COMMON CAUSE INDIANA v. LAWSON et al

Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA
Defendant: J. BRADLEY KING, CONNIE LAWSON and ANGELA NUSSMEYER
Intervenor Defendant: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Case Number: 1:2017cv03936
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Matthew P. Brookman
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973gg-2 Nat'l. Voter Registration Act of 1993 (NVRA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - DENYING DEFENDANTS' 114 MOTION FOR STAY OF DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS AND DISCOVERY. The Court DENIES the Defendant's Motion to Stay of District Court Proceedings and Discovery, (Filing No. 114 ), while the case is on interlocutory appeal of the preliminary injunction order, presently before the United States Court of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/5/2018. (NAD)
June 8, 2018 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - granting Plaintiffs' 75 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Because each of the factors for the issuance of a preliminary injunction weighs in favor of Common Cause, the Court GRANTS Common Cause's Motion for Preliminary Injun ction (Filing No. 75 ). Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(d), the Court ISSUES A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION prohibiting the Defendants from taking any actions to implement SEA 442 until this case has been finally resolved. A similar ruli ng is issued in related case Indiana State Conference of the National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, et. al. v. Lawson et al., 1:17-cv-2897-TWP-MPB. Common Cause need not post a bond. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/8/2018. (NAD)
February 27, 2018 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Intervene as Defendant - The Foundation may, however, participate in the case as amici curiae if it so wishes, and file amicus curiae briefs. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/27/2018. (JRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA v. LAWSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMON CAUSE INDIANA
Represented By: Dale E. Ho
Represented By: Sophia Lin Lakin
Represented By: Jan P. Mensz
Represented By: Gavin Minor Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BRADLEY KING
Represented By: Kelly Suzanne Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONNIE LAWSON
Represented By: Jefferson S. Garn
Represented By: Kelly Suzanne Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA NUSSMEYER
Represented By: Kelly Suzanne Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Represented By: Kaylan L Phillips
Represented By: Joseph A. Vanderhulst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?