JOHNSON v. LEMMON et al
Plaintiff: |
RICHARD KEITH JOHNSON |
Defendant: |
BOND, A. COLE, CONNORS, COOPERRIDER, HURT, BRUCE LEMMON, J. MATHEWS, NELSON, SCAIFE, G. SPEARS and D. ZATECKY |
Miscellaneous: |
PENDLETON CF (Court Use Only) |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00799 |
Filed: |
May 18, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Denise K. LaRue |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Magnus-Stinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER Severing Misjoined Claims and Directing the Opening of Two New Civil Actions. Consistent with the determination and rulings made in Part III of this Entry, all claims against all defendants expect Sgt. Hurt are dismissed without prejudice and terminated in this action, 1:15-cv-799-JMS-DKL. After the new actions are opened, the claims raised in those actions shall be screened as required by 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/15/2015. Copy sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (BGT)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing
19
ENTRY Discussing Development of Action. The plaintiff states that all the defendants are responsible for his conditions of confinement and "[i]f this Court wishes not to hold them accountable as such then the plaintiff request a leave to amen d his complaint...." The request to file an amended complaint is granted to the extent that the plaintiff shall have through September 16, 2015, in which to file a second amended complaint which will be severed into a new action. This action shall proceed against Sgt. Hurt, unless the plaintiff files a motion to voluntarily dismiss that claim against Sgt. Hurt prior to the filing of the amended complaint. The plaintiff's motion for a copy of the docket sheet [dkt. 16] is granted . The clerk is directed to include a copy of the docket sheet and amended complaint [dkt. 5] along with the plaintiff's copy of this Entry. SEE ENTRY. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 9/1/2015. Copies sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. (BGT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?