AMRIT, INC. v. MARSH SUPERMARKETS HOLDING, LLC et al

Plaintiff: AMRIT, INC.
Defendant: F. JOSEPH HAYES, LINDA HAYES, RYAN WHITE, MARSH SUPERMARKETS HOLDING, LLC, MARSH SUPERMARKETS OF ILLINOIS, LLC and MARSH SUPERMARKETS COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02175
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 22 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARSH SUPERMARKETS COMPANY, LLC. (Dearing, David)
September 14, 2018 Filing 21 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARSH SUPERMARKETS OF ILLINOIS, LLC. (Dearing, David)
September 14, 2018 Filing 20 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MARSH SUPERMARKETS HOLDING, LLC. (Dearing, David)
September 12, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by AMRIT, INC..(Dearing, David)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying Defendants F. Joseph Hayes and Linda Hayes' #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint. Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(b), only a notice is required, not a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/29/2018. (SWM)
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 Submission Waiver of the Service of Summons, filed by Defendant LINDA HAYES. (Dameron, Jamie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 16 Submission Waiver of Service of Summons, filed by Defendant F. JOSEPH HAYES. (Dameron, Jamie)
August 24, 2018 Filing 15 Submission of Proposed Order , re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 24, 2018 , filed by Defendants F. JOSEPH HAYES, LINDA HAYES. (Dameron, Jamie)
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 24, 2018 , filed by Defendants F. JOSEPH HAYES, LINDA HAYES. (Dameron, Jamie)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie B. Dameron on behalf of Defendants F. JOSEPH HAYES, LINDA HAYES. (Dameron, Jamie)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by AMRIT, INC.. (Dearing, David)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Ryan White on 07/27/2018, filed by AMRIT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dearing, David)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMRIT, INC.. (Dearing, David)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File answer to complaint to 9/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/10/2018. (SWM)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/27/2018 , filed by Defendant RYAN WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nettles, Nelson)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nelson A. Nettles on behalf of Defendant RYAN WHITE. (Nettles, Nelson)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, David Earl Dearing hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Dearing, David)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson revised May 2018. (APD)
July 18, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to F. JOSEPH HAYES, LINDA HAYES, MARSH SUPERMARKETS HOLDING, LLC, and RYAN WHITE. (DJH)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Earl Dearing on behalf of Plaintiff AMRIT, INC.. (Dearing, David)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by AMRIT, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4972780) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Dearing, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMRIT, INC. v. MARSH SUPERMARKETS HOLDING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. JOSEPH HAYES
Represented By: Jamie B. Dameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA HAYES
Represented By: Jamie B. Dameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN WHITE
Represented By: Nelson A. Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSH SUPERMARKETS HOLDING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSH SUPERMARKETS OF ILLINOIS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSH SUPERMARKETS COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMRIT, INC.
Represented By: David Earl Dearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?