MYERS v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION et al
Plaintiff: |
JASON T. MYERS |
Defendant: |
DONNA CARNEYGEE, KATHY GRIFFIN, RUSSEL HIATT, INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION, TIM PURCELL, ROBERT STAFFORD, UNKNOWN PARTY, UNKNOWN PARTY (MS. WOODS) and L.A. VANATTA |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00471 |
Filed: |
March 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark J. Dinsmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Tanya Walton Pratt |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Relief pursuant to Rule 60. (S.O.). Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/1/2015. (MAC)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion to Amend/Correct the dismissal of this action. The dismissal of this action counts as a "strike" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/1/2015. (MAC)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
19
ENTRY Discussing Response to Show Cause Order and Amended Complaint, Dismissing Action, and Directing Entry of Judgment. For the reasons explained in this Entry and in the Entry of May 6, 2015, the plaintiff's amended complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and must be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b). Judgment consistent with this Entry and with the Entry of May 6, 2015, shall now issue. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/11/2015.(MAC)
|
May 6, 2015 |
Filing
11
Entry Discussing Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause, Dismissing Complaint, and Directing Further Proceedings - Mr. Myers has requested that the Court reconsider its ruling on severance of his two claims. Mr. Myers's motion to show cause (Dkt. 9 ) is GRANTED to the extent that he has presented a sufficient explanation of the timeliness issue. Accordingly, the action will not be dismissed at this time based on the statute of limitations.The complaint is dismissed fo r failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Mr. Myers shall have through June 5, 2015, in which to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. **SEE ORDER**. Copy Mailed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/6/2015. (MGG) Modified on 5/6/2015 (MGG).
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
8
Entry Discussing Complaint, Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Discussing Severance, and Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. 3 ) is GRANTED. An assessment of an initial partial filing fee is not feasible at this time. The plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Dkt. 4 ) is DENIED as premature. Copy Mailed. **SEE ENTRY**. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/30/2015. (MGG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?