BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC et al v. A3 MEDIA LLC et al

Plaintiff: BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC, JOSHUA BROWN and TOWNEPOST NETWORK INC.
Defendant: A3 MEDIA LLC, CHILLY PANDA MEDIA, LLC, COLLECTIVE PUBLISHING LLC, NEIL LUCAS, YELENA LUCAS, JANELLE MORRISON, DANN VELDKAMP and JODY VELDKAMP
Third Party Plaintiff: A3 MEDIA LLC, CHILLY PANDA MEDIA, LLC, COLLECTIVE PUBLISHING LLC, NEIL LUCAS, YELENA LUCAS, JANELLE MORRISON, DANN VELDKAMP and JODY VELDKAMP
Counter Claimant: A3 MEDIA LLC, CHILLY PANDA MEDIA, LLC, COLLECTIVE PUBLISHING LLC, NEIL LUCAS, YELENA LUCAS, JANELLE MORRISON, DANN VELDKAMP and JODY VELDKAMP
Third Party Defendant: JEANNE BRITT, TOM BRITT, BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC, JOSH BROWN, JOSHUA BROWN, TONI FOLZENLOGEL and TOWNEPOST NETWORK INC.
Counter Defendant: JEANNE BRITT, TOM BRITT, BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC, JOSHUA BROWN and TOWNEPOST NETWORK INC.
Case Number: 1:2016cv02884
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER ON CONSOLIDATED APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES - The Consolidated Application seeks an award of $88,933.45. This amount is net of a $1,000.00 sanction the Court issued against the Britt Parties. The Court makes the following reductions of the amount sought: (1) $4,833.00 for fees not encompassed by the awards; (2) $5,980.50 for inefficiencies; (3) $1,923.50 for tasks that were essentially clerical in nature; and (4) $9,496.02 to account for some la ck of success on the Motion for Contempt. Therefore, the Consolidated Application for Attorneys' Fees (Filing No. 293 ) is GRANTED and the Court awards the Britt Parties an amended total award of $66,700.43. All Defendants except Janelle Morrison (who was not subject to the TRO) are jointly and severally liable for this amount. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/26/2019. (NAD)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ENTRY ON BRITT PARTIES' 319 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION - In light of this controlling and directly applicable case law from the Seventh Circuit, the Court will not deny as untimely or strike from the record the Lucas Parties' Motion to Dismiss docketed at Filing No. 294 . Instead, the Court will treat the Motion as a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings under Rule 12(c). With this clarification provided to the parties, the Britt Parties are granted leave to file their Answer t o the counterclaims and third-party claims pled in the Lucas Parties' Answer at Filing No. 62 within seven (7) days of the Court's Order. The pending Motion to Dismiss, now treated as a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, is fully bri efed and ripe for the Court's ruling. Also pending before the Court are motions for partial summary judgment filed by the Britt Parties and the Lucas Parties (Filing No. 335 ; Filing No. 338 ). These motions also are fully briefed and ripe for the Court's ruling. The Court will rule on these other motions in due course. The Britt Parties' Motion for Clarification (Filing No. 319 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/5/2019. (NAD)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 251 Report and Recommendations. See order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/5/2018. (MEJ)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 257 Report and Recommendations, 210 Motion for Default Judgment filed by TOM BRITT, BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC, JEANNE BRITT, TOWNEPOST NETWORK INC. See order for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/5/2018. (MEJ)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ENTRY ON MOTION TO DISMISS - For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Joshua Brown's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 132 ), and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the Britt Parties' Motion for Partial Dismis sal (Filing No. 134 ). The Motions to Dismiss as they relate to the Counterclaimants' claims of tortious interference with business relationships, defamation, and franchise fraud under Ind. Code § 23-2-2.5-27 are dismissed without prej udice. However, the Motions to Dismiss with regard to the Counterclaimants' franchise fraud claim under Ind. Code § 23-2-2.7-2 are dismissed with prejudice. Furthermore, the Motions to Dismiss in relation to Brown's immunity defense and the Britt Parties' anti-SLAPP defenses are DENIED. The Counterclaimants are granted leave of twenty-one days (21) from the date of this Entry within which to file an Amended Counterclaim and Third- Party Complaint, if any. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/16/2017. (JLS)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENTRY on Pending Motions. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order and the TRO is extended until November 14 at 3:00 pm. 11 . The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' Motion for Exte nsion of Time to Respond. 20 . The motion is granted in that Defendants have until the end of the day on October 31, 2016 to file their response, and denied in that the Court is extending the TRO until November 14, 2016. Further, the Court refers Plaintiffs' Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt (Filing No. 17) to Magistrate Judge Dinsmore to issue a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B). Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/31/2016. (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC et al v. A3 MEDIA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: A3 MEDIA LLC
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: CHILLY PANDA MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: COLLECTIVE PUBLISHING LLC
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: NEIL LUCAS
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: YELENA LUCAS
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: JANELLE MORRISON
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: DANN VELDKAMP
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: JODY VELDKAMP
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: A3 MEDIA LLC
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CHILLY PANDA MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: COLLECTIVE PUBLISHING LLC
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NEIL LUCAS
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: YELENA LUCAS
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JANELLE MORRISON
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: DANN VELDKAMP
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: JODY VELDKAMP
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A3 MEDIA LLC
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHILLY PANDA MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLECTIVE PUBLISHING LLC
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEIL LUCAS
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YELENA LUCAS
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANELLE MORRISON
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANN VELDKAMP
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JODY VELDKAMP
Represented By: Matthew M. Cree
Represented By: P. Adam Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: JEANNE BRITT
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: TOM BRITT
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Stephanie Maris
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: JOSH BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: JOSHUA BROWN
Represented By: Ronald E. Elberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: TONI FOLZENLOGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: TOWNEPOST NETWORK INC.
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: JEANNE BRITT
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: TOM BRITT
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Stephanie Maris
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: JOSHUA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: TOWNEPOST NETWORK INC.
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITT INTERACTIVE LLC
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Stephanie Maris
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOWNEPOST NETWORK INC.
Represented By: Josh F. Brown
Represented By: Jonathan D. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?