BRIDGEWATER et al v. CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS et al
Plaintiff: |
ANTHONY BRIDGEWATER and CRYSTAL BRIDGEWATER |
Defendant: |
CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, GREGORY KESSIE and CHAD OSBORNE |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01370 |
Filed: |
August 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Magnus-Stinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 26, 2016 |
Filing
113
ORDER - Plaintiff may not present any of his medical providers or Hannah Slack to testify at trial; Plaintiff may present the medical records contained at Filing No. 104-4, in that form only, as long as he provides the Court with a certification f or those records; Defendants' Motion in Limine #4 is GRANTED IN PART, their Motion in Limine #6 is GRANTED, and their Motion in Limine #7 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth above; Plaintiff's objection relating to Defendan ts' introduction of the police reports at trial is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to assert the objection at trial, when the Court can examine the contents of the reports; and Plaintiff's 105 Motion to Preclude Use or Reference to Deposition Testimony of Anthony Bridgewater and/or Crystal Bridgewater is DENIED. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/26/2016. (GSO)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
70
ORDER - Defendants' 53 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Additionally, Plaintiffs' 62 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Court GRANTS summary judgment in Defendants' favor o n Plaintiffs' § 1983 unlawful stop and search claim against Detectives Osborne and Kessie, Plaintiffs' state law false imprisonment claim against the City, and Plaintiffs' intentional infliction of emotional distress claim agai nst the City. The Court DENIES summary judgment on all remaining claims. No partial final judgment shall issue. The Clerk is directed to TERMINATE Ms. Bridgewater and Detective Kessie as parties, as the Court has granted summary judgment in favor o f Defendants on all of Ms. Bridgewater's claims, and on all claims against Detective Kessie. The following claims remain for trial: Mr. Bridgewater's § 1983 excessive force claim against Detective Osborne and Mr. Bridgewater's s tate law battery claim against the City. The Court requests that the Magistrate Judge confer with the remaining parties to address the possibility of resolving the remaining claims prior to the June 13, 2016 trial scheduled in this matter. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/22/2016. (GSO)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?