BANES v. MODANY et al
Plaintiff: |
DAVID BANES |
Defendant: |
DANIEL FITZPATRICK, ITT EDUCATIONAL SERVICES, INC. and KEVIN MODANY |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01599 |
Filed: |
September 30, 2014 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Debra McVicker Lynch |
Presiding Judge: |
Tanya Walton Pratt |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 24, 2016 |
Filing
110
FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - The Court has received the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement dated November 2, 2015 ("the Stipulation"), which has been entered into by Plaintiffs (on behalf of themselves and th e Settlement Class) and Defendants, and the Court has reviewed the Stipulation and the Exhibits annexed thereto. The awarded attorneys' fees and expenses, and interest earned thereon, shall be paid to Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel from the Set tlement Fund immediately after the date this Order is executed subject to the terms, conditions, and obligations of the Stipulation and in particular 6.2 thereof, which terms, conditions, and obligations are incorporated herein. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/24/2016.(JLS)
|
March 16, 2015 |
Filing
75
Order on Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Counsel: For the foregoing reasons, Meitav's Motion (Filing No. 26) to be appointed lead plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court hereby appoints Meitav Dash Mutual Fund Management Ltd. as lead plaintiff and approves Meitav's selection of lead and liaison counsel. All other motions for appointment as lead plaintiff; Filing No. 20 (Cynthia Grebely and Hoai T. Truong), Filing No. 22 (Kumud Jindal), Filing No. 29 (movant Chang Pin Lin), and Filing No. 34 (Helene Hamel), are DENIED. The Court requests the Magistrate Judge to conduct a case management conference with counsel for the lead plaintiff and for defendants ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/16/2015. (DW)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?