WHOLE WOMAN'S HEALTH ALLIANCE et al v. HILL et al
Plaintiff: ALL-OPTIONS, INC., JEFFREY GLAZER and WHOLE WOMAN'S HEALTH ALLIANCE
Defendant: KRISTINA BOX, KENNETH P. COTTER, CURTIS T. HILL, JR. and JOHN STROBEL
Case Number: 1:2018cv01904
Filed: June 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Presiding Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER denying as unnecessary Plaintiffs' 192 Motion for Leave to Receive Non-Party Written Discovery Responses Outside Discovery Deadline. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/8/2019. (SWM)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S 48 MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF A DEFENDANT CLASS - To add all 91 prosecutors to this case even as a class in an effort simply to fend off any possible prosecutions of plaintiffs during its pendency would unnecessarily encumber and significantly complicate the proceedings for no good and necessary reason. Thus, the Motion for Certification of a Defendant Class [Dkt. 48 is DENIED at this time. Should the situation change such that any particular county prosecut or(s) decide(s) to file or threaten(s) to file or does file a criminal prosecution against Plaintiffs during the pendency of this litigation, Plaintiffs' Motion can be renewed, and the ruling will be revisited by the court. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/24/2019. (NAD)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 76 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ***SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS*** Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/31/2019. (LDH)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER - denying 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/28/2019. *** SEE ORDER *** (CKM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHOLE WOMAN'S HEALTH ALLIANCE et al v. HILL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL-OPTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Amanda Lauren Allen
Represented By: David Patrick Brown
Represented By: Paul M. Eckles
Represented By: Bradley H. Honigman
Represented By: Kathrine D. Jack
Represented By: Michael M. Powell
Represented By: Juanluis Rodriguez
Represented By: Erin A. Simmons
Represented By: Dipti Singh
Represented By: Stephanie Toti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY GLAZER
Represented By: Amanda Lauren Allen
Represented By: David Patrick Brown
Represented By: Paul M. Eckles
Represented By: Bradley H. Honigman
Represented By: Kathrine D. Jack
Represented By: Michael M. Powell
Represented By: Juanluis Rodriguez
Represented By: Erin A. Simmons
Represented By: Dipti Singh
Represented By: Stephanie Toti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHOLE WOMAN'S HEALTH ALLIANCE
Represented By: Amanda Lauren Allen
Represented By: David Patrick Brown
Represented By: Paul M. Eckles
Represented By: Bradley H. Honigman
Represented By: Kathrine D. Jack
Represented By: Michael M. Powell
Represented By: Juanluis Rodriguez
Represented By: Erin A. Simmons
Represented By: Dipti Singh
Represented By: Stephanie Toti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTINA BOX
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Kelly Suzanne Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH P. COTTER
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Kelly Suzanne Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTIS T. HILL, JR.
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Kelly Suzanne Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN STROBEL
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Represented By: Jennifer Elizabeth Lemmon
Represented By: Julia Catherine Payne
Represented By: Kelly Suzanne Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?