EMMERT v. CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS

Plaintiff: DAVID EMMERT
Defendant: CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Case Number: 1:2018cv02392
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
0 Judge: Tim A Baker
1 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS.(Helms, Grant)
August 30, 2018 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. (Helms, Grant)
August 30, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant E. Helms on behalf of Defendant CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. (Helms, Grant)
August 14, 2018 6 RETURN of Service, filed by DAVID EMMERT. CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS served on 8/9/2018. (Haskin, John)
August 7, 2018 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 7, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS. (DJH)
August 6, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Logan on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID EMMERT. (Logan, Paul)
August 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff DAVID EMMERT. (Haskin, John)
August 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS, filed by DAVID EMMERT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5002277) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMMERT v. CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF INDIANAPOLIS
Represented By: Grant E. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID EMMERT
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Represented By: Paul Anthony Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?