RIDDLE et al v. BATHOLOMEW COUNTY et al

Plaintiff: ANGELITO C. MERCADO and CHRISTOPHER RIDDLE
Defendant: BARTHOLOMEW COUNTY, BOOTH, OFFICER BUTLER, CLAYBURN, CROUCH, FIPPEN, FOSTER, GREENLY, HOLDREITH, MARTOCIA, MOORE, MATT MYERS, REED, SEARLES, STILLABOWER, TOOLEY and WEAVER
Case Number: 1:2017cv03710
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - 15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is granted. The clerk is directed to docket the proposed complaint, dkt. [15-1], as the amended complaint in this action. The plaintiff's claim against Bartholomew County Commissioners is dismissed. The clerk is designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendants Sgts. Weaver and Reed, Officers Fippen, Greenly, Tooley and Searles, and Lt. Stillabower in the manner specified by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). Pr ocess shall consist of the amended complaint, applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/17/2018. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff, Sgt. Weaver, Sgt. Reed, Officer Fipper, Officer Greenly, Officer Tooley, Officer Searles, and Lt. Stillabower ) (MEJ)
November 29, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court Entry Screening Complaint, and Directing Further Proceedings - 9 Motion to Withdraw is granted. The clerk is directed to remove Angelito C. Mercado as a plaintiff in this action. Riddle's gender-based equal protection policy and practice cla im against Sheriff Matt Myers shall proceed. The identical claim against Bartholomew County is dismissed because the plaintiff does not allege any facts to support the conclusion that Bartholomew County participated in the Sheriff's policy decis ion. Riddle's claims against all other defendants are dismissed because he did not allege sufficient facts to support a claim that they each personally participated in the alleged discrimination. As for Riddle's second claim related to the disciplinary process, to the extent that he alleges he was denied due process in his attempts to grieve or otherwise pursue his administrative remedies, this claim is also denied. Riddle's equal protection policy and practice claim against Sheri ff Matt Myers, based upon the alleged disparity of punishment between male and female inmates in the Bartholomew County Jail shall proceed. This summary of remaining claims includes all of the viable claims identified by the Court. All other claims h ave been dismissed. If the plaintiff believes that additional claims were alleged in the complaint, but not identified by the Court he shall have through December 29, 2017, in which to identify those claims. The clerk is directed to remove all other defendants from the docket. The clerk is designated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) to issue process to defendants Sheriff Matt Myers and Bartholomew County in the manner specified by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). Process shall consist of the complaint ( docket 1), applicable forms (Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and Waiver of Service of Summons), and this Entry. See entry for details. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/29/2017. (Copy mailed to Christopher Riddle and Sheriff Matt Myers) (MEJ)
October 30, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Mr. Riddle is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Forty Three Dollars and Fourteen Cents ($43.14). He shall have through December 1, 2017, in which to pay this sum t o the clerk of the district court or to inform the Court of his desire to voluntarily withdraw his complaint and avoid assessment of the filing fee. Mr. Mercado shall have through December 1, 2017, in which to pay the $400.00 filing fee to the clerk of the district court or to inform the Court of his desire to voluntarily withdraw his complaint and avoid assessment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/30/2017. (Copy mailed to Plaintiffs) (MEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIDDLE et al v. BATHOLOMEW COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARTHOLOMEW COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIPPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLDREITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTOCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STILLABOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELITO C. MERCADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER RIDDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?