BELL v. ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Defendant: ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00043
Filed: January 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 29 Exhibits disposed 2/28/2019 re #28 Clerk's Entry - Exhibits are released for pickup. Exhibits will be disposed of on November 14, 2018, if unclaimed. Signed by Clerk, Laura A. Briggs. (TRG) (NAD)
October 31, 2018 Filing 28 Clerk's Entry - Exhibits are released for pickup. Exhibits will be disposed of on November 14, 2018, if unclaimed. Signed by Clerk, Laura A. Briggs. (TRG)
August 15, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Final Determination in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment) (NAD)
July 31, 2018 Filing 26 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 58 - The Court having made its Entry directing the entry of final judgment, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. For the reasons detailed in the Court's Entry Following Damages Hearing, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT in this action in favor of Plaintiff Richard N. Bell and against Defendant ROI Property Group Management, LLC for an award of $150,407.92. Defendant ROI Property Group Management, LLC is enjoined from posting the Indianapolis photograph at issue in this action on its website or otherwise using it in any other way. This injunction will remain in effect only so long as the statutory damages awarded herein remain unpaid. Judgment is entered accordingly, and this action is TERMINATED. Copy mailed to ROI Property Group via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/31/2018.(NAD)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENTRY FOLLOWING DAMAGES HEARING - This matter is before the Court following a damages hearing on Plaintiff Richard N. Bell's ("Mr. Bell") claim for copyright infringement. To summarize, Mr. Bell is awarded his costs of this litigation in the amount of $407.92 and an enhanced statutory damages award of $150,000.00 on the default judgment entered against Defendant ROI Property Group Management, LLC, for a total award to Mr. Bell of $150,407.92. Additionally, ROI is prohibited from using the Indianapolis Photograph on its website or in any other way so long as the statutory damages awarded herein remain unpaid. Final judgment will issue under separate order. Copy to ROI Property Group via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/31/2018.(NAD)
July 9, 2018 Filing 24 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #20 Damages Hearing sent to Harold Doyle White, Jr. at 11340 Lakefield Drive, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 (ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC.) (NAD)
June 27, 2018 Filing 23 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #20 Minute Entry for Damages Hearing sent to Rob Fuller of ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC. at 60 East Simpson Avenue, Jackson, Wyoming 83001. Return to Sender insufficient address. (MAC)
June 25, 2018 Filing 22 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #18 Entry sent to Harold Doyle White, Jr. (ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC. ) at 11340 Lakefield Drive, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097. (NAD)
June 19, 2018 Filing 21 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #18 Entry sent to Rob Fuller (ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC.) at 60 East Simpson Avenue, Jackson, Wyoming 83001 (NAD)
June 15, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for damages hearing held before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/14/2018: Plaintiff appeared in person. Defendant did not appear. Plaintiff presented argument regarding damages and exhibits 1 through 9.This matter was taken under advisement. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. (Court Reporter David Moxley.)(TRG)
June 11, 2018 Filing 19 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #18 Entry sent to Jared Garfield (ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC.) at 3260 Lake Semionole Place, Buford Georgia 30519. (NAD) Modified on 6/12/2018 - forwarding address of 113 Shady Oak Ln, Prattville AL 36066-5338 listed on returned envelope(NAD). Modified on 6/12/2018 - Forwarded DKT #18 to 113 Shady Oak Ln, Prattville, AL 36066-5339 (forwarding address given by USPS on returned envelope)(NAD).
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE - On April 19, 2018 the Court granted Plaintiff Richard Bell's Motion for Default Judgment and scheduled an Evidentiary Hearing on Damages. (Filing No. #15 ). In its Order dated May 2, 2018 (Filing No. #17 ), the Court granted Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance and rescheduled the damages hearing from May 31, 2018 to June 14, 2018, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 344 of the Birch Bayh Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 46 East Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. In the interest of ensuring that Defendant ROI Property Group Management LLC, is aware of the hearing and this scheduling change, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to mail this Supplemental Notice to the addresses listed in the notice. Copies mailed to Defendant and additional addresses as instructed in notice via US MAIL. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/4/2018.(NAD) Modified on 6/5/2018 - edited distribution text(NAD).
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #16 Motion for Continuance. Scheduling: Evidentiary Hearing reset for 6/14/2018 at 03:30 PM in room #344, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Copy to Michael F.S. Patrick via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/2/2018.(MAC) Modified on 5/3/2018 (TRG). (Main Document 17 replaced on 5/3/2018) (TRG)
April 30, 2018 Filing 16 First MOTION for Continuance of May 31, 2018 Damages Hearing, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENTRY ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DAMAGES - Because ROI failed to file an answer or other responsive pleading and failed to otherwise defend itself in this action, the Court GRANTS Mr. Bell's Motion for Default Judgment (Filing No. #13 ) and ENTERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Defendant ROI Property Group Management, LLC, finding ROI liable for the claim asserted against it in Mr. Bell's Complaint (Filing No. #1 ). The matter is set for an evidentiary hearing on statutory damages on May 31, 2018 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 344, Birch Bayh Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. (See Entry.) Copy to Defendant via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/19/2018.(NAD)
March 27, 2018 Filing 14 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Richard N. Bell for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2- Default Judgment in BELL v. A1 LUXURY LIMOUSINE OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC, No. 1:16-cv-02536-LJM-TAB (S.D. Ind. August 18, 2017), #3 Exhibit 3- Meet the Team _ ROI Property Group Management, #4 Exhibit 4-Default judgment was entered in BELL v. KG AMERICAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC, Case No. 1:15-cv-01423-JMS-DML, Dkt. 20 (S.D. Ind. September 16, 2016), #5 Exhibit 5-[SmugMug] Pro Order # 2273468, #6 Exhibit 6- richbellphotos-SmugMug-sales-20180215042419)(Bell, Richard)
March 27, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Default Judgment as to ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Richard)
March 13, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC. Signed by Clerk, Laura A. Briggs. (BRR)
March 1, 2018 Filing 11 Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (1:18-cv-00043-TWP-DLP), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (NLR)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Strike Inadvertent Filing of Dkt. 7. IT IS ORDERED that the document inadvertently filed at Dkt. 7 is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/8/2018. (SWM)
February 8, 2018 Filing 9 First MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Resident Agent of ROI, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Richard)
February 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #7 Case Management Plan Tendered by , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bell, Richard)
February 7, 2018 Filing 7 *** WITHDRAWN PER ORDER DATED 2/8/2018 *** Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL . (Bell, Richard) Modified on 2/8/2018 (SWM).
January 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachments) (MEJ)
January 16, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC served on 1/11/2018. (Bell, Richard)
January 8, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
January 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC. (REO)
January 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard N. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD N. BELL. (Bell, Richard)
January 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC, filed by RICHARD N. BELL. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4698170) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Indianapolis Photo, #2 Exhibit B-Copy of Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Bell, Richard) Modified on 1/8/2018 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v. ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. BELL
Represented By: Richard N. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROI PROPERTY GROUP MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?