ELDER CARE PROVIDERS OF INDIANA, INC. v. HOME INSTEAD, INC.

Plaintiff: ELDER CARE PROVIDERS OF INDIANA, INC.
Defendant: HOME INSTEAD, INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01894
Filed: November 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER - Denying Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages; We DENY Elder Care's Limited Motion for Reconsideration of our Order on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment Dkt. No. 339 and we DENY as moot Home Instead's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Punitive Damages Dkt. No. 312 . Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/26/2017. *** SEE ORDER *** (CKM)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER - The Parties' Cross Motions for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 190 and 192 ] are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/24/2017. (JD)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 233 Motion to Compel. Both parties seek attorneys' fees for their effort to either file or respond to this Motion. Rule 37(a)(5)(C) instructs tha t if a motion to compel discovery is granted in part and denied in part, the Court may award reasonable attorneys' fees. When "the dispute over discovery between the parties is genuine,... the losing party is substantially justified in carrying the matter to the court" and the award of expenses is not indicated. Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a) (1970 Committee Notes). The Court finds this to be the case here and declines to award attorneys' fees (see Order for additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 3/8/2016. (SWM)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion for Preliminary Injunction *** SEE ORDER ***. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/14/2015. (CKM)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL: Counter-Defendants' Motion to Maintain Documents Under Seal [Dkt. 93] is DENIED as MOOT and Counter-Defendants' Motion to Maintain Certain Documents Under Seal and Statement A uthorizing Unsealing of Other Documents [Dkt. 111] is GRANTED. Additionally, the Court ORDERS the parties to appear for a hearing on Home Instead's remaining motions to seal [Dkts. 103, 115, 117, & 120], which is to take place on Tuesday, August 11, 2015 at 1:30 pm at 46 East Ohio Street in Courtroom 243 (see Order for additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2015.(SWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELDER CARE PROVIDERS OF INDIANA, INC. v. HOME INSTEAD, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELDER CARE PROVIDERS OF INDIANA, INC.
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Ronald E. Elberger
Represented By: Gregory W. Guevara
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME INSTEAD, INC.
Represented By: Mark R. Alson
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Adam W. Barney
Represented By: Trenten P. Bausch
Represented By: Theresa D. Koller
Represented By: Olga A. Voinarevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?