HOSTETLER v. CITY OF SOUTHPORT, ACTING BY AND THROUGH ITS POLICE DEPARTMENT et al
Plaintiff: |
MARC HOSTETLER |
Defendant: |
CITY OF SOUTHPORT, JASON SWANSON and THOMAS L. VAUGHN |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv01564 |
Filed: |
May 12, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana |
Office: |
Indianapolis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Debra McVicker Lynch |
Presiding Judge: |
Tanya Walton Pratt |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 25, 2019 |
Filing
57
ENTRY - GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 39 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Marc has not raised any material fact calling into question the officers' belief that they had probable cause to request the search warrants or to arrest him, and he is un able to state a constitutional violation as required by § 1983 or state a claim for state false arrest. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 39) is GRANTED. Summary judgment is granted on all the claims, and this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/25/2019. (NAD)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
34
ENTRY ON DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS - For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' Partial Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Filing No. 12 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is granted as to Marc� 39;s claim against Chief Vaughn in his official capacity. It is denied as to Marc's federal claims against Chief Vaughn, in his individual capacity, Swanson, in his individual capacity, and the Monell claim against Southport. Marc's illegal search and false arrest claims also remain pending as Southport did not move for judgment on those claims. Marc has withdrawn his state law claims for trespass, negligence, malicious prosecution, and intentional infliction of emotional distress, so those claims are dismissed with prejudice. See Entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/27/2018. (MAT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?