CARUSO v. MODANY et al

Plaintiff: DEBORAH CARUSO
Defendant: C. DAVID BROWN II, JOHN VINCENT WEBER, KEVIN MODANY, JOHN E. DEAN, SAMUEL L. ODLE, THOMAS I. MORGAN, JOANNA T. LAU, JOHN F. COZZI and JERRY M. COHEN
Case Number: 1:2018cv02182
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
0 Judge: Tim A Baker
1 Judge: William T Lawrence
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting Ronald J. Schutz's #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff DEBORAH J. CARUSO. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Ronald J. Schutz via US Mail Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/10/2018. (SWM)
August 10, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER granting Carly A. Kessler's #11 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff DEBORAH J. CARUSO. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Carly A. Kessler via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/10/2018. (SWM)
August 10, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER granting Michael A. Collyard #10 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff DEBORAH J. CARUSO. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Michael A. Collyard via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/10/2018. (SWM)
August 10, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting Thomas F. Berndt's #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff DEBORAH J. CARUSO. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Thomas F. Berndt via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/10/2018. (SWM)
August 10, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #8 Richard B. Allyn's Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff DEBORAH J. CARUSO. Counsel shall register for electronic filing, as required by Local Rule 5-3, within 7 days. Copy to Richard B. Allyn via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/10/2018. (SWM)
August 8, 2018 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ronald J. Schutz to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DEBORAH CARUSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Ronald J. Schutz, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hoard, John)
August 8, 2018 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carly A. Kessler to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DEBORAH CARUSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Carly A. Kessler, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hoard, John)
August 8, 2018 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael A. Collyard to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DEBORAH CARUSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Michael A. Collyard, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hoard, John)
August 8, 2018 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas F. Berndt to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DEBORAH CARUSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Thomas F. Berndt, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hoard, John)
August 8, 2018 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Richard B. Allyn to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff DEBORAH CARUSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Richard B. Allyn, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hoard, John)
July 27, 2018 7 MOTION to Joinder of Kevin Modany to Motion by Former Directors to Withdraw the Reference and Reply to the Trustee's Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference. (MJM)
July 27, 2018 6 REPLY in Support of Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference - Bankruptcy, filed by Defendants C. DAVID BROWN II, JERRY M. COHEN, JOHN F. COZZI, JOHN E. DEAN, JOANNA T. LAU, KEVIN MODANY, THOMAS I. MORGAN, SAMUEL L. ODLE, JOHN VINCENT WEBER. (MJM)
July 25, 2018 5 Notice to District Court: Reply to Response filed after the transmittal and before deadline expired on 7/25/2018. (MJM)
July 25, 2018 4 Notice to District Court: A Motion for Stay pending Appeal was filed in the United States Bankruptcy Court on 6/29/2018.(MJM)
July 17, 2018 3 BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENTS- DESIGNATION OF THE RECORD. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Designation of Record)(MJM)
July 17, 2018 2 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference - Bankruptcy, filed by Plaintiff DEBORAH CARUSO. (MJM)
July 17, 2018 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference - Bankruptcy, filed by Defendants C. DAVID BROWN II, JERRY M. COHEN, JOHN F. COZZI, JOHN E. DEAN, JOANNA T. LAU, KEVIN MODANY, THOMAS I. MORGAN, SAMUEL L. ODLE, JOHN VINCENT WEBER. (MJM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARUSO v. MODANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH CARUSO
Represented By: John C. Hoard
Represented By: Carly Kessler
Represented By: Ronald James Schutz
Represented By: Thomas Berndt
Represented By: Michael Collyard
Represented By: Richard B. Allyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. DAVID BROWN II
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN VINCENT WEBER
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN MODANY
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Philip A. Whistler
Represented By: John Cannizzaro
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Hokanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E. DEAN
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL L. ODLE
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS I. MORGAN
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNA T. LAU
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN F. COZZI
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY M. COHEN
Represented By: James P. Moloy
Represented By: Vilda Samuel Laurin, III
Represented By: Paul D. Vink
Represented By: Gregory Forrest Hahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?