GRIFFITH v. A. DOWNEY et al

Plaintiff: JAMES F. GRIFFITH
Defendant: A. DOWNEY, KEVIN ALLEN, F. BRANNICK, DEVINE, E. DRADA, D. HASKINS, KEVIN HUNTER, N. LYDAY, ROB MARSHALL, FERNELL MCDONALD, LT. NICHOLSON, PHILLIPS, STORM, SULLIVAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR and YARBAR
Case Number: 1:2017cv00194
Filed: January 18, 2017
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, dkt. 21 is DENIED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f)(1), Defendants shall have through December 26, 2018, in which to respond to the Court's proposal regarding summary judgment and Mr. Griff ith will have fourteen days to reply to any response. Mr. Griffith's Motion to Stay the Decision on the Pending Motion for Summary Judgment, dkt. 36 , is in light of this Entry DENIED as moot. Mr. Griffith's Motion to Compel, dkt. 37 , is DENIED because discovery on non-exhaustion issues was stayed pending the Court's resolution of the exhaustion issue. Once the exhaustion issue is fully resolved, a pretrial schedule will issue and the parties may commence discovery. See entry for details Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/4/2017. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (MEJ)
April 26, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - Accordingly, Defendants shall have through June 1, 2017, in which to either 1) file a dispositive motion in support of the affirmative defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies prior to filing this lawsuit, 2) notify the Court that this affirmative defense is not amenable to resolution through a dispositive motion, or 3) notify the Court that defendants will not pursue the affirmative defense of failure to exhaust. If a dispositive motion is filed, plaintiff shall have twenty-eight (28) days in which to respond. Defendants shall then have fourteen (14) days in which to reply. Except for activities associated with the development and resolution of the Defendants' affirmative defense that the Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies prior to filing this action, or any other matter directed by the Court, any other activities or deadlines in the action are stayed. Discovery on the issue of exhaustion is allowed. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/26/2017.(JLS)
March 21, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Entry denying 8 Motion to Maintain Document Under Seal. For these reasons, the plaintiff's motion to seal the records and proceed as John Doe [dkt. 8 ] is denied. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail.Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/21/2017. (JLS)
February 23, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court Entry Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis [dkt. 4 ] is granted. Given the foregoing, the following excessive force claim shall proceed. All other claims and defendants inc luding A. Downey, Kevin Allen, Fernell McDonald, Storm, Lt. Nicholson, Rob Marshall, Kevin Hunter, and the Sullivan County Prosecutor are dismissed. The clerk is directed to terminate these defendants on the docket. If the plaintiff believes that ad ditional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court he shall have through March 15, 2017, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendants. (See Entry.) Copy sent to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/23/2017. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFITH v. A. DOWNEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. DOWNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. BRANNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. DRADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. HASKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. LYDAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROB MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERNELL MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. NICHOLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STORM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULLIVAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YARBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES F. GRIFFITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?