HOLLARS v. ROADHOUSE HOST, LLC et al

Plaintiff: JOHN GARRETT HOLLARS
Defendant: JOHN BRYANT and ROADHOUSE HOST, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01142
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Texas Roadhouse's Bill of Costs, 84 , and awards Texas Roadhouse $647.26 in costs. Copy to John Garrett Hollars via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/11/2019. (JDH)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - Texas Roadhouse's Motion for Summary Judgment, 58 , is GRANTED, and its Motion for Sanctions, 69 , is DENIED. In addition, the following motions are DENIED AS MOOT: Mr. Hollars' Motion for Summary Judgment, 56 ; Mr. Hollars' Submission of Mental/Emotional State and Medical Records, 73 ; Mr. Hollars' Motion for an Immediate Conference with the Judge, 78 ; Mr. Hollars' Motion for Production of All Documentation, 79 ; and Texas Roadhouse's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, 81 . Final Judgment shall issue accordingly. (See Order). Copy to John Garrett Hollars via US mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/30/2019. (JDH)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - John Garrett Hollars alleges that on the morning of February 7, 2016, a coworker raped him. At some point following the alleged incident, Mr. Hollars' employer - Roadhouse Host LLC, a franchise of Texas Roadhouse Development Corporati on (hereinafter, "Texas Roadhouse") - terminated his employment. For the foregoing reasons, Mr. Hollars' Motion to Amend, 24 , is GRANTED and Texas Roadhouse's Motion to Dismiss, 20 , is GRANTED in part, as follows: The Moti on is GRANTED as to any state law claims that accrued prior to February 10, 2018, and such claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; and The Motion is GRANTED as to Mr. Hollars' claim for intentional infliction of emotional distress, which is DISM ISSED without prejudice. Any future statement of claims filed by Mr. Hollars or served on opposing counsel pursuant to the Case Management Plan shall be in accordance with the Court's findings herein. [See Filing No. 27 .] (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/2/2018. (APD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLARS v. ROADHOUSE HOST, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BRYANT
Represented By: Kristina M. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROADHOUSE HOST, LLC
Represented By: Blake J. Burgan
Represented By: Erin Thornton Escoffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN GARRETT HOLLARS
Represented By: Cody P. Cogswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?