BRAKE PLUS LLC et al v. KINETECH. LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRAKE PLUS LLC, BRAKE PLUS NWA, INC., KEVIN CANNON, JILL CATES, RON CHRISTIAN, D MAC ENTERPRISES, MICHELLE HANBY, IT'S A DATE, LLC, MAD AFTERMARKET SERVICES, LLC and PAT CROZIER ENTERPRISES, INC.
Defendant: KINETECH. LLC and MARK OLSON
Third Party Defendant: RICHARD BATTAGLINI, BRAKESAFE REAR END COLLISION AVOIDANCE SYSTEM, LLC., JEFF HAIL and DUSTIN SHEPHERD
Third Party Plaintiff: KINETECH. LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv01415
Filed: August 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:25 Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENTRY on Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion for leave to file additional Motion for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, Kinetech's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 24 is DENIED, and its Motion for Lea ve to File Additional Motion for Summary Judgment 27 is GRANTED. Any additional dispositive motions may be filed no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. (See Entry). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/19/2015. Copy to Jeff Hail via U.S. Mail. (MAC) Modified on 6/19/2015 (MAC).
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER - ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 64 ; The Magistrate Judge submitted his Report and Recommendation Regarding Order of Default (Filing No. 64). The parties were afforded due opportunity pursuant to statute and the rules of thi s Court to file objections; none were filed. The Court, having considered the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, hereby adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. The Court now enters Default against Defendants Richard Battaglini and Brakesafe Rear End Collision Avoidance System, LLC for their failure to comply with the Court's orders. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/27/2015. Copies Sent (CKM) Modified on 2/27/2015 (CKM).
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Quash filed by non-party Brake Plus LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/11/2015 (dist made) (CBU)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAKE PLUS LLC et al v. KINETECH. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: RICHARD BATTAGLINI
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: BRAKESAFE REAR END COLLISION AVOIDANCE SYSTEM, LLC.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: JEFF HAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: DUSTIN SHEPHERD
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAKE PLUS LLC
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAKE PLUS NWA, INC.
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN CANNON
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JILL CATES
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON CHRISTIAN
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D MAC ENTERPRISES
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE HANBY
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IT'S A DATE, LLC
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAD AFTERMARKET SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAT CROZIER ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Fred Anthony Paganelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: KINETECH. LLC
Represented By: Jacob R. Cox
Represented By: Nicole Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINETECH. LLC
Represented By: Jacob R. Cox
Represented By: Nicole Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK OLSON
Represented By: Jacob R. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?