GARRISON v. UNION HOSPITAL, INC.

Plaintiff: BAWANDA GARRISON
Defendant: UNION HOSPITAL, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02415
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE FROM INDIANAPOLIS DIVISION TO TERRE HAUTE DIVISION - This matter coming before the Court on defendant's Motion for Reassignment from Indianapolis Division to Terre Haute Division, the Court having reviewed said Motion and the Complaint filed herein, finds that said Motion #7 should be granted; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be and is hereby reassigned to the Terre Haute Division for all further proceedings. Please use cause number 2:18-cv-380-WTL-MJD for all future proceedings. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/29/2018.(APD) Modified on 8/30/2018 to indicate new cause number (APD).
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNION HOSPITAL, INC.. (Drummy, William)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to UNION HOSPITAL, INC. (LAB) (APD)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by UNION HOSPITAL, INC..(Drummy, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant UNION HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drummy, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Drummy on behalf of Defendant UNION HOSPITAL, INC.. (Drummy, William)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (APD)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNION HOSPITAL, INC. (DJH)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard R. Mazaheri on behalf of Plaintiff BAWANDA GARRISON. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNION HOSPITAL, INC., filed by BAWANDA GARRISON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5004337) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mazaheri, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRISON v. UNION HOSPITAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: William W. Drummy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAWANDA GARRISON
Represented By: Bernard R. Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?