the redacted public version of the Relator's Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Compel. Community Health Network shall file the redacted exhibits within three (3) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/13/2022. (SWM)
June 13, 2022 Filing 396 Proposed Amended CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC. . (Westling, Richard)
June 13, 2022 Filing 395 Proposal to Modify and Extend the Case Management Plan CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER . (Nannis, Veronica)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, Dkt. [ #389 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said motion. Plaintiff, United States of America, shall have to and including June 21, 2022 to respond to Community Health Network's Objection. (Dkt. 379). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/13/2022. (SWM)
June 13, 2022 Filing 393 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on April 12, 2022 (Franzen, Jodie)
June 13, 2022 Filing 392 REDACTED Version of previously filed #336 TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held on April 12, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (45 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jodie Franzen (Telephone: (317) 289-4946). (Franzen, Jodie)
June 12, 2022 Filing 391 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Kelly Anne Quinn hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Quinn, Kelly)
June 9, 2022 Filing 389 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to June 21, 2022 re #379 SEALED MOTION Unredacted Objection to Magistrate Judge's Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference, #378 MOTION Redacted Objection to Magistrate Judge's Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Justin)
June 9, 2022 Filing 388 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 5/13/22 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (42 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Howie-Walters (Telephone: (317) 632-3422). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 6/30/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2022. (Howie-Walters, Laura)
June 9, 2022 Filing 387 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/13/22 (Howie-Walters, Laura)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Community Health's Motion to Extend Deadline for Compliance with Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference, Dkt. [ #374 ]. The Court previously granted Community Health's Motion to Stay Compliance with the May 13, 2022 Minute Entry Pending Ruling on Objection (Dkt. 375). Accordingly, the Court DENIES AS MOOT said motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/3/2022. (SWM)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties shall work together on drafting a proposed amended case management plan and a file a joint proposed amended case manage plan on or before June 13, 2022. If the parties intend to file separate proposed case management plans, the parties must email the Court on or before close of business on June 10, 2022. The parties orally moved to vacate the July 14, 2022 settlement conference. The Court GRANTS this request and the July 14, 2022 settlement conference is VACATED. This matter is set for a telephone status conference on June 17, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a joint agenda for the conference on or before June 14, 2022 by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER granting #381 DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC. - IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that all claims asserted herein against Defendant Community Health Network Foundation Inc., only, are hereby dismissed without prejudice, with all parties to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees only in connection with any claims pursued against Defendant Community Network Foundation Inc. All other claims against all other Defendants remaining preserved and intact. Nothing herein prevents any party from seeking cost, expenses, or attorneys' fees against any party other than the Foundation. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/2/2022. (AAS)
June 2, 2022 Filing 383 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Extend Deadline for Compliance With Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., re #374 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2022 in which to #364 Discovery Conference Comply With Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference. (Costakis, Thomas)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Community Health's Motion to Stay Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference Pending Ruling on Objection to Same, Dkt. [ #375 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said motion. Community Health's compliance with the Court's May 13, 2022 Minute Entry (Dkt. 364) is stayed pending a ruling on Community's objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/1/2022. (SWM)
June 1, 2022 Filing 381 STIPULATION of Dismissal , as to Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., filed by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
May 31, 2022 Filing 380 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #379 SEALED MOTION Unredacted Objection to Magistrate Judge's Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Redact Portions of Objection to Magistrate Judge's Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference and Maintain Those Portions Under Seal)(Quigley, Marc)
May 31, 2022 Filing 379 SEALED MOTION Unredacted Objection to Magistrate Judge's Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
May 31, 2022 Filing 378 MOTION Redacted Objection to Magistrate Judge's Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
May 31, 2022 Filing 377 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #365 MOTION to File Redacted Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
May 27, 2022 Filing 376 Submission of Joint Agenda for May 31, 2022 Status Conference, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
May 26, 2022 Filing 375 MOTION to Stay re #364 Discovery Conference Minute Entry from May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference Pending Ruling on Objection to Same, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Costakis, Thomas)
May 26, 2022 Filing 374 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 31, 2022 in which to #364 Discovery Conference Comply With Minute Entry for May 13, 2022 Discovery Conference, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Costakis, Thomas)
May 20, 2022 Filing 372 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document #347 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22 Seeking to Seal Exhibits 7 and 9A to Relator's Motion to Compel, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
May 20, 2022 Filing 371 AMENDED ANSWER to the United States #96 Amended Complaint in Intervention, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Westling, Richard)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting Defendant Community Health's #368 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer to Complaint. Community Health shall file its Second Amended Answer within three (3) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/19/2022. (SWM)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on Community Health's Motion to Redact the Transcript for the April 12, 2022 Telephonic Discovery Conference, Dkt. [ #361 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said motion. A redacted version of the official transcript of the April 12, 2022 discovery conference shall be filed. The court reporter shall redact the transcript of the April 12, 2022 discovery conference as set forth in Community's Motion to Redact Transcript (Dkt. 361), pursuant to S.D. Ind. L. R. 80-2(c). The original, unredacted transcript of the April 12, 2022 discovery conference(Dkt. 336) shall be maintained UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/18/2022. (SWM)
May 18, 2022 Filing 368 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
May 17, 2022 Filing 367 SEALED Unredacted Relator's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22 [DKT 347], filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
May 17, 2022 Filing 366 REDACTION Relator's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22 [DKT 347] by THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
May 17, 2022 Filing 365 MOTION to File Redacted Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: In keeping with the Court's Order Regarding Discovery Disputes, (Dkt. 187), the parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on May 13, 2022. The Court discussed Community Health Network, Inc.'s ("CHN") responses to the United States' Interrogatories 3, 4, and 5. **See Entry for Additional Information.** Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG) Modified on 5/16/2022 - created link to exhibits #363 (RSF).
May 16, 2022 Filing 363 SEALED Exhibits to Minute Entry for May 13, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Sealed - USA Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 3 - Sealed - Community Health Network Positions Statement, #3 Exhibit 4 - Sealed - Community Health Network Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 5- Sealed - USA - Position Statement, #5 Exhibit 6- Sealed - USA - Exhibits, #6 Exhibit 7 - Sealed - USA Exhibit, #7 Exhibit 8 - Sealed - Community Health Network Position Statement, #8 Exhibit 9 - Sealed - Community Health Network Exhibits, #9 Exhibit 10 - Sealed - Community Health Network Exhibit)(CAG)
May 12, 2022 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Fallon Lilly on behalf of Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA. (Lilly, Fallon)
May 11, 2022 Filing 361 MOTION to Redact #336 Transcript of the April 12, 2022 Telephonic Discovery Conference, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted version of the Discovery Conference Transcript, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
May 10, 2022 Filing 360 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #359 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
May 10, 2022 Filing 359 SEALED EXHBITS TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M)(Westling, Richard)
May 10, 2022 Filing 358 MOTION (Request) for Oral Argument on the Relator's Motion to Compel [ECF No. 347], filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Westling, Richard)
May 10, 2022 Filing 357 RESPONSE in Opposition re #347 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22 , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Relator's 10-6-21 Letter to CHN, #2 Exhibit B - CHN's 1-6-21 E-Mail to Relator and Relator's 1-11-22 Response, #3 Exhibit C (Filed Separately Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D (Filed Separately Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Filed Separately Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F (Filed Separately Under Seal), #7 Exhibit G (Filed Separately Under Seal), #8 Exhibit H (Filed Separately Under Seal), #9 Exhibit I (Filed Separately Under Seal), #10 Exhibit J (Filed Separately Under Seal), #11 Exhibit K (Filed Separately Under Seal), #12 Exhibit L (Filed Separately Under Seal), #13 Exhibit M (Filed Separately Under Seal), #14 Exhibit N - Declaration of Richard W. Westling, #15 Exhibit Index of Exhibits)(Westling, Richard)
May 10, 2022 Filing 356 RESPONSE to Motion re #350 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Relator's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22 , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Relator's Exhibit 9B (proposed redactions), #2 Relator's Exhibit 10A (proposed redactions), #3 Relator's Exhibit 10B (proposed redactions), #4 Relator's Exhibit 11A (proposed redactions), #5 Relator's Exhibit 11B (proposed redactions), #6 Relator's Exhibit 12A (proposed redactions), #7 Relator's Exhibit 12B (proposed redactions), #8 Relator's Exhibit 14 (proposed redactions), #9 Relator's Exhibit 15 (proposed redactions), #10 Relator's Exhibit 16 (proposed redactions), #11 Relator's Exhibit 17 (proposed redactions), #12 Relator's Exhibit 18 (proposed redactions), #13 Relator's Exhibit 19 (proposed redactions), #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Westling, Richard)
April 29, 2022 Filing 354 AMENDED ANSWER to the United States #96 Amended Complaint in Intervention, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Westling, Richard)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #344 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Bianca Beam for THOMAS P. FISCHER added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/26/2022. (SWM)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #343 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael S. Smith for THOMAS P. FISCHER added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Michael S. Smith via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/26/2022. (SWM)
April 26, 2022 Filing 351 SEALED Memorandum in Support of Relator's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos 21 and 22, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
April 26, 2022 Filing 350 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Relator's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nannis, Veronica)
April 26, 2022 Filing 349 SEALED Exhibits to Relator's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22, re #347 Motion (Other), filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9B, #2 Exhibit 10A, #3 Exhibit 10B, #4 Exhibit 11A, #5 Exhibit 11B, #6 Exhibit 12A, #7 Exhibit 12B, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19)(Nannis, Veronica)
April 26, 2022 Filing 348 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #347 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22 , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
April 26, 2022 Filing 347 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9A, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Nannis, Veronica)
April 26, 2022 Filing 346 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nannis, Veronica)
April 26, 2022 Filing 345 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Marc T. Quigley re #336 Transcript (Quigley, Marc)
April 25, 2022 Filing 344 MOTION for Attorney(s) Biana M. Beam to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7074805), filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Biana M. Beam, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
April 25, 2022 Filing 343 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael S. Smith to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7074764), filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Michael S. Smith, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Defendant's Request for Oral Argument, Dkt. [ #323 ]. Defendant Community Health Network requests oral argument on the United States's Motion to Compel. (Dkt. 318). The Court previously granted the United States's Motion to Withdraw that Motion to Compel. (Dkt. #338 ). As such, the present motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/25/2022. (SWM)
April 22, 2022 Filing 341 REDACTED Exhibit 3 to #325 Reply in Support of Motion, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SWM) Modified on 4/25/2022 (SWM).
April 22, 2022 Filing 340 REDACTED Exhibit 2 to #325 Reply in Support of Motion, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SWM)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting IN PART USA's #327 MOTION to Maintain Documents Under Seal - Exhibit 1 to the United States's reply brief, Dkt. 326-1, shall be unsealed in accordance with S.D. Ind. Local Rule 5-11(g). Exhibits 2 and 3 to the United States's reply brief, Dkts. 326-2 and 326-3, shall be maintained under seal. The Clerk is directed to file Dkt. 330-1 as the redacted version of Exhibit 2 in support of the United States's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel. The Clerk is directed to file Dkt. 330-2 as Exhibit 3 in support of the United States's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/22/2022. (SWM)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on April 21, 2022. The parties discussed all items on the Joint Agenda submitted to the Court on April 19, 2022. (Dkt. 335).The United States orally moved to withdraw its Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Non-Party Sullivan Cotter and Associates, Inc., Dkt. #241 . The Court granted this request. Dkt. 241 is WITHDRAWN from the record. The Clerk is direct to terminate Interested Party Sullivan Cotter, Inc. from the docket.The United States also orally moved to withdraw its Motion to Compel Defendant CHN's Continued Technology Assisted Review Training, Dkt. #318 . The Court granted this request. Dkt. 318 is WITHDRAWN from the record. This matter is set for a telephone discovery conference on May 13, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss Community Health Network's discovery responses on incentive compensation. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before May 5, 2022 by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern), the parties are to e-mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call.This matter is set for a telephone status conference on May 31, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a joint agenda for the conference on or before May 27, 2022 by 12:00 p.m. (Eastern). **See Entry for additional information.** Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
April 20, 2022 Filing 337 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on April 12, 2022 (Franzen, Jodie)
April 20, 2022 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held on April 12, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (45 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jodie Franzen (Telephone: (317) 289-4946). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 5/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2022. (Franzen, Jodie)
April 19, 2022 Filing 335 Submission of Joint Agenda for April 21, 2022 Status Conference, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Westling, Richard)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #286 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Defendant Community Health Network, Inc.'s Affirmative Defense No. 2 is stricken without prejudice and Nos. 4 and 8 are stricken with prejudice from Defendant's Answer. Affirmative Defense No. 3 shall remain. CHN is ordered to amend its Answer as to Affirmative Defense Nos. 5, 7, and 10 on or before April 29, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/18/2022 Copy sent to Erika Jacobsen White via US Mail (CBU)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on April 12, 2022. The parties discussed Community Health Network's responses to Relator's Interrogatories Nos. 21 and 22. After reviewing the parties' briefing and hearing oral argument, the Court shall permit the Relator to file a Motion to Compel on this issue on or before April 26, 2022. The call was held and concluded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
March 24, 2022 Filing 330 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #327 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #326 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - CPN-03-00192217, #2 Exhibit 3 - CPN-03-00158656, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
March 11, 2022 Filing 329 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held before Judge James Patrick Hanlon on February 1, 2022 (Franzen, Jodie)
March 11, 2022 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held on February 1, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (49 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jodie Franzen (Telephone: (317) 289-4946). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 4/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2022. (Franzen, Jodie)
March 10, 2022 Filing 327 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #326 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
March 10, 2022 Filing 326 SEALED Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 in Support of, re #325 Reply in Support of Motion, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CHN Predictive Coding Protocol Attachment A, Dec. 11, 2015, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excel Spreadsheet Cited in Complaint in Intervention, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excel Spreadsheet Cited in Complaint in Intervention)(Olson, Justin)
March 10, 2022 Filing 325 REPLY in Support of Motion re #318 MOTION to Compel , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on March 3, 2022. The parties discussed all items on the Joint Agenda submitted to the Court on March 1, 2022. This matter is set for a telephone discovery conference on April 12, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss Community Health Network's responses to Relator's Interrogatory Nos. 21-23. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before April 8, 2022 by 12:00 p.m. (Eastern), the parties are to e-mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call. This matter is set for a telephone status conference on April 21, 2022 at 12:00 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a joint agenda for the conference on or before April 19, 2022 by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
March 7, 2022 Filing 323 MOTION (Request) for Oral Argument on the United States' Motion to Compel [ECF No. 318], filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Westling, Richard)
March 7, 2022 Filing 322 RESPONSE in Opposition re #318 MOTION to Compel Continued Technology Assisted Review Training, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Opposition, #2 Ex. A - Community's 9-20-21 Letter to the United States, #3 Ex. B - United States 10-18-21 Letter to Community, #4 Ex. C - Declaration of Richard J. Ford, #5 Ex. D - Community's 11-30-21 Letter to the United States, #6 Ex. E - Updated 60+ Test Results)(Westling, Richard)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Motion for Leave to Withdraw Pro Hac Vice Appearance, Dkt. [ #314 ]. The Court previously granted a Motion to Withdraw the Appearance of Sarah S. Chu. (Dkt. #317 ). As such, the present motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/24/2022. (SWM)
February 24, 2022 Filing 319 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #318 MOTION to Compel , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
February 24, 2022 Filing 318 MOTION to Compel , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, USA 1st RFPs to CHN, #2 Exhibit 2, CHN Resp to 1st RFPs, #3 Exhibit 3, 8.6.21 Bahnsen email, #4 Exhibit 4, 8.19.21 Bahnsen letter, #5 Exhibit 5, 9.10.21 Bahnsen letter, #6 Exhibit 6, 10.4.21 Bahnsen letter, #7 Exhibit 7, 10.8.21 Bahnsen letter, #8 Exhibit 8, 10.21.21 Bahnsen letter, #9 Exhibit 9, 12.17.21 Bahnsen email, #10 Exhibit 10, McCombs Decl., #11 Exhibit 1.3.22 Bahnsen email, #12 Exhibit 12, 1.18.22 Quinn letter, #13 Exhibit 13, 2.3.22 Bahnsen email, #14 Exhibit 14, 2.7.22 Quinn email, #15 Exhibit 15, 2.21.22 Bahnsen email, #16 Exhibit 16, CHN Predictive Coding Protocol)(Woods, Shelese)
February 24, 2022 **CRD review of the Transcript completed. No Rule 5.2 items identified for redaction re #316 Transcript. (CAG)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #313 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Sarah S. Chu withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/23/2022. (SWM)
February 22, 2022 Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 2/14/22 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (34 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Howie-Walters (Telephone: (317) 632-3422). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 3/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2022. (Howie-Walters, Laura)
February 22, 2022 Filing 315 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/14/22 (Howie-Walters, Laura, Transcriber)
February 18, 2022 Filing 314 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance Pro Hac Vice - Sarah Chu, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance Pro Hac Vice - Sarah Chu)(Chu, Sarah)
February 18, 2022 Filing 313 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance Pro Hac Vice, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Chu, Sarah)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting #309 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Erika Jacobsen White for THOMAS P. FISCHER added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Erika Jacobsen White via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/16/2022. (SWM)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on February 14, 2022. The parties discussed Community Health Network's data sources and TAR protocol. The Court heard argument from both the United States and Community Health Network and concluded that these issues require further briefing. Community Health Network will provide an answer as to whether the personal network drives were automatically synced on or before February 16, 2022 at 5:00 p.m. (Eastern). The United States shall file its Motion to Compel on or before February 24, 2022. Community Health Network, Inc. shall file its response on or before March 7, 2022. The United States shall file its reply on or before March 10, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
February 15, 2022 Filing 310 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #286 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
February 14, 2022 Filing 309 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erika Jacobsen White to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6970543), filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Erika Jacobsen White, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 9, 2022 Filing 308 NOTICE of Non-Redaction, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re #303 Transcript, #301 Transcript. (Woods, Shelese)
February 8, 2022 Filing 307 RESPONSE in Opposition re #292 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses , filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on February 1, 2022. The parties discussed Community Health Network's responses to United States's Interrogatories Nos. 1, 3-5. The Court concluded that, at this juncture, Community Health Network has failed to answer the United States's Interrogatories Nos. 1, 3-5 completely. The Court will require Community Health Network to more definitively specify that the documents produced are responsive to the United States's Interrogatories, and to specify where in those documents any answers might be found. Community Health Network will have until March 15, 2022 to supplement its responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
February 3, 2022 Filing 304 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12-16-2021 (Franzen, Jodie)
February 3, 2022 Filing 303 TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held on 12-16-2021 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (22 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jodie Franzen (Telephone: (317) 289-4946). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 2/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2022. (Franzen, Jodie)
February 3, 2022 Filing 302 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12-10-2021 (Franzen, Jodie)
February 3, 2022 Filing 301 TRANSCRIPT of telephonic discovery conference held on 12-10-2021 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (37 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jodie Franzen (Telephone: (317) 289-4946). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 2/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2022. (Franzen, Jodie)
February 1, 2022 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by Annavieve C. Conklin on behalf of Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Conklin, Annavieve)
January 28, 2022 Filing 299 NOTICE of Non-Redaction, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re #297 Transcript. (Woods, Shelese)
January 26, 2022 Filing 298 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 01/11/2022 (Moxley, David)
January 26, 2022 Filing 297 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 01/11/2022 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (36 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: David Moxley (Telephone: (317) 416-1749). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 2/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2022. (Moxley, David)
January 21, 2022 Filing 295 REDACTED EXHIBIT 10 to #250 SEALED MOTION Non-Party SullivanCotter, Inc.'s Response to the United States' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by SULLIVANCOTTER, INC. (SWM)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Non-Party SullivanCotter'sMotion to Maintain Documents Under Seal, Dkt. #251 . SullivanCotter asks this Court to maintain under seal its Response to the United States' Motion to Compel and all fourteen attached exhibits. (Dkt. 250). On November 9, 2021, Defendant Community Health Network, Inc. filed a statement authorizing the unsealing of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 241) and Exhibits L, M, and N to that motion. (Dkt. 249). On November 23, 2021, Defendant Community Health Network, Inc. filed a statement authorizing the unsealing of Exhibit 14 to Non-Party SullivanCotter's Response, requesting that the originally filed Exhibit 10 be maintained under seal, that the Court file its proposed redacted version of Exhibit 10, and that all references to Exhibits 10 and 14 in Non-Party SullivanCotter's response be unredacted and unsealed. (Dkt. 267). As such, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Non- Party's Motion to Seal, Dkt. [ #251 ]. Exhibit 14 shall be unsealed on the docket; Exhibit 10 shall remain under seal; and the redacted version of Exhibit 10 shall be filed on the docket. The Clerk is directed to unseal Dkt. 250-14 in accordance with S.D. Ind. LocalRule 5-11(g). The Clerk is directed to docket Dkt. 267-1 as the redacted version of SullivanCotter's Exhibit 10 to its Response brief filed at Dkt. 250. The Non- Party's response brief, and all other exhibits, shall be maintained under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/21/2022. (SWM)
January 19, 2022 Filing 293 REPLY in Support of Motion re #286 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
January 18, 2022 Filing 292 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nannis, Veronica)
January 12, 2022 Filing 291 RESPONSE in Opposition re #286 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Telephonic Status Conference on January 11, 2022. The parties discussed all items on the Joint Agenda submitted on January 7, 2022 (Dkt. 289). This matter is set for a telephone discovery conference on February 1, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss Community's incentive compensation production. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before January 26, 2022 by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern), the parties are to e-mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call.This matter is set for a telephone discovery conference on February 14, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss Community Health's data source identification and TAR project. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before February 9, 2022 by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern), the parties are to e-mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call.This matter is set for a telephone status conference on March 3, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
January 7, 2022 Filing 289 Submission of Joint Agenda for January 11, 2022 Status Conference, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
December 28, 2021 Filing 287 Defendants' ANSWER to #134 Amended Complaint of Relator, filed by All Defendants.(Westling, Richard)
December 22, 2021 Filing 286 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Telephonic Status Conference on December 16, 2021. The parties discussed all items on the Joint Agenda submitted on December 15, 2021 (Dkt. 284) and an email update from the Defendants received on December 15, 2021.As to Item #2 related to RFP 28, the United States will provide TAR protocol on or before December 17, 2021.As to Item #3 related to Community Health's responses to Relator's discovery requests, the deadline to complete TAR production is January 18, 2022 and the deadline to complete non-TAR production is January 31, 2022. The parties are meeting and conferring on December 20, 2021 and will alert the Court to any remaining issues on this topic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
December 15, 2021 Filing 284 Submission of Joint Agenda for December 16, 2021 Status Conference, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: Discovery Conference held on 12/10/2021. See Entry for additional information. This matter is scheduled for a discovery conference on December 16, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a joint agenda for the discovery conference by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern) on December 15, 2021.Additionally, this matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on January 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a joint agenda for the telephonic status conference by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern) on January 7, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
December 9, 2021 Filing 281 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPTS of Telephonic Discovery Conference and a Telephonic Status Conference both taken by Electronic Sound Recording, held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/1/21 and 12/2/21 (Knepley, Jean)
December 9, 2021 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference taken by Electronic Sound Recording held on 12-2-21 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (23 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jean Knepley (Telephone: (317) 696-3565). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 12/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2022. (Knepley, Jean)
December 9, 2021 Filing 279 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 12-1-21 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (42 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jean Knepley (Telephone: (317) 696-3565). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 12/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2022. (Knepley, Jean)
December 8, 2021 Filing 278 Submission Joint Agenda for December 10, 2021 Status Conference, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Persio, Joanna)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Telephonic Status Conference on December 2, 2021. The parties discussed Item Nos. 1-4 on the Joint Agenda submitted on November 29, 2021 (Dkt. 272) and an update from the December 1, 2021 discovery conference on United States' RFP 63. Additionally, this matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on December 10, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. (Eastern). Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a joint agenda for the telephonic status conference by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern) on December 8, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
December 1, 2021 Filing 275 ANSWER to #96 Amended Complaint in Intervention, filed by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC..(Westling, Richard)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Relator's Second Amended Complaint, Dkt. [ #269 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said Motion. The Defendants shall have to and including December 28, 2021 by which to respond to the Relator's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/1/2021. (SWM)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on December 1, 2021. The parties discussed Defendants' responses to the United States of America's requests for production and a Rule 45 subpoena served on non-party Dr. Yeleti. The call was held and concluded. **See Entry for Additional Information.** Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
November 29, 2021 Filing 272 Submission Joint Agenda for December 2, 2021 Status Conference, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
November 26, 2021 Filing 270 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Responding to any written request for discovery or admission, filed by Defendant VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
November 26, 2021 Filing 269 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 28, 2021 to Respond to Relator's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #265 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney George Horn, Jr withdrawn. Copy sent pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/24/2021. (TPS)
November 23, 2021 Filing 267 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #251 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #250 SEALED MOTION Non-Party SullivanCotter, Inc.'s Response to the United States' Motion to Compel Production of Documents , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 - Redacted, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #262 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Edgar D. Bueno for SULLIVANCOTTER, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/23/2021 Copy sent to Mr. Bueno via US Mail (CBU)
November 23, 2021 Filing 265 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance on Behalf of SullivanCotter, Inc., filed by Interested Party SULLIVANCOTTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Horn, George)
November 22, 2021 Filing 264 RESPONSE re #261 Notice (Other) , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #260 Motion for Continuance of the Discovery Conference. Discovery Conferencescheduled in this matter for November 22, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby VACATED.The parties are to notify the Court when this issue is ripe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/20/2021. (CAG)
November 20, 2021 Filing 262 MOTION for Attorney(s) Edgar Bueno to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-6851462), filed by Interested Party SULLIVANCOTTER, INC.. (Bueno, Edgar)
November 19, 2021 Filing 261 NOTICE Defendants' Clarification and Update Regarding the October 28, 2021 Status Conference, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC., re #246 Status ConferenceSet Hearings. (Quigley, Marc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 260 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Discovery Conference, filed by Interested Party SULLIVANCOTTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horn, George)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Conference set for 11/22/2021 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before November 19, 2021 by 12:00 p.m. (Eastern), the parties are to e- mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/17/2021.(SWM)
November 16, 2021 Filing 257 REPLY in Support of Motion re #241 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Sullivan Cotter and Associates Inc. , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Persio, Joanna)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ENTRY ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS RELATOR'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint Filing No. #153 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Relator's claims for breach of an oral contract and promissory estoppel (Counts VI and VII) are DISMISSED. The remaining claims may proceed. Defendants' Motion for Oral Argument Filing No. #180 is DENIED as MOOT. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 11/16/2021. (AAS)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Plaintiff's Motion to Maintain Documents Under Seal, Dkt. [ #242 ]. On November 9, 2021, Defendant Community Health Network, Inc. filed a response authorizing the unsealing of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 241) and Exhibits L, M, and N to that motion. Accordingly, the Court, being duly advised, hereby DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to unseal Dkt. 241, Dkt. 241-12, Dkt. 241-13, and Dkt. 241-14 in accordance with S.D. Ind. Local Rule 5-11(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/12/2021. (SWM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 254 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SULLIVANCOTTER, INC. identifying Corporate Parent SullivanCotter Holdings, Inc. for SULLIVANCOTTER, INC. (Horn, George) Modified on 11/12/2021 (AAS).
November 10, 2021 Filing 253 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to SULLIVANCOTTER, INC.. (RAGS) (JRB)
November 9, 2021 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by George Horn, Jr on behalf of Interested Party SullivanCotter Inc.. (Horn, George)
November 9, 2021 Filing 251 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #250 SEALED MOTION Non-Party SullivanCotter, Inc.'s Response to the United States' Motion to Compel Production of Documents , filed by Interested Party SullivanCotter Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Horn, George)
November 9, 2021 Filing 250 SEALED MOTION Non-Party SullivanCotter, Inc.'s Response to the United States' Motion to Compel Production of Documents, filed by Interested Party SullivanCotter Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Horn, George)
November 9, 2021 Filing 249 Statement Authorizing the Unsealing of Documents Associated with the United States' Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Non-Party Sullivan Cotter and Associates, Inc. by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting Defendant's #247 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the United States' Complaint in Intervention to 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/1/2021. (SWM)
October 29, 2021 Filing 247 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to December 1, 2021 in which to #96 Amended Complaint Respond to United States' Complaint in Intervention, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc) Modified on 11/1/2021 (JRB).
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on October 28, 2021. The parties discussed Defendants' responses to the United States of America's and Relator's discovery requests. Between the Court's previous entry from September 21, 2021 ordering Defendants to begin immediately production of incentive compensation information, (Dkt. 235), and October 28, 2021, Defendants produced no documents. Defendants have now represented that all discovery production in response to the United States of America's and Relator's discovery requests will be completed on a rolling basis or before November 30, 2021.This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on December 2, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. (Eastern) to confirm that responses to discoveryhave been completed by Defendants. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a joint agenda for the telephonic status conference by 5:00 p.m. (Eastern) on November 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
October 27, 2021 Filing 245 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #242 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #241 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Sullivan Cotter and Associates Inc. (Persio, Joanna)
October 27, 2021 Filing 244 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #241 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Sullivan Cotter and Associates Inc. (Persio, Joanna)
October 27, 2021 Filing 243 Submission Joint Agenda for October 28, 2021 Status Conference, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 242 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #241 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Sullivan Cotter and Associates Inc. , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Persio, Joanna)
October 26, 2021 Filing 241 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Sullivan Cotter and Associates Inc., filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Search Terms, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - 5.28.21 Rule 45 Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - SCA Resp. to Rule 45 Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - 2017 OIG Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - 8.12.21 J. Olson Letter, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - 9.23.21 J. Olson Email, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - 9.2.21 J. Olson Email, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - 9.26.21 G. Horn Email, #9 Exhibit Ex. I - 10.6.21 K. Quinn Letter, #10 Exhibit Ex. J - 10.8.21 G. Horn Letter, #11 Exhibit Ex. K - 10.15.21 G. Horn Letter, #12 Exhibit Ex. L - 10.1.14 CHN Email, #13 Exhibit Ex. M - 10.6.14 CHN Email, #14 Exhibit Ex. N - 10.8.14 CHN Email, #15 Exhibit Ex. O - 1.3.18 G. Horn Email, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Persio, Joanna)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER denying #151 Motion to Dismiss United States' Complaint in Intervention Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 10/20/2021. (JRB)
October 8, 2021 Filing 238 NOTICE of NonRedaction of #237 Transcript , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re #237 Transcript. (Woods, Shelese) Modified on 10/12/2021 (JRB).
October 6, 2021 Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT of Teleconference held on 9/21/21 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (37 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Laura Howie-Walters (Telephone: (317) 632-3422). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 10/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2022. (Howie-Walters, Laura)
October 6, 2021 Filing 236 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Previously Recorded Teleconference held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 09/21/21 (Howie-Walters, Laura)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on September 21, 2021. The parties discussed Defendants' responses to the United States of America's discovery requests. The Court also reviewed the supplemental briefing submitted to chambers after the conclusion of the discovery conference from both parties.**SEE ENTRY for additional information.** Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #230 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Eric Parker Babbs withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/20/2021. (CBU)
September 17, 2021 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Garner Whitmire on behalf of Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA. (Whitmire, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 230 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Eric Babbs, filed by Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbs, Eric)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #227 Motion for Continuance - Discovery Conference RESET for 9/21/2021 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before September 3, 2021, the parties are to e-mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 9/2/2021.(SWM)
September 2, 2021 Filing 228 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC., re #152 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #160 Brief/Memorandum in Support, #178 Reply in Support of Motion. (Quigley, Marc)
August 30, 2021 Filing 227 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of September 8, 2021 telephone discovery conference, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Justin)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Conference set for 9/8/2021 08:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before September 3, 2021, the parties are to e-mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/27/2021.(SWM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna G. Persio on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Persio, Joanna)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on July 15, 2021. The parties discussed the status of and future plans for discovery. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on October 28, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
June 24, 2021 Filing 222 NOTICE of FILING of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference taken by Electronic Sound Recording held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5-24-21 (Knepley, Jean)
June 24, 2021 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Conference taken by Electronic Sound Recording, held on 5-24-21 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (53 pages.) Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jean Knepley (Telephone: (317) 696-3565). Please review #Local Rule 80-2 for more information on redaction procedures. Redaction Statement due 7/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2021. (Knepley, Jean)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER -This matter comes before the Court on the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery, Dkt. [ #219 ]. The Court, being duly advised, hereby GRANTS said Motion. The Defendant shall have to and including June 28, 2021 by which to respond to Relator Thomas P. Fischer's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Community Health Network and Relator Thomas P. Fischer's Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Community Health Network.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/15/2021. (SWM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to June 28, 2021 to Respond to Discovery, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Costakis, Thomas)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Defendants' Motion for Stipulated Protective Order, Dkt. [ #185 ]. The Court previously granted the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. (Dkt. #214 ). As such, this motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/10/2021. (SWM)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Relator's Motion for Entry of Protective Order, Dkt. [ #184 ]. The Court previously granted the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. (Dkt. #214 ). As such, this motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/10/2021. (SWM)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the United States of America's Motion for Entry of Protective Order, Dkt. [ #183 ]. The Court previously granted the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order. (Dkt. #214 ). As such, this motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/10/2021. (SWM)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting Relator's #213 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Community Health Network's discovery requests to 7/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/8/2021. (SWM)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PROTECTIVE ORDER #212 So APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/8/2021.(SWM)
June 7, 2021 Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to July 12, 2021 to Respond to Community Health Network's Written Discovery, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
June 4, 2021 Filing 212 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Quigley, Marc)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: Parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on May 24, 2021. The parties discussed Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. #183 , Relator's Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. #184 , Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. #185 , and the parties' proposed modifications submitted to chambers. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on July 15, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. **See Entry for Additional Information.** Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (TIME ONLY) - This matter is currently set for a telephonic Status Conference on May 24, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. The Court now changes the time to 11:00 a.m. (Eastern) on that same date. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number issued at Docket [ 209 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/21/2021.(SWM)
May 10, 2021 Filing 208 Exhibit List Preliminary, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC., Witness List Preliminary, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 207 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Responding to any written request for discovery or admission, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
May 4, 2021 Filing 206 NOTICE Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER (Nannis, Veronica)
May 3, 2021 Filing 205 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER, Exhibit List , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
May 3, 2021 Filing 204 Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
May 3, 2021 Filing 203 Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
May 3, 2021 Filing 202 Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
April 30, 2021 Filing 201 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Responding to any written request for discovery or admission, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
April 26, 2021 Filing 200 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 199 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
April 26, 2021 Filing 198 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
April 26, 2021 Filing 197 ESI SUPPLEMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN #190 So APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - AGREEMENT REGARDING FORMAT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ESI)(SWM)
April 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Discovery Conference on April 23, 2021. The parties discussed Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. #183 , Relator's Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. #184 , and Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. #185 . This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on May 24, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. (Eastern) to discuss the parties' proposed revisions to the protective order. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
April 21, 2021 Filing 195 Surreply re #151 MOTION to Dismiss United States' Complaint in Intervention Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SWM)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting USA's #182 Motion for leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is directed to docket Dkt. 182-1 as Plaintiff United States of America's sur-reply to Defendant Community Health Network, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #151 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/21/202. (SWM)
April 16, 2021 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order in Ex rel Fowler, #2 Exhibit B - Motion for Protective order in Ex rel Fowler)(Olson, Justin)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery Conference set for 4/23/2021 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The purpose of the conference is to discuss Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. [ #183 ], Relator's Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. [ #184 ] and Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, Dkt. [ #185 ]. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. On or before April 20, 2021, the parties are to e-mail the Court at MJPryor@insd.uscourts.gov, and a copy to each other, a brief outline of the dispute, their respective positions on the issues, possible solutions and any other documents they would like the Court to review in advance of the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/9/2021.(SWM)
April 9, 2021 Filing 190 Submission ESI Supplement to Case Management Plan, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement Regarding Format for the Production of ESI)(Quigley, Marc)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #186 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Daniel C. Fundakowski for COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, and VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Daniel C. Fundakowski via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/9/2021. (SWM)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/8/2021.(SWM)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/8/2021.(SWM)
April 8, 2021 Filing 186 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel C. Fundakowski to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6501688), filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Daniel C. Fundakowski in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 185 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(Quigley, Marc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 184 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
April 2, 2021 Filing 183 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Protective Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order in United States ex rel. Health Outcomes Techs., Inc. v. Hallmark Health Sys., Inc., #3 Exhibit 3 - Protective Order in United States ex rel. McCoyd v. Abbott Labs., #4 Exhibit 4 - Protective Order in United States v. Carrell, #5 Exhibit 5 - Protective Order in United States ex rel. Frascella v. Oracle Corp.)(Olson, Justin)
April 2, 2021 Filing 182 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Response to Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply)(Olson, Justin)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: Parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on March 19, 2021. The parties reported on the status of and future plans for discovery and potential settlement conference.This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on July 15, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Additionally, this matter is scheduled for a settlement conference on July 14, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern), in Room 255, United States Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana, before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
March 26, 2021 Filing 180 MOTION (Request) for Oral Argument, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
March 26, 2021 Filing 179 REPLY in Support of Motion re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8(a), 9(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure , filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
March 26, 2021 Filing 178 REPLY in Support of Motion re #151 MOTION to Dismiss United States' Complaint in Intervention Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2022. Discovery due by 7/25/2022. Settlement/Status Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in room #255, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (See Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/19/2021. (MAC)
March 17, 2021 Filing 176 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC. . (Quigley, Marc)
February 24, 2021 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8(a), 9(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Nannis, Veronica)
February 24, 2021 Filing 173 Statement of Interest Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
February 24, 2021 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION to Dismiss United States' Complaint in Intervention Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure , filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Olson, Justin)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #169 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Sarah S. Chu for THOMAS P. FISCHER added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Sarah S. Chu via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/19/2021. (SWM)
February 10, 2021 Filing 169 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah S. Chu to Appear pro hac vice Receipt No. 0756-6409016 ($100) (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Sarah S. Chu, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by telephone for a Status Conference on February 9, 2021. The parties discussed the status of and future plans for discovery. The parties will submit a proposed joint case management plan by March 17, 2021. This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on March 19, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. (Eastern) to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting Relator's #162 Consent Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Relator may file a response brief up to 55 pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/21/2021. (SWM)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the Relator's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, Dkt. [ #161 ]. The Court previously granted the Relator's Amended Consent Motion for Extension of Time. As such, this motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/21/2021. (SWM)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting Relator's #164 Amended Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, Dkt. #164 . The United States and the Relator will file any responses to Defendants' motions to dismiss on or before February 24, 2021. Defendants will file any reply briefs within thirty (30) days of the last filed response brief by the United States or Relator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/21/2021. (SWM)
January 20, 2021 Filing 164 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to (two week extension of time to Coordinated Briefing Schedule Deadlines) in which to #127 Order on Motion file Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/9/2021 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The purpose of the conference is to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/20/2021.(SWM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 162 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Relator's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
January 19, 2021 Filing 161 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to February 24, 2021 re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8(a), 9(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting Defendants' #154 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint that Exceeds Page Limit - The Clerk is directed to docket Dkt. 154-1 as Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 153), and should reflect a filing date of January 11, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/14/2021. (SWM)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #137 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney W. Westling for COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, Richard W. Westling for COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., Richard W. Westling for COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., Richard W. Westling for COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., Richard W. Westling for EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, Richard W. Westling for HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, Richard W. Westling for HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, Richard W. Westling for HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, Richard W. Westling for INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, Richard W. Westling for NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., Richard W. Westling for NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, Richard W. Westling for NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, Richard W. Westling for SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, Richard W. Westling for VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Richard W. Westling via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/14/2021. (SWM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Harris on behalf of Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Harris, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2021 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Sibley Bahnsen on behalf of Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Bahnsen, Erica)
January 12, 2021 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Breen on behalf of Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Breen, George)
January 11, 2021 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint That Exceeds Page Limit, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8(a), 9(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 153 MOTION to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8(a), 9(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 152 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #151 MOTION to Dismiss United States' Complaint in Intervention Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 151 MOTION to Dismiss United States' Complaint in Intervention Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 149 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 148 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 147 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 144 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 142 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 141 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 138 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 137 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard W. Westling to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6360819), filed by Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Richard W. Westling in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Costakis on behalf of Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Costakis, Thomas)
January 11, 2021 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc T. Quigley on behalf of Defendants COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC, COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC., COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC., EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC, HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER, HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER, INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP, NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P., NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC, NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
December 2, 2020 Filing 134 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Severance Benefit Agreement)(Nannis, Veronica)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER - For the reasons discussed above, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff-Relator's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, Dkt. #108 . Plaintiff- Relator is permitted to file the Second Amended Complaint within ten (10) days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff-Relator shall serve the Defendants the Second Amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of filing the Second Amended Complaint. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2020. (NAD)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re [32, 32-1] Amended Complaint and attached exhibit is ordered UNSEALED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/24/2020.(CBU)
June 16, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Eric Parker Babbs hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Babbs, Eric)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting Relator' #128 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Relator to serve the operative complaint on the named Defendants is extended until the Court's ruling on the Relator's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/15/2020. (SWM)
April 14, 2020 Filing 129 Surreply re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
April 9, 2020 Filing 128 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Process of Operative Complaint, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting Parties' #125 Joint Motion for Coordinated Briefing Schedule Regarding Responses to Complaints. See Order for briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/3/2020. (SWM)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting Defendant Community Health Network, Inc.s #123 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Relator's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Defendant Community Health Network, Inc. shall have to and including April 14, 2020 by which to file a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Relator's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 4/3/2020. (SWM)
March 31, 2020 Filing 125 Joint MOTION for Coordinated Briefing Schedule Regarding Responses to Complaints, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
March 31, 2020 Filing 124 REPLY in Support of Motion re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
March 27, 2020 Filing 123 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Relator's Motion for Leave of Court to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting Relators #118 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to 3/31/2020 re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/24/2020. (SWM)
March 24, 2020 Filing 121 Statement of Interest by STATE OF INDIANA. (Babbs, Eric)
March 24, 2020 Filing 120 Statement of Interest by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Woods, Shelese)
March 24, 2020 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THOMAS P. FISCHER of Mail Service of Relator's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply [DKT. 118] (DeLaney, Kathleen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to March 31, 2020 re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint , filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Mark E. Mader withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/17/2020. (SWM)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #113 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Elizabeth A. Harris for COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Elizabeth A. Harris via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/17/2020. (SWM)
March 17, 2020 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint , filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 114 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Mark Mader, filed by Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babbs, Eric)
March 12, 2020 Filing 113 MOTION for Attorney(s) Elizabeth A. Harris to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5904339), filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Elizabeth A. Harris in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Erica Sibley Bahnsen for COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to Erica Sibley Bahnsen via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/5/202. (SWM)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney George B. Breen for COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. added. Applicant shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. Copy to George B. Breen via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/5/2020. (SWM)
March 5, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Di Dio on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Di Dio, Arthur)
March 5, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anne Quinn on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Quinn, Kelly)
March 3, 2020 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Relator THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Severance Benefit Agreement, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
March 3, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 105 MOTION for Attorney(s) Erica Sibley Bahnsen to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5886484), filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Erica Sibley Bahnsen in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for Attorney(s) George B. Breen to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5886472), filed by Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of George B. Breen in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Costakis on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Costakis, Thomas)
March 3, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc T. Quigley on behalf of Defendant COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (Quigley, Marc)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting USA's #98 Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal. Docket No. 97, including all attachments, shall be maintained UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/9/2020. (SWM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. waiver sent on 1/6/2020. (Woods, Shelese)
January 7, 2020 Filing 99 Summons Issued as to COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.. (JRB)
January 6, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION to Maintain Document Under Seal #97 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) Exhibits to Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woods, Shelese)
January 6, 2020 Filing 97 *** SEALED PER DKT. NUMBER #101 *** SEALED EXHIBITS, re #96 Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Breast Surgeons Claims, #2 Exhibit 3 - Cardiovascular Specialists Claims, #3 Exhibit 4 - Neurosurgeons Claims, #4 Exhibit 5 - Physicians Incentive Comp)(Woods, Shelese) Modified on 1/9/2020 (SWM).
January 6, 2020 Filing 96 AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION against COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1- Provider Numbers, #4 Exhibit 2 - Breast Surgeon Claims, #5 Exhibit 3 - Cardiovascular Specialists Claims, #6 Exhibit 4 - Neurosurgeons Claims, #7 Exhibit 5 - Physicians Incentive Comp, #8 Exhibit 6 - Enrollment False Certifications, #9 Exhibit 7 - Cost Report Certifications)(Woods, Shelese)
December 31, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Eric Parker Babbs hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Babbs, Eric)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting State of Indiana's #92 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention. The Relator's complaint, the State's Notice of Election to Decline Intervention, and this Order be unsealed; The seal be lifted on all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/23/2019. (MAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting United States' #86 Notice of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline Intervention in Part. The relator's complaint, the Government's Notice of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline to Intervene in Part, and this Order be unsealed; The United States serve its Complaint upon defendant Community Health Network, Inc., together with this Order, within 120 days; The Relator serve his Complaint upon defendants also within 120 days; All other papers or Orders on file in this matter shall remain under seal. The seal be lifted on all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/23/2019. (MAC)
December 5, 2019 Filing 92 ***ORDERED UNSEALED AT #94 ***NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention, filed by Plaintiff STATE OF INDIANA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mader, Mark) Modified on 12/16/2019 (TMD). Modified on 12/23/2019 (MAC).
August 7, 2019 Filing 86 ***ORDERED UNSEALED AT #93 ***NOTICE of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline to Intervene in Part, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Woods, Shelese) Modified on 8/8/2019 (JRB). Modified on 12/23/2019 (MAC).
July 21, 2014 Filing 1 ***ORDERED UNSEALED AT #93 AND #94 ***COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by STATE OF INDIANA and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ex rel. THOMAS P. FISCHER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP041690). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Severance Benefit Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(DJH) Modified on 12/23/2019 (MAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- SOUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- KOKOMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- EAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- NORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANCOCK SURGERY CENTER
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISIONARY ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY DIGESTIVE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- NORTHWEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER -- HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY PHYSICIANS OF INDIANA, INC.
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY HEALTH NETWORK FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANAPOLIS ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLP doing business as COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER - SOUTH
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER NORTH
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER KOKOMO
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY ENDOSCOPY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY DIGESTIVE CENTER - ANDERSON
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST CAMPUS SURGERY CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER - EAST
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWEST SURGERY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTER - NORTHWEST
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAMPUS OFFICE ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON SURGERY CENTER, LLC doing business as COMMUNITY SURGERY CENTE RHAMILTON
Represented By: Thomas J. Costakis
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Harris
Represented By: Richard W. Westling
Represented By: George B. Breen
Represented By: Erica Sibley Bahnsen
Represented By: Daniel C. Fundakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: THOMAS P. FISCHER
Represented By: Molly Beth Knobler
Represented By: Jay P. Holland
Represented By: Mark J. Plantan
Represented By: Colette G. Matzzie
Represented By: Timothy P McCormack
Represented By: Leah Judge
Represented By: Eric R. Havian
Represented By: Kathleen Ann DeLaney
Represented By: Veronica B. Nannis
Represented By: Sarah S. Chu
Represented By: Annavieve C. Conklin
Represented By: Erika Jacobsen White
Represented By: Bianca Beam
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jonathan A. Bont
Represented By: Arthur Di Dio
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Represented By: Kelly Anne Quinn
Represented By: Justin R. Olson
Represented By: Joanna G. Persio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Represented By: Mark E. Mader
Represented By: Kristen M. Kemp
Represented By: Matthew Garner Whitmire
Represented By: Fallon Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SULLIVANCOTTER, INC.
Represented By: Edgar Bueno
Represented By: Edgar D. Bueno
Represented By: George Horn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?