STELLAR RECORDS, LLC v. BISHOP
Plaintiff: STELLAR RECORDS, LLC
Defendant: ANTHONY BISHOP
Case Number: 1:2018cv02201
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 7/18/2018) (NAD)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANTHONY BISHOP. (DJH)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STELLAR RECORDS, LLC identifying Other Affiliate SamZaBeth-Grace Irrevocable Trust Dated July 10, 2017 for STELLAR RECORDS, LLC.. (Hopkins, Michael)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Hopkins on behalf of Plaintiff STELLAR RECORDS, LLC. (Hopkins, Michael)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANTHONY BISHOP, filed by STELLAR RECORDS, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4975128) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of infringing recordings, #2 Exhibit B - Copyright Registration Certificates, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Hopkins, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STELLAR RECORDS, LLC v. BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STELLAR RECORDS, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?