DRAPER v. IPPEL et al
Plaintiff: MONTANA L. DRAPER
Defendant: ROBBERSON, IPPEL, GABRERRA, DR. IPPLE, DR. ROBERT and L.T. SAXTON
Case Number: 1:2018cv02215
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: William T Lawrence
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DR. ROBERT, L.T. SAXTON, DR. IPPLE, filed by MONTANA L. DRAPER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JDC)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by MONTANA L. DRAPER located at PENDLETON CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by MONTANA L. DRAPER to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JDC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST for Production of Documents, filed by Plaintiff MONTANA L. DRAPER.(APD)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 RECEIPT #IP061696 for Partial fee in the amount of $12.60, paid by Plaintiff. (HET)
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by MONTANA L. DRAPER. (JDC)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by MONTANA L. DRAPER located at PENDLETON CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by MONTANA L. DRAPER to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JDC)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address for MONTANA L. DRAPER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDC)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DISMISSING COMPLAINT, AND DIRECTING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - Mr. Draper's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No. #3 , is granted to the extent that he is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Twelve Dollars and Sixty Cents ($12.60). He shall have through August 24, 2018, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. For the reasons set forth in Part II of this Order, Mr. Draper's complaint is dismissed because it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. He shall have through August 24, 2018, to file an amended complaint consistent with Part II(D) of this Order. Otherwise, the Court will dismiss this action without further warning for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk is directed to include a form complaint with Mr. Draper's copy of this Order. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/27/2018. (JDC)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff MONTANA L. DRAPER. (HET) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/20/2018) (HET).
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GABRERRA, IPPEL, ROBBERSON, filed by MONTANA L. DRAPER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Healthcare, #2 Envelope)(HET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRAPER v. IPPEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTANA L. DRAPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBBERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. IPPLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. ROBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.T. SAXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?