PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES- MONROE, LLC v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BLOOMINGTON, INC.
Plaintiff: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES- MONROE, LLC
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BLOOMINGTON, INC.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Young
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal of Count I and SUSTAINS Plaintiff's 53 objection to Magistrate Judge's Entry on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's shall have 5 business days to file First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/29/2017. (TMD)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Denise K. LaRue on 12/8/2016. (CBU)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting IU Bloomington's 16 Motion to Dismiss. Count I is dismissed with prejudice. Monroe Hospital shall have through FRIDAY, OCTOBER 28, 2016, to show cause why Count II should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdicti on pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). If Monroe Hospital does not show cause by that date, the court will dismiss Count II, close the case, and issue a Final Judgment in favor of IU Health Bloomington. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 9/30/2016. (TMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES- MONROE, LLC v. INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BLOOMINGTON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BLOOMINGTON, INC.
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Anna M. Konradi
Represented By: Kathy Lynn Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES- MONROE, LLC
Represented By: Scott D. Gilchrist
Represented By: Irwin B. Levin
Represented By: Michael Wesley McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?