ROWE v. DILLOW et al

Plaintiff: JEFFREY ALLEN ROWE
Defendant: BROWN, BURKHARDT, ALICIA D. COOMER, CORRECTIONAL CAPTAIN GARD, AMBER DILLOW, GEO GROUP, INC., JEFFERY GLOVER, HUFFARD, BRUCE D. IPPLE, THOMPSON and JESSICA WIGAL
Case Number: 1:2017cv03288
Filed: September 15, 2017
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2018 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 91 Motion to Compel Discovery and denying Plaintiff's 98 Motion for Reconsideration. (See Order). Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/17/2018. (MAC)
March 13, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Entry Discussing Motion for a TRO and Preliminary Injunction - Plaintiff Jeffrey Allen Rowe has a cyst on his testicle which causes him severe pain and prevents him from doing many daily activities. He alleges that he has been denied treatment for this condition in a number of ways. He seeks a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction ordering the defendants to provide him with particular pain medication and to provide him effective treatment for this condition. Because the standards for a temporary restraining order are essentially identical and because the defendants have had a full opportunity to respond, the Court treats the motion as one for a preliminary injunction. The defendants argue that Rowe's claims for injunctive relief are moot because he is now receiving the pain medication that he requests. Because Rowe is now receiving this medication, his request for it is denied as moot. The motion for a preliminary injunction, dkt. 11 , is denied. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/13/2018. (BRR)
January 22, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - 13 Motion for Leave to File is granted. The clerk shall re-docket the proposed supplemental complaint (dkt 13-2) as the supplemental complaint. Defendants Gard, Thompson, and the GEO Group have already appeared in this action. They shall have twenty-one days to file an Answer to the Supplemental Complaint. The clerk is designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendant R. Jackson in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the supplemental complaint, applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/22/2018. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff and R. Jackson) (MEJ)
October 24, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY Screening Complaint and Directing Further Proceedings - The clerk is designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to the defendants in the manner specified by Rule 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint, applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/24/2017. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff, Defendants, and Douglass Bitner) (MEJ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/24/2017) (MEJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROWE v. DILLOW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURKHARDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICIA D. COOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL CAPTAIN GARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMBER DILLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERY GLOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUFFARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE D. IPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA WIGAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY ALLEN ROWE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?